Global Patent Holdings, LLC v. Panthers BRHC LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Global Patent Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Panthers BRHC LLC
Case Number: 9:2008cv80013
Filed: January 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: Kenneth L. Ryskamp
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0183 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT On Defendant's Motion for an Award of Costs; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Attorney Fees; adopting Report and Recommendations re 56 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/23/2009. (ail)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 46 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Panthers BRHC LLC BE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Objections to R&R due by 6/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 5/14/2009. (sa)
January 8, 2008 Filing 1
COMPLAINT against Panthers BRHC LLC Filing fee $ 350. Receipt#: 723594, filed by Global Patent Holdings, LLC.(ail)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Patent Holdings, LLC v. Panthers BRHC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Patent Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Adam Gordon Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panthers BRHC LLC
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?