Silvers v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Steven A. Silvers alleged that defendant Google, Inc. infringed on plaintiff's GOOGLES mark, and sought to enjoin Google from using the GOOGLE mark in connection with the advertising, promoting, marketing and sale of children's goods and services.

Plaintiff: Stelor Productions, LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Google, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Stelor Productions,Inc., Stelor Productions, LLC, Steven Esrig and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2005cv80387
Filed: May 4, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: Kenneth L. Ryskamp
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER denying 334 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 334 Motion to Intervene Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Jonathan Riches; denying 334 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 2/5/2009. (tb)
January 16, 2009 Filing 334 MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarification, MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff, and MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint ( Responses due by 2/5/2009) by Jonathan Lee Riches. (tas)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER Approving Stipulation 332 and DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice.. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/17/2008. (cqs)
December 17, 2008 Filing 332 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Google, Inc., Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Stipulation and Dismissing Case with Prejudice)(Kaplan, Kevin)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 327 Stelor's Motion to Bring Laptop Computer into Courthouse on 12/18/2008. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/16/2008. (cqs)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting 326 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/16/2008. (cqs)
December 16, 2008 Filing 329 NOTICE of Striking 327 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Laptop Computer into the Courthouse on Thursday, December 18, 2008, For Use in Plaintiff Stelor Productions, LLC's Presentation in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Stelor Productions, LLC by Stelor Productions, LLC (Swing, Morgan)
December 16, 2008 Filing 328 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Laptop Computer Into the Courthouse on Thursday, December 18, 2008, for Use in Plaintiff Stelor Productions, LLC's Presentation of Its Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swing, Morgan)
December 16, 2008 Filing 327 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Laptop Computer into the Courthouse on Thursday, December 18, 2008, For Use in Plaintiff Stelor Productions, LLC's Presentation in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swing, Morgan)
December 15, 2008 Filing 326 Defendant's MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom on Thursday, December 18, 2008 for Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haimo, Samantha)
November 24, 2008 Filing 325 REPLY to Response to Motion re 312 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 302 Sealed Document, 304 Sealed Document, 305 Sealed Document, 306 Sealed Document, 303 Sealed Document relating to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed under seal on Octber 30, 2008Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 302 Sealed Document, 304 Sealed Document, 305 Sealed Document, 306 Sealed Document, 303 Sealed Document relating to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed under seal on Octber 30, 2008 filed by Google, Inc.. (Haimo, Samantha)
November 24, 2008 Filing 324 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Filing Declaration of Ramsey M. Al-Salam in Support of Google Inc.'s Reply to its Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ramsey M. Al-Salam, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Haimo, Samantha)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER Granting Motion to File Documents Under Seal Relating to Its Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment (See order for Details). Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/21/2008. (cqs)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER Granting Google's Motion For Leave To File Documents Under Seal,. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/21/2008. (cqs)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ENDORSED ORDER denying 320 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to motion for summary judgment, filed under seal. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/21/2008.(lc1)
November 20, 2008 Filing 320 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 318 Sealed Document, 317 Sealed Document, 315 Sealed Document, 316 Sealed Document, 319 Sealed Document in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haimo, Samantha)
November 17, 2008 Filing 319 Sealed Document. (tas)
November 17, 2008 Filing 318 Sealed Document. (tas)
November 17, 2008 Filing 317 Sealed Document. (tas)
November 17, 2008 Filing 316 Sealed Document. (tas)
November 17, 2008 Filing 315 Sealed Document. (tas)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ENDORSED ORDER granting 312 Motion for Hearing. The hearing date and time shall be set by separate notice.Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/12/2008.(lc1)
November 12, 2008 Filing 313 NOTICE of Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2008 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. (sh)
November 11, 2008 Filing 312 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 302 Sealed Document, 304 Sealed Document, 305 Sealed Document, 306 Sealed Document, 303 Sealed Document relating to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed under seal on Octber 30, 2008 by Google, Inc.. (Haimo, Samantha)
November 6, 2008 Filing 311 RESPONSE/REPLY to 309 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other) to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Response to Order Compelling Better Answers to Interrogatories filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Morgan Swing, # 2 Declaration of Kevin Kaplan)(Swing, Morgan)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER denying 300 Motion to Compel; denying 301 Motion to Compel; denying 307 Motion to Compel; denying 308 Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/5/2008. (sh)
November 3, 2008 Filing 309 RESPONSE/REPLY to 299 Order on Motion to Compel, 281 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Answers to Plaintiff Stelor's Interrogatories filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Haimo, Samantha)
November 3, 2008 Filing 308 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Production of Documents by Stelor Productions, LLC. Responses due by 11/21/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Swing, Morgan)
October 31, 2008 Filing 307 MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Supplemental Document Production or, Alternatively, to Limit Evidence by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 11/20/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Ramsey M. Al-Salam, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Al-Salam Declaration)(Haimo, Samantha)
October 30, 2008 Filing 306 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 30, 2008 Filing 305 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 30, 2008 Filing 304 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 30, 2008 Filing 303 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 30, 2008 Filing 302 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 30, 2008 Filing 301 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Google, Inc. to Produce For Deposition Its Co-Founders - Sergey Brin and Lawrence Page (Renewed) by Stelor Productions, LLC. Responses due by 11/17/2008 (Swing, Morgan)
October 30, 2008 Filing 300 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Answers To Defendant Google, Inc.'s Supplemental Responses To Plaintiff Stelor Productions, LLCs Interrogatories by Stelor Productions, LLC. Responses due by 11/17/2008 (Swing, Morgan)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting 281 Motion to Compel Better Answers to its Interrogatories.. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/23/2008. (ls)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ENDORSED ORDER granting 297 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Elana Sabovic Matt is hereby admitted to appear before this Court on behalf of defendant, Google, for this case only. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to direct all notices of electronic filings to Ms. Matt at EMatt@perkinscoie.com.Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/27/2008.(lc1)
October 24, 2008 Filing 296 NOTICE by Stelor Productions, LLC of Cancellation of Deposition (Kaplan, Kevin)
