Stelor Productions, v. Silvers Featured Case
Plaintiff: Stelor Productions, L.L.C.
Defendant: Steven A. Silvers
Case Number: 9:2005cv80393
Filed: May 5, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: Daniel T. K. Hurley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CLERK'S NOTICE re 120 ORDER for Document to remain sealed and be return to filing party re 4 Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 2/4/2010. (dj) (dj)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER for Document to remain sealed and be return to filing party re 4 Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 2/4/2010. (dj)
October 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER adopting [111-1] report and recommendations denying [83-1] motion for attorneys' fees and expenses, denying [83-2] motion for sanctions ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 10/2/06) [EOD Date: 10/4/06] CCAP (rb, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2006 Filing 118 RESPONSE by Stelor Productions to objections to Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation that motion for attorneys' fees and expenses, and Rule 11 sanctions be denied (cj, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CORRECTED AGREED ORDER granting [116-1] motion to extend time to respond to objections ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 08/28/06) [EOD Date: 8/31/06] (dj, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2006 Filing 116 MOTION by Stelor Productions (Attorney ) to extend time to respond to objections (cj, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2006 Filing 115 OBJECTION by Steven A. Silvers to [111-1] report and recommendations (cj, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2006 Filing 114 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Steven A. Silvers by David H. Pollack (kw, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/16/2006
July 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting [112-1] motion to extend time to serve objections to Magistrate's Reprot and Recommendation ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 7/24/06) [EOD Date: 7/25/06] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2006 Filing 112 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to extend time to serve objections to Magistrate's Reprot and Recommendation (rb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2006 Filing 111 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins recommending that [83-1] motion for attorneys' and expenses, & the [83-2] motion for sanctions be DENIED. no longer referred. Signed on: 7/17/06 Objections to R and R due by 7/27/06 CCAP (ck, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying as moot [103-1] motion to strike [99-1] supplement to, denying [96-1] motion for leave to file sur-reply to defendants reply to stelors response to motion for fees and expenses, denying [90-1] motion to extend time for reply memorandum, denying [90-2] motion for leave to file excess of page limitation ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 6/23/06) [EOD Date: 6/30/06] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2006 Filing 109 NOTICE of 90 days expiring and ripeness for decision or hearing by Steven A. Silvers (lk, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting [105-1] supplemental motion for protective order and incorporated memorandum of law ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 3/2/06) [EOD Date: 3/2/06] (ck, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2006 Filing 107 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers in opposition to [105-1] supplemental motion for protective order and incorporated memorandum of law (dj, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2006 Filing 106 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers to [103-1] motion to strike [99-1] supplement to (dj, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2006 Filing 105 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by Stelor Productions for protective order and incorporated memorandum of law referring to: [100-1] motion for protective order preventing unauthorized discovery by defendant; and incorporated memorandum of law (dj, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER(De100): ORDER granting [100-1] motion for protective order preventing unauthorized discovery by defendant; and incorporated memorandum of law ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 1/23/06) [EOD Date: 1/23/06] (Former Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2006 Filing 103 MOTION by Stelor Productions (Attorney ) to strike [99-1] supplement to (dj, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER vacating [52-1] order denying entry of preliminary injunction ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 1/14/06) [EOD Date: 1/18/06] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2006 Filing 101 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers in opposition to [100-1] motion for protective order preventing unauthorized discovery by defendant; and incorporated memorandum of law (rb, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2006 Filing 100 MOTION by Stelor Productions (Attorney ) for protective order preventing unauthorized discovery by defendant; and incorporated memorandum of law (dj, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/17/2006
January 12, 2006 Filing 99 SUPPLEMENT by Steven A. Silvers to: [83-1] motion for attorneys' fees and expenses, [83-2] motion for sanctions (cj, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2005 Filing 98 REPLY by Stelor Productions in opposition to [96-1] motion for leave to file sur-reply to defendants reply to stelors response to motion for attorneys fees and expenses (dj, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2005 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM by Steven A. Silvers in opposition to [96-1] motion for leave to file sur-reply to defendants reply to stelors response to motion for attorneys fees and expenses (rb, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2005 Filing 96 MOTION by Stelor Productions (Attorney ) for leave to file sur-reply to defendants reply to stelors response to motion for attorneys fees and expenses (dj, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2005 Filing 95 NOTICE of filing declarations by Stelor Productions (dj, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2005 Filing 94 REPLY by Steven A. Silvers to response to [83-1] motion for attorneys' fees and expenses, [83-2] motion for sanctions (lk, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting [92-1] motion to extend time to prepare Reply memorandum, granting [92-2] motion for leave to file exceed page limitation ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 12/7/05) [EOD Date: 