Doe v. Epstein
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Jeffrey Epstein
Consolidated Plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 6, Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 4, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe No. 5, Jane Doe No. 3, C.M.A., Jane Doe No. 7 and Jane Doe No. 101
Amicus Curiae: United States of America
Material Witness: Jean Luc Bruhnel
Case Number: 9:2008cv80119
Filed: February 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: Linnea R Johnson
Referring Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2010 Filing 574 Notice to Parties: These cases are no longer consolidated. Any future filings shall be made only in the individual case number.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/29/2010. (mkz)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/25/2010. (ir)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHNSON'S DISCOVERY ORDERS re #480 Order on Motion to Compel, #513 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #462 Omnibus Order. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/25/2010. (ir)
June 25, 2010 Filing 571 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jeffrey Epstein (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 570 OMNIBUS ORDER Denying #559 Motion for Reconsideration ; Denying #560 Amended Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/25/2010. (sa)
June 23, 2010 Filing 569 NOTICE by Jane Doe of Interest in #559 Motion to Reconsider and Request That the Motion Be Denied (Edwards, Bradley) Modified on 6/25/2010 (tp).
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER Denying #565 Emergency Motion for Protective Order, Motion To Quash and Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/15/2010. (sa)
June 14, 2010 Filing 567 RESPONSE/REPLY to #551 Response to Motion, Epstein's Reply to Plaintiff Jane Doe's Protective Response to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and/or Request for Rule 4 Appeal by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
June 14, 2010 Filing 566 NOTICE by Jane Doe re (565 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff, C.L.'s Notice of Withdrawing Supboena Served on Maritza Milagros Vasquez and Cancelling Deposition Scheduled for June 15, 2010 Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Kuvin, Spencer)
June 14, 2010 Filing 565 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Jane Doe II. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(ots)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER withdrawing #489 Motion to Compel; withdrawing #534 Motion for Protective Order; withdrawing #539 Motion for Summary Judgment per Joint Notice of Withdrawal (DE 561).. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/14/10. (mkz)
June 14, 2010 Filing 563 NOTICE by Jane Doe of Withdrawal of Subpoena (Arbour, Jessica)
June 11, 2010 Filing 562 NOTICE by Jane Doe of Withdrawal of Subpoenas (Mermelstein, Stuart)
June 11, 2010 Filing 561 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Joint Notice of Withdrawal as to Jane Does 2-8 (Pike, Michael)
June 10, 2010 Filing 560 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #555 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Contempt Magistrate's Order Dated June 1, 2010 with Incorporated Objections, or Alternative Rule 4 Appeal by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pike, Michael) Modified on 6/14/2010 (tp).
June 4, 2010 Filing 559 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #555 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Contempt Defendant's Motion for Modification and Reconsideration of the Magistrate's Order Dated June 1, 2010 with Incorporated Objections and Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pike, Michael)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ENDORSED ORDER granting #557 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant's Rule 4 Appeal. Replies due by 6/14/2010. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/3/2010. (ir)
June 3, 2010 Filing 557 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #551 Response to Motion, #552 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other) by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ENDORSED ORDER granting #553 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #539 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Supporting Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 6/22/2010. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/1/2010. (ir)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER Granting In Part #469 Motion to Compel; Granting In Part #469 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/1/2010. (sa)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 554 OMNIBUS ORDER DENYING #450 Response to Motion, filed by Jeffrey Epstein, DENYING #444 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/1/2010. (sa)
June 1, 2010 Filing 553 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment (Jane Doe 2, DE 539; Jane Doe 3 DE 141; Jane Doe 4, DE 157; Jane Doe 5, DE 139; Jane Doe 6, DE 91; Jane Doe 7, DE 107) by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Adam)
May 28, 2010 Filing 552 RESPONSE/REPLY to (545 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, Plaintiff's Jane Does 2-8' Memorandum Response to Defendant's Rule 4 Appeal by Jane Doe. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Mermelstein, Stuart)
May 27, 2010 Filing 551 RESPONSE to Motion re #549 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #545 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, Jane Doe's Response to Epstein's Appeal of Magistrate Decision DE 545 filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 6/7/2010. (Edwards, Bradley)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ENDORSED ORDER granting #549 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #545 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, by Jane Doe. Response due 5/28/10. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/28/2010. (ir)
May 26, 2010 Filing 549 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #545 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
May 17, 2010 Filing 548 REPLY to Response to Motion re #536 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Story Cowles and Incorporated Memorandum of Law RE Deposition of Story Cowles filed by Jane Doe II. (Goldberger, Jack)
May 17, 2010 Filing 547 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #483 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Compel Deposition of Jean Luc Brunel by Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Edwards, Bradley)
May 13, 2010 Filing 546 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #545 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, Notice of Clarification (Pike, Michael)
May 12, 2010 Filing 545 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Jeffrey Epstein re #480 Order on Motion to Compel, #513 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #462 Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Pike, Michael)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ENDORSED ORDER granting #541 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery deadline 7/2/10. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/12/2010. (ir)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 543 AGREED ORDER Granting #542 Unopposed Motion To Attend Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 5/11/2010. (sa)
May 11, 2010 Filing 542 Unopposed MOTION to Attend Mediation (as to Jane Does 2-8) by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Order)(Pike, Michael)
May 11, 2010 Filing 541 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as to Jane Does 2-7 by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
May 7, 2010 Filing 540 RESPONSE in Opposition re #536 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Story Cowles and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 1 of 3, #3 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 2 of 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 3 of 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit II)(Edwards, Bradley)