October 23, 2008 Filing 297 Defendant Google Inc.'s MOTION for Limited Appearance of Elana Sabovic Matt, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75.00, Receipt #544503. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Elana Sabovic Matt)(cw)
October 23, 2008 Filing 295 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Antonow and Debbie Jaffe by Stelor Productions, LLC.(Kaplan, Kevin)
October 23, 2008 Filing 294 NOTICE of Striking 291 MOTION for Limited Admission of Elana Sabovic Matt, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings filed by Google, Inc. by Google, Inc. (Haimo, Samantha)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ENDORSED ORDER denying 291 motion for limited admission for the reasons stated by the Clerk in 292 .Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/23/2008.(lc1)
October 23, 2008 Filing 292 Clerks Notice of Instruction to Filer Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion. Pursuant to 2B in the Administrative Procedures, a motion to make a limited appearance must be filed in the conventional manner along with the applicable filing fee. LOCAL COUNSEL IS INSTRUCTED TO 1. FILE A NOTICE TO STRIKE DE# 291 MOTION for Limited Admission of Elana Sabovic Matt, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings filed by Google, Inc. AND 2. CONVENTIONALLY FILE AN ORIGINAL MOTION TO MAKE A LIMITED APPEARANCE ALONG WITH THE APPLICABLE FILING FEE. (cw)
October 22, 2008 Filing 291 MOTION for Limited Admission of Elana Sabovic Matt, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Elana Sabovic Matt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Haimo, Samantha)
October 21, 2008 Filing 290 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stelor Productions, LLC by Google, Inc..(Haimo, Samantha)
October 21, 2008 Filing 289 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Elkin by Google, Inc..(Haimo, Samantha)
October 21, 2008 Filing 288 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Professor David J. Franklyn by Google, Inc..(Haimo, Samantha)
October 21, 2008 Filing 287 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Esrig by Google, Inc..(Haimo, Samantha)
October 21, 2008 Pursuant to DE#285, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/30/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2008. (dg)
October 15, 2008 Filing 286 *Endorsed Order reminding the parties that, pursuant to their request, the case caption has changed as explained in 243 . Thus, both parties are directed to use the proper case caption when filing documents with this Court.Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on October 15, 2008. (lc1)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 284 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery is extended until October 30, 2008. The deadline to submit dispositive motions remains October 31, 2008. No further extensions of time shall be granted.Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on October 8, 2008.(lc1)
October 7, 2008 Filing 284 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Swing, Morgan)
October 1, 2008 Filing 283 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Silvers by Stelor Productions, LLC.(Swing, Morgan)
September 26, 2008 Filing 282 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Silvers by Stelor Productions, LLC.(Swing, Morgan)
September 19, 2008 Filing 281 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Answers to Plaintiff Stelor's Interrogatories by Stelor Productions, LLC. Responses due by 10/6/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Swing, Morgan)
September 19, 2008 Filing 280 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google's Corporate Representative Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Swing, Morgan)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 259 Motion to Compel; and Google's motion for protective order 262 .. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/11/08. (sh)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 278 *ENDORSED ORDER striking 275 , cancelling hearing set for September 17, 2008 at 3:30 p.m. and denying 274 . After considering the parties motion, response and reply, this Court holds that a hearing is unnecessary. Accordingly, an Order on 259 shall be issued without a hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on September 11, 2008. (lc1)
August 23, 2008 Filing 277 REPORT of Mediation (Freud, John)
August 19, 2008 Filing 276 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google, Inc. Corporate Representative by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Swing, Morgan)
August 5, 2008 Filing 275 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 259 MOTION to Compel Production of Google, Inc.'s Principals Sergey Brin and Lawrence E. Page, for Deposition in Florida : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2008 03:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp.. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 8/4/2008. (ls)
August 1, 2008 Filing 274 MOTION for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Production of Its Principals for Deposition by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Swing, Morgan)
July 31, 2008 Filing 273 REPLY to Response to Motion re 259 MOTION to Compel Production of Google, Inc.'s Principals Sergey Brin and Lawrence E. Page, for Deposition in Florida - Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Haimo, Samantha)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting 271 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 7/23/2008. (ls)
July 23, 2008 Filing 271 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order Approving Stipulation by Google, Inc., Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Swing, Morgan)
July 23, 2008 Filing 270 NOTICE of Striking re 264 Stipulation by Google, Inc., Stelor Productions, LLC (Swing, Morgan) Modified on 7/24/2008 (ls). [Added relationship to DE #264]
July 23, 2008 Filing 269 NOTICE of Striking re 267 Stipulation of Dismissal by Google, Inc., Stelor Productions, LLC (Swing, Morgan) Modified on 7/24/2008 (ls). [Added relationship to DE #267]
July 23, 2008 Filing 268 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: re 267 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Stelor Productions, LLC, Google, Inc. Error: Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected; Instruction to filer - File a notice of striking docket entry and refile the document correctly. (ls)
July 22, 2008 Filing 267 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counterclaim (Agreed Motion for Entry of Order Approving Stipulation) by Google, Inc., Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Dismissal and Order Granting Dismissal)(Swing, Morgan)
July 22, 2008 Filing 266 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: re 264 Stipulation filed by Stelor Productions, LLC, Google, Inc. Error: Wrong Event Selected; Instruction to filer - In the future please select the proper event, i.e. Stipulation of Dismissal. (ls)
July 21, 2008 Filing 265 REPLY to Response to Motion re 259 MOTION to Compel Production of Google, Inc.'s Principals Sergey Brin and Lawrence E. Page, for Deposition in Florida filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Swing, Morgan)
July 21, 2008 Filing 264 STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal by Google, Inc., Stelor Productions, LLC. (Swing, Morgan)
July 14, 2008 Filing 263 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: re 262 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Google, Inc. Error: Two or More Document Events Filed as One; Instruction to Filer=In the future please select all applicable Events; (ls)
July 11, 2008 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 259 MOTION to Compel Production of Google, Inc.'s Principals Sergey Brin and Lawrence E. Page, for Deposition in Florida and Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Haimo, Samantha)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ENDORSED ORDER granting 260 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All discovery must be completed by September 30, 2008.Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on July 8, 2008.(lc1)
July 3, 2008 Filing 260 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Alter Scheduling Order for Non-Expert Discovery Only by Google, Inc., Google, Inc., Stelor Productions,Inc., Stelor Productions, LLC, Stelor Productions, LLC, Steven Esrig. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Swing, Morgan)
June 23, 2008 Filing 259 MOTION to Compel Production of Google, Inc.'s Principals Sergey Brin and Lawrence E. Page, for Deposition in Florida by Stelor Productions,Inc., Stelor Productions, LLC, Stelor Productions, LLC, Steven Esrig. Responses due by 7/11/2008 (Swing, Morgan)
May 16, 2008 Filing 258 Witness List by Stelor Productions, LLC.. (Kaplan, Kevin)
April 18, 2008 Filing 257 NOTICE by Stelor Productions, LLC of Filing Expert Witness Disclosure (Kaplan, Kevin)
