STOIA et al v. DOUBLE CROWN LLC et al
Plaintiff: SAMUEL C STOIA and ALANA STOIA
Defendant: DOUBLE CROWN LLC and M/V REEF ROAMER
Case Number: 4:2021cv10083
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing Release of Marshal's Bond For Cost #19 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw)
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation by ALANA STOIA, SAMUEL C STOIA. Responses due by 10/1/2021 (Horan, David)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Releasing Vessel And Dismissing Cause With Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by ALANA STOIA, SAMUEL C STOIA. Responses due by 9/28/2021 (Horan, David)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by DOUBLE CROWN LLC, M/V REEF ROAMER Verified Claim of Owner (Perez, Juan)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juan Carlos Perez, Jr on behalf of DOUBLE CROWN LLC, M/V REEF ROAMER. Attorney Juan Carlos Perez, Jr added to party DOUBLE CROWN LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Juan Carlos Perez, Jr added to party M/V REEF ROAMER(pty:dft). (Perez, Juan)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by ALANA STOIA, SAMUEL C STOIA Notice of Filing Proof of Publication (Horan, David)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 Consent and Indemnification Agreement for the Appointment of a Substitute Custodian by ALANA STOIA, SAMUEL C STOIA, USA Yacht Tech, LLC OF cONSENT AND INDEMNIFICATION (Horan, David) Modified text on 8/18/2021 (kpe).
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appoint Custodian USA Yacht Tech, LLC appointed. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (ch1)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint USA YACHT TECHS LLC as Custodian by ALANA STOIA, SAMUEL C STOIA. Responses due by 8/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horan, David)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 Warrant for Arrest In Rem Issued as to M/V REEF ROAMER. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF THE PROCESS OF ATTACHMENT. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to DOUBLE CROWN LLC. (kpe)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 Good Faith NOTICE of Estimated Time Needed to Conduct The Trial In The Above Matter by ALANA STOIA, SAMUEL C STOIA re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Horan, David) Modified text on 8/12/2021 (kpe).
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued re DE #5 . Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed (kpe)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by ALANA STOIA, SAMUEL C STOIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Warrant, #3 Summon(s))(Horan, David)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Extimated Length of Trial re #1 Complaint filed by SAMUEL C STOIA, ALANA STOIA Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Proposed Warrant for Arrest in Rem by ALANA STOIA, SAMUEL C STOIA. (Horan, David) Modified text on 8/12/2021 (kpe).
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOUBLE CROWN LLC, M/V REEF ROAMER. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14912989, filed by SAMUEL C STOIA, ALANA STOIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Horan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOIA et al v. DOUBLE CROWN LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL C STOIA
Represented By: David Paul Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALANA STOIA
Represented By: David Paul Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUBLE CROWN LLC
Represented By: Juan Carlos Perez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V REEF ROAMER
Represented By: Juan Carlos Perez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?