May 6, 2010 Filing 539 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Supporting Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 6/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pike, Michael)
May 6, 2010 Filing 538 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra: Status Conference held on 5/6/2010. Adam Horowitz, Bradley Edwards, Katherine Ezell for Plaintiff and Michael Pike, Robert Critton for Defendant. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov (ir)
May 5, 2010 Filing 537 RESPONSE/REPLY to #535 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Protective Order by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 29, 2010 Filing 536 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Story Cowles and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through H)(Goldberger, Jack)
April 28, 2010 Filing 535 RESPONSE in Opposition re #534 MOTION for Protective Order of Jane Doe No. 4, as to the Depositions of Certain Non-Party Witnesses filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pike, Michael)
April 27, 2010 Filing 534 MOTION for Protective Order of Jane Doe No. 4, as to the Depositions of Certain Non-Party Witnesses by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 5/6/2010 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/27/2010. (ir)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER denying #518 Motion for Leave to File Redacted Versions of Sensitive Fifth Amendment Arguments and Submit Un-Redacted Arguments to the Court. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/26/2010. (ir)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ENDORSED ORDER granting #530 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery deadline is hereby extended to May 31, 2010. No other deadlines shall be affected by this order. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/26/2010. (ir)
April 23, 2010 Filing 530 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as to Jane Doe (08-80893) by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
April 16, 2010 Filing 529 RESPONSE/REPLY to #525 Response to Motion, #524 Response in Opposition to Motion to File Redacted by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
April 15, 2010 Filing 528 NOTICE of Striking #523 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff Jane Doe's Opposition to Defendant Epstein's Motion for Summary Judgment and Certification of Having Conferred Pursuant to S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1.A.3 filed by Jane Doe No. 103 Notice to Strike (DE 523) by Jane Doe No. 103 (Ezell, Katherine)
April 12, 2010 Filing 526 RESPONSE/REPLY in Support of Plaintiffs' #489 Motion to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Sworn Statements to FBI Investigators by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Arbour, Jessica) Modified on 4/13/2010 (tp).
April 12, 2010 Filing 525 RESPONSE to Motion re #518 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File to File Redacted Versions of Sensitive Fifth Amendment Arguments and Submit Un-Redacted Arguments to the Court filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 4/22/2010. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 12, 2010 Filing 524 RESPONSE in Opposition re #518 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File to File Redacted Versions of Sensitive Fifth Amendment Arguments and Submit Un-Redacted Arguments to the Court filed by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
April 9, 2010 Filing 523 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff Jane Doe's Opposition to Defendant Epstein's Motion for Summary Judgment and Certification of Having Conferred Pursuant to S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1.A.3 by Jane Doe No. 103. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ezell, Katherine)
April 9, 2010 Filing 522 RESPONSE/REPLY to #493 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court Defendant's Response in Opposition to Jane Does 2-8' Rule 4 Appeal with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
April 9, 2010 Filing 521 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #518 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File to File Redacted Versions of Sensitive Fifth Amendment Arguments and Submit Un-Redacted Arguments to the Court by Jeffrey Epstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pike, Michael)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to #518 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Versions of Sensitive Fifth Amendment Arguments and Submit Un-Redacted Arguments to the Court. Responses due by 4/12/2010. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/7/2010. (ir)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER Granting #501 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 4/6/2010. (sa)
April 6, 2010 Filing 518 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File to File Redacted Versions of Sensitive Fifth Amendment Arguments and Submit Un-Redacted Arguments to the Court by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
April 6, 2010 Filing 517 NOTICE of Striking #516 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Versions of Sensitive Fifth Amendment Arguments and Submit Un-Redacted Arguments to the Court filed by Jeffrey Epstein by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
April 6, 2010 Filing 516 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Versions of Sensitive Fifth Amendment Arguments and Submit Un-Redacted Arguments to the Court by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER granting #514 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/5/2010. (ir)
April 2, 2010 Filing 514 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Rule 4 Appeal(s) Related to the Magistrate's Orders Entered at Docket Entries 462, 480, and 513 by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 513 OMNIBUS ORDER Denying #477 Motion for Reconsideration ; Denying #488 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 4/1/2010. (sa)
March 31, 2010 Filing 512 RESPONSE in Opposition re #489 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Jane Doe Nos. 2-7's Sworn Statements to FBI Investigators and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
March 29, 2010 Filing 511 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #488 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #480 Order on Motion to Compel and/or Request for Rule 4 Review and Appeal of Portions of the Magistrate's Order by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
March 29, 2010 Filing 510 RESPONSE in Opposition re #486 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of FBI Records filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
March 29, 2010 Filing 509 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Samantha Rivera Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of Court by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
March 29, 2010 Filing 508 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Cassandra Rivera Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of Court by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ENDORSED ORDER granting #503 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #493 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re #480 Order on Motion to Compel by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 4/12/2010. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/29/2010. (ir)
March 29, 2010 Filing 506 Clerks Notice to Filer re #503 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Jane Doe Nos. 2-8' Appeal Pursuant to S.D.Fla.Mag.4 and Objections as to Magistrate Judge's Order on Net Worth Discovery (DE 493). Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
March 29, 2010 Filing 505 Clerks Notice to Filer re #502 Response/Reply (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#504]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) Modified on 3/29/2010 (ls).