January 4, 2008 Pursuant to DE#256, Attorney Johanna Calabria terminated. Sent terminated attorney(s) instructions for tracking future case activity. (dg)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ENDORSED ORDER granting 255 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Johanna Calabria terminated. signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on January 2, 2008.(lc1)
December 27, 2007 Filing 255 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (As to Johanna Calabria, Esq. Only) by Google, Inc., Google, Inc.. Responses due by 1/11/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haimo, Samantha)
December 27, 2007 Filing 254 Notice to the Court for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification by Google, Inc., Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haimo, Samantha)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 251 Motion for Entry of Supplemental Order Enforcing Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/18/07. (sh)
December 17, 2007 Filing 252 NOTICE by Stelor Productions,Inc. Filing Corrected Exhibit "A" to Unopposed Motion for Entry of Supplemental Order Enforcing Settlement Between Steven A. Silvers and Stelor Productions, LLC (Kaplan, Kevin)
December 17, 2007 Filing 251 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File of Supplemental Order Enforcing Settlement Between Steven A. Silvers and Stelor Productions, LLC by Stelor Productions,Inc.. (Kaplan, Kevin)
November 8, 2007 Filing 250 NOTICE of Mediator Selection: John Freud selected.(Kaplan, Kevin)
October 30, 2007 Filing 249 AMENDED NOTICE OF TRIAL Calendar Call set for 1/21/2009 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. Jury Trial set for 1/26/2009 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. (sh)
October 24, 2007 Filing 248 NOTICE OF TRIAL. Calendar Call set for 1/14/2009 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2009 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. (sh)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. 15 days to appoint mediator.Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/24/07.(sh)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 246 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2007. Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2008. Joinder of Parties due by 11/16/2007. Motions due by 10/31/2008. Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/14/2009.Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/24/07.(sh)
October 19, 2007 Filing 245 SCHEDULING REPORT- Rule 26(f). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Kaplan, Kevin)
October 16, 2007 Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 243 Order,, Terminate Parties,, 244 Notice of Compliance filed by Stelor Productions, LLC, US Mail returned for: return to sender not deliverable as addressed unable to forward for: Johanna Calabria (rb)
October 9, 2007 Filing 244 NOTICE of Compliance with Order of Pretrial Procedures by Stelor Productions, LLC (Kaplan, Kevin)
September 19, 2007 Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 239 Order to Show Cause, 240 Order on Motion in Limine,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Clarification,,,,, US Mail returned for: return to sender not deliverable as addressed unable to forward for: Johanna Calabria (rb)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER SUBSTITUTING PLAINTIFF; Stelor Productions, LLC shall be substituted as plaintiff; Steven A. Silvers; Steven A. Silvers; Steven A. Silvers; Steven A. Silvers; Steven A. Silvers; Steven A. Silvers and Steven A. Silvers terminated as a plaintiff in this matter.Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/18/07.(lk)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 242 PRETRIAL ORDER AS TO SECOND PHASE OF CASE.Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/19/07.(sh)
September 19, 2007 Case Reopened originally closed in error by clerk's office. (kb)
September 14, 2007 Filing 241 RESPONSE to 239 Order to Show Cause filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Kaplan, Kevin)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION and DISMISSING PHASE 1 of the case with prejudice; denying as moot 212 Motion in Limine, denying as moot 222 Motion in Limine, denying as moot 231 Motion in Limine, denying as moot 232 Motion for Leave to File, denying as moot 233 Motion for Clarification.Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 8/30/07. (lk)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/21/2007.Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 8/30/07.(sh)
August 24, 2007 Filing 238 STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Steven A. Silvers and Stelor Productions, LLC by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Stipulation and Dismissing Case with Prejudice)(Kaplan, Kevin)
January 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting request to remove from trial calendar re 235 Notice of Settlement filed by Stelor Productions, LLC, . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/16/07. (sh)
January 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER denying 211 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/16/07. (sh)
January 16, 2007 Filing 235 NOTICE of Settlement By Both Parties by Stelor Productions, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kaplan, Kevin)
January 12, 2007 Filing 234 RESPONSE in Opposition re 232 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Regarding Stelor's Motion for Bench Trial filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Kaplan, Kevin)
January 12, 2007 Filing 233 MOTION for clarification of Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment Motion (DE 220) and Renewed Request for Partial Summary Judgment Deeming Uncontested Issues Admitted for Purposes of Trial by Stelor Productions, LLC. Responses due by 1/29/2007 (Zack, David)
January 11, 2007 Filing 232 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers. (Attachments: # 1)(Cooper, Robert)
January 11, 2007 Filing 231 MOTION in Limine by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Zack, David)
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER denying as moot 206 Motion to Disqualify Counsel and Motion in Limine. Silvers has refiled this motion in 211 and 212 . The decisions on those motions will overtake the decision on this motion.Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on January 11, 2007. (lc1)
January 11, 2007 Filing 229 Notice of Docket Correction: incorrect event chosen;correct event is "motion" and corrected by Court re 223 Memorandum of Law filed by Stelor Productions, LLC, (tb)
January 11, 2007 MOTION bench trial and memorandum re 223 Memorandum of Law by Stelor Productions, LLC. (tb)
January 11, 2007 Filing 228 RESPONSE to 225 Memorandum in Opposition, 223 Memorandum of Law for Bench Trial filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Kaplan, Kevin)
January 11, 2007 Filing 227 NOTICE by Stelor Productions, LLC of Filing Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures)(Zack, David)
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting 224 Motion for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Stipulation. Although the Motion is unclear whether Silvers requested a one day or three day extension, the Parties have an additional three days to file the pre-trial stipulation. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on January 11, 2007. (lc1)
January 10, 2007 Filing 225 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 223 Memorandum of Law filed by Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers. (Cooper, Robert)
January 10, 2007 Filing 224 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Stipulation by Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers. (Cooper, Robert)
January 9, 2007 Filing 223 MEMORANDUM OF LAW and Motion for Bench Trial by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Zack, David)
January 9, 2007 Filing 222 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Gail McQuilkin from Testifying and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Zack, David)
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER denying as moot 120 Motion for Protective Order and for Reconsideration ; denying as moot 130 Motion to Compel and Motion for costs; denying as moot 178 Motion for Protective Order . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/8/07. (sh)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER denying 140 Stelor's Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/8/07. (sh)
January 4, 2007 Filing 219 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp : Motion Hearing held on 1/4/2007 re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Court Reporter Pauline Stipes.) (ir)
January 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting 217 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/3/07. (ir)
January 3, 2007 Filing 217 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by Stelor Productions, LLC. Responses due by 1/18/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Order Allowing Multimedia Presentation)(Zack, David)