12/7/05] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2005 Filing 91 MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy)remanding to the district court with instructions to vacate the order denying appellant's motion for injuctive relief and to dismiss the action for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction [65-1] appeal Mandate Issued Date: 11/15/05; USCA Appeal #: 05-14258-II; Copy to Judge. (ga, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2005 Filing 92 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers (Attorney ) to extend time to prepare Reply memorandum , for leave to file exceed page limitation (rb, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2005 Filing 90 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to extend time for reply memorandum , for leave to file in excess of page limitation (rb, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2005 Filing 89 NOTICE of filing by Stelor Productions (dj, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2005 Filing 88 Plaintiffs by Stelor Productions in opposition to [83-1] motion for attorneys' fees and expenses (dj, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting [86-1] motion to extend time respond to defendants motion for attorneys fees and expenses and accompany bill of costs Response to motion reset to 11/23/05 for [83-1] motion for attorneys' fees and expenses, reset to 11/23/05 for [83-2] motion for sanctions ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 11/16/05) [EOD Date: 11/18/05] (dj, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2005 Filing 86 ARGEED MOTION by Stelor Productions to extend time respond to defendants motion for attorneys fees and expenses and accompany bill of costs (rb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER OF REFERENCE Referring Motion(s) [83-1] motion for attorneys' fees and expenses referred to Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins, [83-2] motion for sanctions referred to Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins ( signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 11/06/05) [EOD Date: 11/8/05] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2005 Filing 84 NOTICE of filing original and corrected verification page to verified motion for attorneys' fees and expenses by Steven A. Silvers (bb, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2005 Filing 83 MOTION with memorandum in support by Steven A. Silvers for attorneys' fees and expenses , and for sanctions (dg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2005 Filing 82 NOTICE of filing bill of costs by Stelor Productions (dg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2005 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE of Conference by Steven A. Silvers re: defendants verified motion for attorneys fees and expenses and bill of costs (rb, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2005 CASE CLOSED. Case and Motions no longer referred to Magistrate. [78-1] motion to extend time to respond to discovery requests, [72-1] motion to extend time file amended complaint, [61-1] motion for reconsideration of [52-1] order, [51-1] motion to seal exhibit F n appendix to Silvers' objections to Magistrate report and recommednation and exhibit F to declaration of Gail A. McQuilkin, [45-1] motion for oral argument or Hearing on [39-1] motion to strike declaration of Steven A. Esrig, [39-1] motion to strike declaration of Steven A. Esrig, [39-2] motion set aside Magistrate's findings and report and recommendation, [39-3] motion to vacate [32-1] order, [37-1] motion to extend time emergency temporary restraining order implementing preliminary injunction, [29-1] motion for clarification of Order granting temporary retraining order, [27-1] motion for entry of temporary restraining order implementing the injunction recommended by the Magistrate, [22-1] motion to strike [21-1] notice, [19-1] motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and standing, [2-1] motion for temporary restraining order, [2-2] motion for preliminary injunction (rb, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 80 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE & CLOSE OUT ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 10/04/05) [EOD Date: 10/5/05] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2005 Filing 79 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers to [78-1] motion to extend time to respond to discovery requests (cj, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2005 Filing 78 MOTION by Stelor Productions to extend time to respond to discovery requests (kw, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2005 Filing 77 Silvers OBJECTION to Stelors Request for Transfer (rb, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2005 Filing 76 RESPONSE by Stelor Productions to order granting without prejudice defendants motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (dj, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting [72-1] motion to extend time file amended complaint ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 08/24/05) [EOD Date: 8/24/05] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2005 Filing 74 NOTICE of by Stelor Productions [similar action and request for transfer and consolidation] (dj, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2005 Filing 72 MOTION by Stelor Productions (Attorney ) to extend time file amended complaint (dj, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2005 Filing 73 Transcript Information Form re: [65-1] appeal . No transcript requested. All necessary transcript (s) on file. (ga, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2005 Filing 71 NOTICE of by Steven A. Silvers filing record cross designation (dj, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2005 Filing 69 NOTICE of Receipt of Notice of Appeal Transmittal Letter from USCA on 8/4/05 Re: [65-1] appeal USCA NUMBER: 05-14258-I (ga, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2005 Filing 70 DESIGNATION by Stelor Productions of record on appeal (ga, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2005 Filing 68 Transcript Information Form re: as to Stelor Productions [65-1] appeal . No transcript requested. All necessary transcripts are already on file. (nc, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting [19-1] motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and standing ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 08/06/05) [EOD Date: 8/9/05] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
