Young v. Reed Elsevier, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Michael L. Young alleged that defendant Accurint, a service of Reed Elsevier and LexisNexis, transmitted a false report to defendant Citibank that plaintiff had filed bankruptcy.

Plaintiff: Michael L. Young
Defendant: Transunion, LLC
Case Number: 9:2007cv80031
Filed: January 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: Donald M. Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53
ORDER of dismissal; re 52 Stipulation of Dismissal; all pending motions are denied as moot; case is closed;Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 09/26/2007.(bs)
September 25, 2007 Filing 52
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Trans Union LLC by Transunion, LLC, Michael L. Young. (Balmuth, Barry)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51
ORDER dismissing defendant Citibank Federal Savings Bank, Citibank(West), FSB and Citimortgage, Inc.; re 47 Stipulation; Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 09/19/2007.(bs)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50
ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/20/2007. (sw)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49
ORDER of dismissal as to Reed Elsevier Inc. and Seisint, Inc.; re 46 Stipulation; Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 09/11/2007.(bs)
September 17, 2007 Filing 48
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Stipulation by Michael L. Young. (Balmuth, Barry)
September 7, 2007 Filing 46
STIPULATION FOR AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF REED ELSEVIER, INC. AND SEISINT, INC. ONLY by Michael L. Young. (Balmuth, Barry)
August 29, 2007 Filing 45
First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Convictions, Punishments, and Arrests by Michael L. Young. (Balmuth, Barry)
August 20, 2007 Filing 42
FINAL REPORT of Mediation Disposition: Impasse(Klingensmith, Mark)
August 7, 2007 Filing 40
MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Attorney Paul L. Myers, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #964441. (cw)
July 2, 2007 Filing 35
Trans Union's ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to Second Amended Complaint) by Transunion, LLC.(Cosmen, Franklin)
June 29, 2007 Filing 34
Witness List by Citibank (West), FSB, Citimortgage, Inc., Citibank Federal Savings Bank.. (Hawes, Trevor)
June 25, 2007 Filing 31
Witness List for Trial by Michael L. Young.. (Balmuth, Barry)
June 19, 2007 Filing 29
NOTICE by Michael L. Young of Withdrawal of Expert Witness (Balmuth, Barry)
June 13, 2007 Filing 27
NOTICE by Michael L. Young re 17 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Request for Jury Trial of Filing Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Balmuth, Barry)
June 11, 2007 Filing 26
NOTICE by Michael L. Young of Filing Order Scheduling Mediation (Balmuth, Barry)
June 5, 2007 Filing 24
MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Attorney Erik Grohmann, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #960779. (cw)
May 31, 2007 Filing 20
NOTICE by Michael L. Young of Filing Agreed Protective Order (Balmuth, Barry)
May 30, 2007 Filing 19
Witness List of Experts Amended by Michael L. Young.. (Balmuth, Barry)
May 29, 2007 Filing 18
Witness List of Experts by Michael L. Young.. (Balmuth, Barry)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2007. Discovery due by 7/23/2007. Joinder of Parties due by 5/22/2007. All Pretrial Motions due by 8/6/2007. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/17/2007.Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 5/15/07.(eg1)
May 15, 2007 Filing 15
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Linnea R. Johnson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/15/2007. (sa)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14
ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2007 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson.Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 4/25/07.(eg1)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13
ORDER OF REFERENCE Calendar Call set for 10/10/2007 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Jury Trial set for 10/15/2007 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/18/07.(lk)
April 4, 2007 Filing 12
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Citibank (West), FSB, Citimortgage, Inc., Citibank Federal Savings Bank for dates of 5/23/07 through 5/29/07 (Hawes, Trevor)
March 6, 2007 Filing 11
REPORT REGARDING Scheduling by Citibank (West), FSB, Citimortgage, Inc., Transunion, LLC, Michael L. Young, Reed Elsevier, Inc., Seisnt, Inc., Citibank Federal Savings Bank. (Balmuth, Barry)
February 16, 2007 Filing 10
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald I. Raether, Jr., Filing Fee $75, Receipt #722448. (cw)
February 2, 2007 Filing 9
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Trevor George Hawes on behalf of Citibank (West), FSB, Citimortgage, Inc., Citibank Federal Savings Bank (Hawes, Trevor)
January 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8
ORDER granting 3 Partial Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/31/2007 (sw)
January 24, 2007 Filing 7
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Notice of Removal Request for Injunction (filed by Trans Union, LLC) filed by Michael L. Young. (Balmuth, Barry)
January 18, 2007 Filing 6
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Reed Elsevier, Inc., Seisnt, Inc..(Whittles, John)
January 10, 2007 Filing 3
MOTION to Dismiss complaint filed in State Court re1 Notice of Removal by Transunion, LLC. Responses due by 1/25/2007 (mp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Reed Elsevier, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Young
Represented By: Barry Seth Balmuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion, LLC
Represented By: Paul L. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?