December 22, 2006 Filing 216 RESPONSE in Opposition re 212 MOTION in Limine filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Kaplan, Kevin)
December 22, 2006 Filing 215 RESPONSE in Opposition re 211 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Kaplan, Kevin)
December 19, 2006 Filing 214 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lindsey Miller by Stelor Productions, LLC.(Kaplan, Kevin)
December 14, 2006 Filing 213 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 209 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney [Withdrawal of Appearance by Attorney Stephen C. Hunt] (Hunt, Stephen)
December 13, 2006 Filing 212 MOTION in Limine by Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers. (Cooper, Robert)
December 13, 2006 Filing 211 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers. Responses due by 12/28/2006 (Cooper, Robert)
December 13, 2006 Filing 210 Notice of Instruction to Filer: motion with multiple reliefs filed as one relief re 206 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Steven A. Silvers, file a notice striking 206 and re-file the documents with appropriate reliefs, disqualify counsel and In Limine. (tb)
December 8, 2006 Filing 208 NOTICE by Stelor Productions, LLC re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment of filing Declaration of Steven Esrig (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Kaplan, Kevin)
December 8, 2006 Filing 207 REPLY to Response to Motion re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Silvers filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Kaplan, Kevin)
December 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting 205 Leave for Withdrawal of Appearance as Attorney for defendant and counterclaimant Google, Inc. Attorney Stephen C. Hunt terminated . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/07/06. (caw)
December 7, 2006 Filing 206 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers. Responses due by 12/21/2006 (Cooper, Robert)
December 5, 2006 Filing 205 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stephen C. Hunt, Esq. [Withdraw Individual Attorney Appearance Only] pursuant to General Rule 11.1.D.3 by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 12/19/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Stephen)
December 1, 2006 Filing 204 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lindsey Miller by Stelor Productions, LLC.(Kaplan, Kevin)
November 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting 198 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 12/8/2006. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/29/06. (sh)
November 29, 2006 Filing 202 Statement of: Disputed Facts in Opposition to Stelor's Motion for Summary Judgment by Steven A. Silvers re 142 Statement. (Cooper, Robert)
November 29, 2006 Filing 201 NOTICE by Stelor Productions, LLC re 149 Appendix, 147 Appendix, 148 Appendix, 155 Appendix, 145 Appendix, 146 Appendix of Withdrawal and Refiling of Appendix of Exhibits Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment (Kaplan, Kevin)
November 29, 2006 Filing 200 APPENDIX to 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Steven Silvers by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17 part 1# 2 Exhibit 17 part 2# 3 Exhibit 17 part 3# 4 Exhibit 17 part 4# 5 Exhibit 17 part 5# 6 Exhibit 17 part 6# 7 Exhibit 18# 8 Exhibit 19# 9 Exhibit 20 part 1# 10 Exhibit 20 part 2# 11 Exhibit 20 part 3# 12 Exhibit 20 part 4# 13 Exhibit 21 part 1# 14 Exhibit 21 part 2# 15 Exhibit 22# 16 Exhibit 23# 17 Exhibit 24# 18 Exhibit 25# 19 Exhibit 26# 20 Exhibit 27)(Kaplan, Kevin)
November 29, 2006 Filing 199 APPENDIX to 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Steven Silvers by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4 part 1# 5 Exhibit 4 part 2# 6 Exhibit 5 part 1# 7 Exhibit 5 part 2# 8 Exhibit 5 part 3# 9 Exhibit 5 part 4# 10 Exhibit 5 part 5# 11 Exhibit 5 part 6# 12 Exhibit 5 part 7# 13 Exhibit 6# 14 Exhibit 7# 15 Exhibit 8# 16 Exhibit 9 part 1# 17 Exhibit 9 part 2# 18 Exhibit 10 part 1# 19 Exhibit 10 part 2# 20 Exhibit 11# 21 Exhibit 12# 22 Exhibit 13# 23 Exhibit 14# 24 Exhibit 15# 25 Exhibit 16)(Kaplan, Kevin)
November 28, 2006 Filing 198 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Steven Silvers by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement)(Kaplan, Kevin)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting 194 Motion for Extension of Time to File Statement of Disputed Facts until 11/30/06; Denying Stelor's cross-motion [DE 196]. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/27/06. (sh)
November 20, 2006 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re 194 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement of Disputed facts and Cross-Motion to Deem as Admitted Stelor's Statement of Facts filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Zack, David)
November 17, 2006 Filing 195 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Steven Silvers. re 193 Memorandum in Opposition by Steven A. Silvers. (Attachments: # 1)(Cooper, Robert)
November 17, 2006 Filing 194 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement of Disputed facts by Steven A. Silvers. (Cooper, Robert)
November 17, 2006 Filing 193 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven A. Silvers. (Cooper, Robert)
November 16, 2006 Filing 191 NOTICE of Hearing on 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2006 01:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. (sh)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Granting 185 Response to Order to Show Cause and Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Silvers has until 11/17/06 in which to file his response . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/15/06. (sh)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying as moot 180 Motion to Strike . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/15/06. (sh)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 143 Notice for judicial notice . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/14/2006. (bs)
November 13, 2006 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OF LAW In Opposition to Silvers' Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Stelor's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Silvers by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Kaplan, Kevin)
November 10, 2006 Filing 187 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Steven A. Silvers for dates of 12/22/06 - 1/7/07 (Cooper, Robert)
November 9, 2006 Filing 186 RESPONSE in Opposition re 130 Motion to Compel, 130 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Sur-Reply To Google Inc's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motions and for Costs filed by Stelor Productions, LLC, Steven Esrig. (Zack, David)
November 9, 2006 Filing 185 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Steven A. Silvers. (Cooper, Robert)
November 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/24/2006.. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/9/06. (sh)
November 8, 2006 Filing 183 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment dated October 27, 2006 (Haimo, Samantha)
November 8, 2006 Filing 182 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Depositions by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part I# 2 Exhibit A - Part II# 3 Exhibit B)(Kaplan, Kevin)
November 3, 2006 Filing 181 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Kevin C. Kaplan. re 180 MOTION to Strike Section IV of Googl Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment As to Monetary Relief and Request for Sanctions, And In the Alternative, (1) to Vacate Bifurcation Order and Permit Full Discovery; and (2) for a Continuance Pursuant to F ed R. Civ. P. 56(f) and S.D. Fla. LR 7.6 by Stelor Productions, LLC, Steven Esrig. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Zack, David)
November 3, 2006 Filing 180 MOTION to Strike Section IV of Googl Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment As to Monetary Relief and Request for Sanctions, And In the Alternative, (1) to Vacate Bifurcation Order and Permit Full Discovery; and (2) for a Continuance Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) and S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.6 by Stelor Productions, LLC, Steven Esrig. Responses due by 11/20/2006 (Zack, David)
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER/NOTICE OF HEARING re: (Google's Motions for Summary Judgment) 170 Sealed Document, 172 Sealed Document, 168 Sealed Document, 169 Sealed Document, 171 Sealed Document. Hearing Set for 1/4/07 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/3/06. (bb)
November 3, 2006 Filing 178 JOINDER IN STELOR'S MOTION for Protective Order and response to Google Inc's cross motions to compel production of documents and privileged log from Stelor and Esrig and for costs against Stelor and Esrig by Steven A. Silvers. (tpHA) Modified on 11/8/2006 (sk).