August 4, 2005 Filing 66 USCA appeal fees received Re: [65-1] appeal Filing Fee $ 255.00 Receipt # 925051 (ga, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2005 Filing 65 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL of [64-1] order, [52-1] order . EOD Date: 7/6/05; Filing Fee: $ FEE NOT PAID;; Copies to USCA and Counsel of Record. (ga, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying [61-1] motion for reconsideration of [52-1] order ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 07/21/05) [EOD Date: 7/21/05] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2005 Filing 63 NOTICE of by Stelor Productions filing second supplemental declaration of Steven A Esrig (dj, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2005 Filing 62 REPLY by Stelor Productions to response to [61-1] motion for reconsideration of [52-1] order (cj, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2005 Filing 61 MOTION by Stelor Productions (Attorney ) for reconsideration of [52-1] order (dj, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2005 Filing 60 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers to [39-3] motion to vacate [32-1] order (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2005 Filing 25 Error in dockting. Docket #25 was a duplicate of #24. (Former Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REJECTING IN PART AND APPROVING IN PART MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION adopting [24-1] report and recommendations denying [2-1] motion for temporary restraining order, denying [2-2] motion for preliminary injunction, mooting [45-1] motion for oral argument or Hearing on [39-1] motion to strike declaration of Steven A. Esrig, mooting [39-1] motion to strike declaration of Steven A. Esrig, mooting [39-2] motion set aside Magistrate's findings and report and recommendation, mooting [39-3] motion to vacate [32-1] order, denying [51-1] motion to seal exhibit F n appendix to Silvers' objections to Magistrate report and recommednation and exhibit F to declaration of Gail A. McQuilkin ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 7/2/05) [EOD Date: 7/6/05] CCAP (kw, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2005 Filing 59 NOTICE of filing declaration of Martin Jeffrey by Stelor Productions (kw, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2005 Filing 58 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KEVIN C. KAPLAN (kw, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2005 Filing 57 NOTICE of filing supplemental declaration of Kevin Kaplan by Stelor Productions (kw, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2005 Filing 56 RESPONSE by Stelor Productions to [39-1] motion to strike declaration of Steven A. Esrig (kw, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2005 Filing 55 RESPONSE by Stelor Productions in opposition to [50-1] objection (kw, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2005 Filing 54 RESPONSE TO SILVERS' REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT OR HEARING ON SILVERS' OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Stelor Productions (kw, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2005 Filing 53 NOTICE of filing supplemental declaration of Steven A. Esrig by Stelor Productions (kw, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2005 Filing 51 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers (Attorney ) to seal exhibit F n appendix to Silvers' objections to Magistrate report and recommednation and exhibit F to declaration of Gail A. McQuilkin (ct, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2005 Filing 50 OBJECTION by Steven A. Silvers to [24-1] report and recommendations, [25-1] report and recommendations (ct, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2005 Filing 50 SUPPLEMENT by Steven A. Silvers to: [39-1] motion to strike declaration of Steven A. Esrig (ct, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER EXENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: ORDER denying [37-1] motion to extend time emergency temporary restraining order implementing preliminary injunction. The temporary restraining order shall remain in full force and effect up through the end of the International Trade Show in New York up through and including 6/24/05 (Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on [EOD Date: 6/22/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2005 Filing 48 REPLY by Steven A. Silvers to response to [19-1] motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and standing (wc, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2005 Filing 47 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers in opposition to [37-1] motion to extend time of emergency temporary restraining order implementing preliminary injunction (hd, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2005 Filing 46 OBJECTION by Steven A. Silvers to [24-1] report and recommendations, [25-1] report and recommendations (dj, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2005 Filing 45 REQUEST by Steven A. Silvers for oral argument or Hearing on [39-1] motion to strike declaration of Steven A. Esrig (dj, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2005 Filing 44 APPENDIX to: [39-1] motion to strike declaration of Steven A. Esrig by Steven A. Silvers (dj, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2005 Filing 43 DECLARATION Re: of Gail A. McQuilkin (dj, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2005 Filing 42 NOTICE of by Steven A. Silvers [filing declaration of Gail M. McQuilkin] (dj, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2005 Filing 40 Notice of filing attached declaration of Paul Worshaw by Steven A. Silvers (hd, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2005 Filing 38 NOTICE of filing declaration of Russell B. Tewsbury by Steven A. Silvers (dg, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2005 Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 10,000.00 RECEIPT # 230572 (sk, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2005 Filing 41 NOTICE of depositing funds into Court Registry by Stelor Productions, (sk, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2005 Filing 39 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to strike declaration of Steven A. Esrig , set aside Magistrate's findings and report and recommendation , and to vacate [32-1] order (dg, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2005 Filing 37 MOTION by Stelor Productions, (Attorney ) to extend time emergency temporary restraining order implementing preliminary injunction (lk, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying [22-1] motion to strike [21-1] notice ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 06/16/05) [EOD Date: 6/17/05] (dj, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2005 Filing 34 VERIFIED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Stelor Productions, in opposition to [19-1] motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and standing (mh, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2005 Filing 33 Notice of compliance: by Steven A. Silvers with [32-1] order (tb, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting [27-1] motion for entry of temporary restraining order implementing the injunction recommended by the Magistrate; This Order shall remain in full force and effect up to and including WEDNESDAY JUNE 21,2005 ( Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 06/09/05) [EOD Date: 6/10/05] (rb, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2005 Filing 31 NOTICE of filing May 23, 2005 Hearing transcript of by Steven A. Silvers (dj, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2005 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Stelor Productions, to [29-1] motion for clarification of Order granting temporary retraining order (mh, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2005 Filing 29 URGENT MOTION by Steven A. Silvers for clarification of Order granting temporary retraining order (Order not found) (wc, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2005 Filing 28 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers to [27-1] motion for entry of temporary restraining order implementing the injunction recommended by the Magistrate (mh, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2005 Filing 27 RENEWED EMERGENCY MOTION with memorandum in support by Stelor Productions, for entry of temporary restraining order implementing the injunction recommended by the Magistrate (dg, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2005 Filing 26 Transcript filed re: hearing held 5/23/05 before Judge Magistrate James Hopkins Pages: 1-79 (ga, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING MOTION AS MOOT: ORDER denying as moot [29-1] motion for clarification of Order granting temporary retraining order (Signed by Judge T. K. Hurley on 6/15/05) [EOD Date: 6/15/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2005 Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins recommending that [2-2] motion for preliminary injunction, [2-1] motion for temporary restraining order be GRANTED. Motion no longer referred. Signed on: 6/3/05 Objections to R and R due by 6/13/05 CCAP (ck, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2005 Filing 23 RESPONSE by Steven A. Silvers to [22-1] motion to strike [21-1] notice of supplemental declaration of Keva Labossiere (Former Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2005 Filing 22 MOTION by Stelor Productions to strike [21-1] notice (bs, Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2005 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Declaration of keva Labossiere by Steven A. Silvers (rb, Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2005 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing proposed Report and Recommendation Denying Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction by Steven A. Silvers (rb, Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2005 Filing 19 MOTION by Steven A. Silvers to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and standing (rb, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2005 Filing 18 REPLY by Stelor Productions, to response to [2-2] motion for preliminary injunction (lh, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2005 Filing 17 Declaration/Statement of Kevin C. Kaplan (lh, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2005 Filing 16 Declaration/Statement of Steven A. Esrig (lh, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2005 Filing 15 Minutes of Motion hearing re [2-1] & [2-2] motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction: held before Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/23/05 Court Reporter Name: Phillip May (ck, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2005 Filing 14 Exhibit list by Stelor Productions, Steven A. Silvers (ck, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2005 Motion hearing re: [2-1] motion for temporary restraining order Motion hearing held, [2-2] motion for preliminary injunction Motion hearing held (ck, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2005 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Steven A. Silvers in opposition to [2-2] motion for preliminary injunction (rb, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2005 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Keva Labossiere by Steven A. Silvers (rb, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2005 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Steven A. Silvers by Steven A. Silvers (rb, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2005 Filing 10 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Steven A. Silvers by Adam Rabin (ct, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2005 Filing 9 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Steven A. Silvers by Kenneth R. Hartmann, Gail Ann McQuilkin (Former Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DE2)ORDER Motion hearing before Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins set for 11:00 5/23/05 for [2-1] motion for restraining order, set for 11:00 5/23/05 for [2-2] motion for preliminary injunction (Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/12/05) [EOD Date: 5/13/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: ORDER OF REFERENCE Referring Motion(s) [2-1] motion for temporary restraining order referred to Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins, [2-2] motion for preliminary injunction referred to Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins (signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 5/10/05) [EOD Date: 5/11/05] (Former Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2005 Filing 6 Notice of compliance: by Stelor Productions, with [5-1] order (dg, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER compelling plaintiff to serve defendant and file certificate of service ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/9/05) [EOD Date: 5/9/05] (cj, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2005 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault (wc, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2005 Filing 3 SUMMONS(ES) issued for Steven A. Silvers (wc, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2005 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION with memorandum in support by Stelor Productions, for temporary restraining order , and/or for preliminary injunction (wc, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2005 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $250.00 RECEIPT # 920308 ; Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins (wc, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stelor Productions, v. Silvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stelor Productions, L.L.C.
Represented By: David John Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Silvers
Represented By: Adam Rabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?