ALVAREZ GONZALES v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: ANGEL ARIEL ALVAREZ GONZALES
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr, Director Michael W. Meade, Tony H Pham, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Field Ofc. Director U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice and Executive Office for Immigration Review
Case Number: 4:2020cv10130
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, ( Responses due by 1/13/2021) by William P. Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Michael W. Meade, Tony H Pham, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Crystal R. Souza)(Ricke, Mary Beth)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document William P. Barr. Answer due 12/30/2020; Executive Office for Immigration Review. Answer due 12/30/2020; Michael W. Meade. Answer due 12/30/2020; Tony H Pham. Answer due 12/30/2020; U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Answer due 12/30/2020; U.S. Department of Justice. Answer due 12/30/2020; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Answer due 12/30/2020. Re: #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ANGEL ARIEL ALVAREZ GONZALES. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 12/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (jw)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's FOIA Claims re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P. Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Michael W. Meade, Tony H Pham, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Chad Wolf. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricke, Mary Beth) Modified Relief on 12/11/2020 (ls).
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by William P. Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Michael W. Meade, Tony H Pham, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Chad Wolf of Petitioner's Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Form I-205) (Ricke, Mary Beth)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Injunctive Relief, filed by ANGEL ARIEL ALVAREZ GONZALES Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 12/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (jw)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by William P. Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Michael W. Meade, Tony H Pham, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Chad Wolf of Intent to Execute Removal (Ricke, Mary Beth)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Beth Ricke on behalf of William P. Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Michael W. Meade, Tony H Pham, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Chad Wolf. Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party William P. Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party Executive Office for Immigration Review(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party Michael W. Meade(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party Tony H Pham(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party Chad Wolf(pty:dft). (Ricke, Mary Beth)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office (jbs)
November 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by ANGEL ARIEL ALVAREZ GONZALES re #6 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF, filed by ANGEL ARIEL ALVAREZ GONZALES (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Additional Summon(s)) (Smith, Regilucia)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Executive Office for Immigration Review. (Smerdon, Bonnie)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jbs)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bonnie Smerdon on behalf of ANGEL ARIEL ALVAREZ GONZALES. Attorney Bonnie Smerdon added to party ANGEL ARIEL ALVAREZ GONZALES(pty:pla). (Smerdon, Bonnie)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Michael W. Meade, Tony H Pham, Chad Wolf, and U.S. Attorney (jbs)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. (jbs)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 , and Complaint for Declaration and Injuction Relief. Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13816206, filed by ANGEL ARIEL ALVAREZ GONZALES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summonses, #3 Exhibit Appendix of Exhibits A to C)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Smith, Regilucia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALVAREZ GONZALES v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Michael W. Meade
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony H Pham
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Ofc. Director U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL ARIEL ALVAREZ GONZALES
Represented By: Bonnie Smerdon
Represented By: Regilucia C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?