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 158 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/3/06. (sh)
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting 129 Motion Regarding Scope of Phase I Trial. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/2/06. (sh)
November 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal relating to its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/2/06. (bb)
November 1, 2006 Filing 177 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance of Robert A. Cooper by Steven A. Silvers (tpHA) Modified on 11/8/2006 (sk).
November 1, 2006 Filing 173 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Withdrawal of Two Separate Motions for Summary Judgment Dated October 16, 2006 (Haimo, Samantha)
October 27, 2006 Filing 172 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 27, 2006 Filing 171 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 27, 2006 Filing 170 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 27, 2006 Filing 169 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 27, 2006 Filing 168 Sealed Document. (gp)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/25/06. (bb)
October 25, 2006 Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to File by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order Granting Leave to File Sur-Reply)(Zack, David)
October 25, 2006 Reset Deadlines as to 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/10/2006 (ir)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/10/2006; and Order granting 141 Motion to Continue Trial . Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/25/06. (ir)
October 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying 135 Motion for Leave to File Two Separate Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/19/06. (sh)
October 23, 2006 Filing 154 REPLY to Response to Motion re 135 MOTION for Leave to File Two (2) Separate Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Google, Inc.. (Haimo, Samantha)
October 20, 2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/10/2007. (sh)
October 20, 2006 Filing 153 RENOTICE of TRIAL:Pretrial Stipulation by 1/10/07; Calendar Call set for 1/17/2007 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2007 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. (sh)
October 20, 2006 Filing 152 RESPONSE to Motion re 139 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 135 MOTION for Leave to File Two (2) Separate Motions for Summary Judgment, 141 MOTION to Continue filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Zack, David)
October 19, 2006 Filing 151 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Filing Supplemental Declaration of Johanna H. Calabria in Support of Google's Cross Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Prvilege Log from Stelor and Esrig and Motion for Costs against Stelor and Esrig (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Johanna H. Calabria# 2 Exhibit 1 - e-mails between counsel# 3 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Excerpts# 4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Excerpts# 5 Exhibit 4 - Deposition excerpts)(Haimo, Samantha)
October 19, 2006 Filing 150 REPLY to Response to Motion re 130 Motion to Compel, 130 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief in Support of its (1) Cross Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Privilege Log and (2) Motion for Costs against Stelor and Esrig filed by Google, Inc., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Silvers' Privilege Log)(Haimo, Samantha)
October 19, 2006 Filing 146 APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 145 Appendix by Stelor Productions, LLC. **(PART II OF V)** (at)
October 18, 2006 Filing 139 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 135 MOTION for Leave to File Two (2) Separate Motions for Summary Judgment by Steven A. Silvers. (bs)
October 16, 2006 Filing 167 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Google, Inc. (bb)
October 16, 2006 Filing 165 Sealed Document. (rb)
October 16, 2006 Filing 164 Sealed Document. (rb)
October 16, 2006 Filing 163 Sealed Document. (rb)
October 16, 2006 Filing 162 Sealed Document. (rb)
October 16, 2006 Filing 161 Sealed Document. (rb)
October 16, 2006 Filing 160 Sealed Document. (rb)
October 16, 2006 Filing 159 MOTION for Leave to File documents under seal by Google, Inc., Google, Inc.. (rb)
October 16, 2006 Filing 141 MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING by Steven A. Silvers. Responses due by 10/30/2006 (at)
October 16, 2006 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re 135 MOTION for Leave to File Two (2) Separate Motions for Summary Judgment Corrected Stelor Productions, LLC and Steven Esrig's Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Two Separate Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Stelor Productions, LLC, Steven Esrig. (Zack, David)
October 16, 2006 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re 135 MOTION for Leave to File Two (2) Separate Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Stelor Productions, LLC, Steven Esrig. (Zack, David)
October 12, 2006 Filing 155 APPENDIX of exhibits to 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stelor Productions, LLC. (tb) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2006 (tb).
October 12, 2006 Filing 149 APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS to 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 145 Appendix, 147 Appendix, 146 Appendix, 148 Appendix by Stelor Productions, LLC. ***(PART V OF V) ***(at)
October 12, 2006 Filing 148 APPENDIX OF EXHIBTS to 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 145 Appendix, 147 Appendix, 146 Appendix by Stelor Productions, LLC.** (PART IV OF V) **(at)
October 12, 2006 Filing 147 APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 145 Appendix, 146 Appendix by Stelor Productions, LLC. ** (PART III OF V) **(at)
October 12, 2006 Filing 145 APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS SUPPORTING 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stelor Productions, LLC. (PART I)(at)
October 12, 2006 Filing 144 NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF KEVIN C. KAPLAN SUPPORTING by Stelor Productions, LLC re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment (at)
October 12, 2006 Filing 143 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Stelor Productions, LLC (at)
October 12, 2006 Filing 142 STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS SUPPORTING by Stelor Productions, LLC re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (at)
October 12, 2006 Filing 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Silvers by Stelor Productions, LLC. Responses due by 10/26/2006 (at)
October 12, 2006 Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to File Two (2) Separate Motions for Summary Judgment by Google, Inc., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Stephen)
October 12, 2006 Filing 134 REPLY to Response to Motion re 130 Motion to Compel, 120 Motion for Protective OrderMotion for Reconsideration filed by Stelor Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule of Google Document Requests Cited By Google in its Opposition and Stelor's Responses# 2 Exhibit Privilege Log of Silvers Documents)(Zack, David)
October 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OMNIBUS ORDER granting 132 Motion for order confirming Stelor may proceed with deposition, denying 133 Motion for expedited status conference. Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/05/2006. (bs)
October 3, 2006 Filing 133 Request by Stelor Productions,L for expedited status conference on [132-1] motion re: proceeding with deposition schedule re: Mr. Silvers (hd, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2006 Filing 132 MOTION by Stelor Productions,L re: proceeding with deposition schedule re: Mr. Silvers (hd, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2006 Filing 131 NOTICE of filing declaration of Johanna Calabria in support of Google Inc's (1) opposition to Stelor productions, LLC's motion for protective order and reconsideration on that basis of 9/11/06 order granting Google Inc's motion to compel; (2) cross motion to compel production of documents and privilege log from Stelor and Esrig; and (3) motion for costs against Stelor and Esrig, by Google, Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/04/2006
October 2, 2006 Filing 130 MOTION by Google, Inc. (Attorney ) for costs agaisnt Stelor and Esrig (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2006 Filing 130 CROSS MOTION by Google, Inc. to compel production of documents and privilege log from Stelor and Esrig (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2006 Filing 130 RESPONSE by Google, Inc. in opposition to [120-1] motion for protective order as to privileged communications with Steven Silvers, [120-2] motion for reconsideration of [118-1] order granting [92-1] motion to compel privilege log from Google Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2006 Filing 129 MOTION by Google, Inc. (Attorney ) regarding scope of phase I trial (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2006 Filing 128 RE-NOTICE by Google, Inc. to take video-taped deposition of Steven Silvers 10/9/06 at 10:00 (bb, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying [126-1] motion to alter the scheduling order relating to discovery and dispositive motions only ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 09/29/06) [EOD Date: 9/29/06] (dj, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2006 Filing 126 MOTION by Google, Inc. (Attorney ) to alter the scheduling order relating to discovery and dispositive motions only (cj, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2006 Filing 125 NOTICE by Google, Inc. to take video taped depositions of Paul F. Worsham, etc., for 10:00 10/10/06, etc. (hd, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2006 Filing 124 NOTICE by Google, Inc. to take video taped deposition of Steven Silvers for 10:00 10/5/06 (hd, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2006 Filing 122 REPORT of Mediator that: Counsel confirmed to the undersigned that there was full settlment authority on the part of all parties. The parties met and neogitated in good faith for a full day and, although a final settlement was not reached, condierable progress was made and the parties are continuing their discussions. They are considering reconvening the mediation eithery by telephone or in person (Former Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER:ORDER affirming [116-1] motion for protective order ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/15/06) [EOD Date: 9/19/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying [92-1] motion to compel privilege log from google Inc. ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 09/15/06) [EOD Date: 9/18/06] (dj, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2006 Filing 120 MOTION by Stelor Productions, LLC for protective order as to privileged communications with Steven Silvers , and for reconsideration of [118-1] order granting [92-1] motion to compel privilege log from Google Inc. (hd, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying [102-1] motion for protective order concerning his upcoming deposition ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/11/06) [EOD Date: 9/12/06] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting [92-1] motion to compel privilege log from google Inc. ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/11/06) [EOD Date: 9/12/06] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2006 Filing 117 NOTICE of filing expert report of James Fitzsimmons by Stelor Productions,L (cj, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2006 Filing 116 MOTION by Stelor Productions (Attorney ) for protective order (cj, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting [90-1] stipulation ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/1/06) [EOD Date: 9/5/06] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2006 Filing 114 NOTICE of Mediation Hearing on 9/6/06 at 10:00 Leslie J. Lott added as mediator (cj, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting [107-1] motion for Ramsey M. Al-Salam and Willaim C. Rava to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 08/22/06) [EOD Date: 8/24/06] (dj, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2006 Filing 112 NOTICE of plaintiff's intention to proceed pro se by Steven A. Silvers (ss, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2006 Filing 111 NOTICE of Robert Morse Privilege Log (cj, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/25/2006
August 15, 2006 Filing 110 REPLY by Steven A. Silvers to response to [102-1] motion for protective order concerning his upcoming deposition (cj, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2006 Filing 109 NOTICE by Stelor Productions,L of filing attached original expert reports (hd, Deputy Clerk)
August 4, 2006 Filing 108 RESPONSE by Google, Inc. to [102-1] motion for protective order concerning his upcoming deposition (sk, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2006 Filing 107 MOTION by Google, Inc., Google, Inc. for Ramsey M. Al-Salam and Willaim C. Rava to appear pro hac vice (rb, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2006 Filing 106 Non-opposition RESPONSE by Stelor Productions,L to [102-1] motion for protective order concerning his upcoming deposition (hd, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2006 Filing 105 REPLY/RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers to [92-1] motion to compel privilege log from google Inc. (rb, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2006 Filing 104 REPLY MEMORANDUM, by Steven A. Silvers [98-1] motion to compel the production of documents responsive to Google Inc.'s first set of request for production to Steven A. Silvers (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2006 Filing 103 RESPONSE by Google, Inc. in opposition to [92-1] motion to compel privilege log from google Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2006 Filing 101 SUPPLEMENT by Steven A. Silvers to and local rule certification for motion for protective order (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2006 Filing 102 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers (Attorney ) for protective order concerning his upcoming deposition (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOITON TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: ORDER granting [82-1] motion for Adam T. Rabin and Kenneth R. Hartman to withdraw as attorney ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 7/18/06) [EOD Date: 7/20/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2006 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM by Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers, Steven A. Silvers in opposition to [98-1] motion to compel the production of documents responsive to Google Inc.'s first set of request for prodctuion to Steven A. Silvers (dj, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2006 Filing 97 REQUEST for Production of copies,by Steven A. Silvers (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2006 Filing 96 AMNEDED NOTICE by Google, Inc. to take videotaped deposition of Steven A. Silvers 7/13/06 at 9:00 (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING DEFNDANT/COUNTERCLAIMANT GOOLGE INC'S MOITON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE: ORDER granting [93-1] motion for Johanna Calabria to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 7/12/06) [EOD Date: 7/12/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 94 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER amending [75-1] Scheduling order reset motion filing deadline for 9/29/06 , setting discovery deadline for 9/15/06for all parties to to complete expert discovery, non expert discovery 8/31/06 (See order for other deadlines)(Signed by Judge Kenneth L. on 7/11/06) [EOD Date: 7/12/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2006 Filing 98 MOTION by Google, Inc. (Attorney ) to compel the production of documents responsive to Google Inc.'s first set of request for production to Steven A. Silvers (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 07/28/2006
July 10, 2006 Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 75.00 RECEIPT # 537615 (ss, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2006 Filing 93 MOTION by Google, Inc. for Johanna Calabria to appear pro hac vice , and REQUEST for expedited admission (ss, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2006 Filing 92 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to compel privilege log from google Inc. (dj, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2006 Filing 91 NOTICE by Google, Inc. to take deposition of P.W.M/K Stelor Productions, LLC 7/12/06 at 9:00 (ck, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2006 Filing 90 STIPULATION by Google, Inc. In Re: substitution of counsel for dendant/counterclaiminat Google Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk)
June 29, 2006 Filing 89 NOTICE of filing correction of certificate of service by Google, Inc. to: [86-1] opposition memorandum (ss, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2006 Filing 88 NOTICE of Unavailability by Google, Inc., Stelor Productions,L, Stelor Productions, Steven Esrig for dates of: 6/30/06 through 7/7/06 and 7/28/06 through 8/4/06 (ss, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2006 Filing 87 NOTICE of issuance of subpoena for records only by Google, Inc. (ss, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2006 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM by Google, Inc. in limited opposition to plaintiff's counsel;s moiton to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff (Former Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE A MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY:ORDER granting [84-1] motion to extend time in which to file a motion to compel discovery, until 7/7/06 ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 6/19/06) [EOD Date: 6/21/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2006 Filing 84 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to extend time in which to file a motion to compel discovery (gp, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING STELOR LLC'S MOITON FOR 3-DAY ENLARGEMENT TO REPSON TO GOOGLE INC'S FIRST SET OF DOCUEMTN REQUESTS:RDER granting [81-1] motion to extend time to respond to Google Inc.'s first set of document requests, until 6/2/06 ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 6/12/06) [EOD Date: 6/13/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2006 Filing 82 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers for Adam T. Rabin and Kenneth R. Hartman to withdraw as attorney (Former Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2006 Filing 81 MOTION by Stelor Productions,L to extend time to respond to Google Inc.'s first set of document requests (gz, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING STELOR LLC'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT TO RESPOND TO GOOGLE INC'S FIRST SET OF DOCUMENT REQUESTS: ORDER granting [79-1] motion to extend time to respond to Google Inc.'s first set of document requests ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 5/16/06) [EOD Date: 5/16/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2006 Filing 79 MOTION by Stelor Productions,L to extend time to respond to Google Inc.'s first set of document requests (Former Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2006 Filing 78 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, by Steven A. Silvers to [49-1] amended crossclaim (Former Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER setting (See order for deadlines)( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/4/06) [EOD Date: 4/5/06] CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER referring case to mediation. 15 days to appoint mediator ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/4/06) [EOD Date: 4/7/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2006 Filing 76 NOTICE of Trial Hearing: set Jury trial for 12/11/06 before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp , set pretrial stipulation due for 11/29/06 , set calendar call for 1:15 12/6/06 Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp (Former Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2006 Filing 74 Joint Scheduling Report of Scheduling Meeting by Google, Inc., Steven A. Silvers, Steven Esrig, Stelor Productions,L, Stelor Productions (dg, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2006 Filing 73 MOTION by Google, Inc. to extend time respond to cross-claim (Former Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-CLAIM: Ordered that motion for extension of time is gratned. Silvers shall file his reponse to the corss-claim on or before 4/6/06 (Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/17/06) [EOD Date: 3/20/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING SILVER'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM: ORDER denying [51-1] motion to dismiss amended cross-claim Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 2/27/06) [EOD Date: 2/27/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING SILVERS' MOTION TO REQUIRE STELOR TO COMPLY WITH RULE 5:ORDER granting [65-1] motion to requrire Stelor to comply with rule 5 ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 2/8/06) [EOD Date: 2/9/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2006 Filing 69 NOTICE of cancelation of deposition of records custodian set for 2/6/06 at 10:00AM, by Stelor Productions,L (Former Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BIFURCATE DISCOVERY AND TRIAL: ORDER granting [23-1] motion to bifurcate discovery and trial ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 2/6/06) [EOD Date: 2/7/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2006 Filing 67 REPLY by Steven A. Silvers to response to [65-1] motion to requrire Stelor to comply with rule 5 (Former Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2006 Filing 66 RESPONSE by Stelor Productions in opposition to [65-1] motion to requrire Stelor to comply with rule 5 (Former Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2006 Filing 65 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to requrire Stelor to comply with rule 5 (Former Deputy Clerk)
January 12, 2006 Filing 64 REPLY by Steven A. Silvers to response to [51-1] motion to dismiss amended cross-claim (Former Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION:ORDER granting [60-1] motion to extend time file a reply to Stelor's Opposition to motion to dismiss amended cross claim Response to motion reset to 1/12/06 for [51-1] motion to dismiss amended cross-claim ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/9/06) [EOD Date: 1/11/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2006 Filing 62 NON-OPPOSTION RESPONSE by Stelor Productions to [60-1] motion to extend time file a reply to Stelor's Opposition to motion to dismiss amended cross claim (Former Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2006 Filing 61 RE-NOTICE of videotaped deposition of Larry Page 1/24/06 at 9:30 (dj, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2006 Filing 60 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers (Attorney ) to extend time file a reply to Stelor's Opposition to motion to dismiss amended cross claim (dj, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting [56-1] motion to extend time to respond to Silvers' motion todismiss amended crossclaim ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/27/05) [EOD Date: 1/5/06] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2005 Filing 58 RESPONSE by Stelor Productions in opposition to [51-1] motion to dismiss amended cross-claim (cj, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2005 Filing 57 ANSWER by Google, Inc. to [49-1] counter claim (cj, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2005 Filing 56 MOTION by Stelor Productions,L, Steven Esrig (Attorney Kevin Crow Kaplan, David John Zack) to extend time to respond to Silvers' motion todismiss amended crossclaim (Former Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING GOOGLE INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COUNTER DEFENDANTS STELOR PRODUCTION, INC. AND STELOR PRODUCTION, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIM: ORDER granting [53-1] motion to extend time to serve reponse to counter defendants Stelor Productions, Inc. and Stelor Productions, LLC's counterclaim reset answer due for 12/21/05 for Google, Inc.to serve its response to countder defendants stelor Productions, Inc. and Stelor PRoductions, LLC's counterclaim (Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/8/05) [EOD Date: 12/8/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2005 Filing 54 REPLY MEMORANDUM, by Google, Inc. to response to [23-1] motion to bifurcate discovery and trial (Former Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2005 Filing 53 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Google, Inc. to extend time to serve reponse to counter defendants Stelor Productions, Inc. and Stelor Productions, LLC's counterclaim (Attached) (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/08/2005
December 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OMNIBUS ORDER denying as moot [21-1] motion to dismiss cross-claim, granting [47-1] motion to deny pending motion to dismiss as moot (Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/5/05) [EOD Date: 12/6/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2005 Filing 51 MOTION with memorandum in support by Steven A. Silvers to dismiss amended cross-claim (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING GOOGLE INC'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SERVE JOINT REPLY TO COUNTERDEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE DISCOVERY AND TRIAL: ORDER granting [46-1] motion to extend time to serve joint reply to counterdendants' responses to Google Inc's motion to bifurcate discovery and trial Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/30/05 for [23-1] motion to bifurcate discovery and trial ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/16/05) [EOD Date: 11/17/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2005 Filing 49 AMENDED CROSSCLAIM against Steven A. Silvers [14-1] cross claim (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2005 Filing 49 COUNTERCLAIM by Stelor Productions,L against Google, Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2005 Filing 49 Answer and affirmative defenses by Stelor Productions,L (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2005 Filing 47 MOTION by Stelor Productions,L to deny pending motion to dismiss as moot (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2005 Filing 47 NOTICE of filing amended cross-claim, by Stelor Productions,L (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/15/2005
November 14, 2005 Filing 48 RESPONSE by Stelor Productions,L in opposition to [23-1] motion to bifurcate discovery and trial (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2005 Filing 46 MOTION by Google, Inc. to extend time to serve joint reply to counterdendants' responses to Google Inc's motion to bifurcate discovery and trial (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COUTNERCLAIM AND MOTION TO BIFURCATE:ORDER granting [39-1] motion to extend time to file his response to Google Inc's motion to birfurcate and reply to Stelor Production's response to motion to dismiss Response to motion reset to 11/14/05 for [23-1] motion to bifurcate discovery and trial , set answer due for 11/14/05 for Stelor Productions,L, for Stelor Productions ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/7/05) [EOD Date: 11/8/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION: ORDER denying as moot [39-1] motion to extend time to file his response to Google Inc's motion to birfucate and reply to Stelor Production's res[pmse to motion to dismiss ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/7/05) [EOD Date: 11/8/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2005 Filing 42 ANSWER by Google, Inc. to first amended complaint and affirmative defenses; jury demand (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2005 Filing 40 REPLY by Steven A. Silvers to memorandum in opposition response to [21-1] motion to dismiss cross-claim (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2005 Filing 43 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers to [23-1] motion to bifurcate discovery and trial (sk, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2005 Filing 41 APPENDIX to: plaintiff's opposition to motion to bifurcate discovery and trial by Steven A. Silvers (lk, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2005 Filing 39 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to extend time to file his response to Google Inc's motion to birfucate and reply to Stelor Production's response to motion to dismiss (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/08/2005
November 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANITNG MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM:ORDER granting [27-1] motion to extend time to respond to counterclaim set answer to counterclaim due for 11/2/05 for Stelor Productions,L ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/1/05) [EOD Date: 11/2/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION: ORDER granting [34-1] motion to extend time respond to Goggle, Inc's motion to bifurcate Response to motion due 10/27/05 (Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/1/05) [EOD Date: 11/2/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL GOOGLE TO COMPLY WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: ORDER denying [20-1] motion to compel Google to comply with pretrial procedures ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/1/05) [EOD Date: 11/2/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2005 Filing 35 MOTION by Stelor Productions, Steven Esrig to extend time to respond to counterlaim and motion to bifurcate (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2005 Filing 34 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to extend time respond to Goggle, Inc's motion to bifurcate (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2005 Filing 33 NOTICE of non-opposition to counter-defendant, Stelor Productions, LLC's motion for enlargment of time to respond to counterclaim, by Google, Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT COUNTERDEFENDNAT STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC'S REQUEST FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION:ORDER denying [9-1] notice (Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/19/05) [EOD Date: 10/20/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2005 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Stelor Productions in opposition to [21-1] motion to dismiss cross-claim (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2005 Filing 30 REPLY by Steven A. Silvers to response to [20-1] motion to compel Google to comply with pretrial procedures (dj, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2005 Filing 27 MOTION by Stelor Productions, Steven Esrig to extend time to respond to counterclaim (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: ORDER granting [10-1] motion for leave to file first amended complaint. The first amended complaint, attached exhibit "A" to the motion, is deemed filed as of the date of this order ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/11/05) [EOD Date: 10/13/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF ANDREW P. BRIDGES TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE: ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Andrew P. Bridges to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/11/05) [EOD Date: 10/13/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF JENNIFER A. GOLINVEAUX TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE: ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Jennifer A. Golinveaux to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/11/05) [EOD Date: 10/11/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2005 Filing 23 MOTION by Google, Inc. (Attorney ) to bifurcate discovery and trial (sk, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2005 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Google, Inc. to [20-1] motion to compel Google to comply with pretrial procedures (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2005 Filing 24 NOTICE of filing declaration of ANdrew Bridges in support of Google Inc's motion to bifurcate, by Google, Inc.(Attached)(Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/06/2005
October 5, 2005 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Google, Inc. in support of motion to bifurcat discovery and trial (Former Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2005 Filing 22 MOTION with memorandum in support by Steven A. Silvers to dismiss cross-claim (Exhibits on docket #22 different from docket #21) (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/04/2005
October 3, 2005 Filing 21 MOTION with memorandum in support by Steven A. Silvers to dismiss cross-claim (Former Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2005 Filing 20 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to compel Google to comply with pretrial procedures (Former Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2005 Filing 19 MOTION by Google, Inc. for Andrew P. Bridges to appear pro hac vice (rb, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2005 Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 75.00 RECEIPT # 721643 (rb, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2005 Filing 18 MOTION by Google, Inc. for Jennifer A. Golinveaux to appear pro hac vice (rb, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2005 Filing 17 RESPONSE AND NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION, by Google, Inc. to [10-1] motion for leave to file first amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONFIRMING TIME FOR STEVEN ESRIG AND STELOR PRODUCTIONS TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM:(Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/23/05) [EOD Date: 9/26/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting [11-1] motion to extend time to answer counterclaim by Goggle ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/14/05) [EOD Date: 9/15/05] (cj, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2005 Filing 14 CROSSCLAIM by Stelor Productions,L against Steven A. Silvers (Former Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2005 Filing 13 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, by Steven A. Silvers to [5-1] counter claim (Former Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2005 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers in opposition to [5-1] counter claim and notice and request to transfer 05-80393-Civ-Hurley to this Court and consolidate it with this action (Former Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2005 Filing 11 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to extend time to answer counterclaim by Goggle (rb, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2005 Filing 10 MOTION with memorandum in support by Steven A. Silvers for leave to file first amended complaint (tb, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2005 Filing 9 NOTICE of similar actions and request for transfer and consolidation by Stelor Productions,L (cj, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2005 Filing 8 SUMMONS(ES) issued for Steven Esrig (Former Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2005 Filing 7 SUMMONS(ES) issued for Stelor Productions,L (Former Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2005 Filing 6 SUMMONS(ES) issued for Stelor Productions (Former Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2005 Filing 5 COUNTERCLAIM by Google, Inc. against Steven A. Silvers (Former Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2005 Filing 5 Answer and affirmative defenses by Google, Inc. (Attorney Jan Douglas Atlas),; jury demand (Former Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2005 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Google, Inc. on 5/5/05 Answer due on 5/25/05 for Google, Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDER filed: Scheduling Conference deadline: <date not set> Scheduling Meeting Report due <date not set> ( Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 05/05/05) [EOD Date: 5/6/05] (dj, Deputy Clerk)
May 4, 2005 Filing 2 SUMMONS(ES) issued for Google, Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk)
May 4, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $250.00 RECEIPT # 534019 ; Magistrate Judge Ann E. Vitunac (Former Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvers v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Stelor Productions,Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Crow Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Stelor Productions, LLC
Represented By: David John Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Steven Esrig
Represented By: David John Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stelor Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?