March 26, 2010 Filing 504 REPLY to Response to Motion re #488 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #480 Order on Motion to Compel and/or Request for Rule 4 Review and Appeal of Portions of the Magistrate's Order filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (ls)[See Image at DE #502]
March 26, 2010 Filing 503 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #493 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re #480 Order on Motion to Compel by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael) Modified on 3/29/2010 (ls).
March 26, 2010 Filing 502 RESPONSE/REPLY to #485 Response in Opposition to Motion,, for Reconsideration and/or Request for Rule 4 Appeal, with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pike, Michael)
March 26, 2010 Filing 501 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Rule 4 Review and Appeal by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Pike, Michael)
March 24, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #477 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration. Responses due by 3/26/2010. (See DE#500 .) (wc)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER Granting #495 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply due by 3/26/2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 3/24/2010. (sa)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER Granting #491 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply Reply due by 3/26/2010.Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 3/24/2010. (sa)
March 22, 2010 Filing 498 Clerks Notice to Filer re #495 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #485 Response in Opposition to Motion,, UnopposedAmended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #485 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Unopposed. Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (tp)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 497 AMENDED ORDER granting #496 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/19/2010. (ir)
March 19, 2010 Filing 496 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Shorten Expert Disclosures by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Order)(Pike, Michael)
March 19, 2010 Filing 495 Amended Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff, Jane Doe's Response in Opposition to Defendant's #477 Motion for Reconsideration and/or Request for Rule 4 Review and Appeal Unopposed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael) Modified corrected link on 3/22/2010 (tp).
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER granting #492 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/18/2010. (ir)
March 18, 2010 Filing 493 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Jane Doe re #480 Order on Motion to Compel (Mermelstein, Stuart)
March 18, 2010 Filing 492 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadlines and Shorten Expert Disclosures by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
March 18, 2010 Filing 491 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #485 Response in Opposition to Motion,, to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and/or Request for Rule 4 Appeal by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
March 18, 2010 Filing 490 NOTICE by Jane Doe re #469 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena MOTION for Contempt against Alfredo Rodriguez, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Mermelstein, Stuart)
March 17, 2010 Filing 489 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Jane Doe Nos. 2-7's Sworn Statements to FBI Investigators and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. Responses due by 4/5/2010 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Adam)
March 15, 2010 Filing 488 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #480 Order on Motion to Compel and/or Request for Rule 4 Review and Appeal of Portions of the Magistrate's Order by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
March 12, 2010 Filing 487 RESPONSE in Opposition re (483 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Jean Luc Bruhnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Kudman, Tama)
March 10, 2010 Filing 486 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of FBI Records by Jane Doe. Responses due by 3/29/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Bradley)
March 10, 2010 Filing 485 RESPONSE in Opposition re #477 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #462 Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,, and/or Request for Rule 4 Review and Appeal of Portions of the Magistrate's Order Dated February 4, 2010 (DE 462) with Incorporated Objections and MemorDefendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #462 Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,, and/or Request for Rule 4 Review and Appeal of Portions of the Magistrate's Order Dated February 4, 2010 (DE 462) with Incorporated Objections and Memor filed by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
March 10, 2010 Filing 484 Plaintiff's MOTION to Respond to Epstein's 24-page Appeal Pleading With a 25-page Response by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley) Modified text on 3/11/2010 (tp).
March 10, 2010 Filing 483 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 482 JOINT AGREED ORDER on #405 MOTION For Order for the preservation of evidence filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 3/9/2010. (sa)
March 4, 2010 Filing 481 Sealed Document (sa) (jmd).
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part in Accordance with the terms of this Order #333 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 3/4/2010. (sa)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER Granting nunc pro tunc #475 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 3/3/2010. (sa)
March 3, 2010 Filing 478 RESPONSE/REPLY to #474 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring Defendant Jeffrey Epstein's Response to Plaintiffs Jane Does 2-8's Notification of 90 Days Expiring on Motion to Compel by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
February 26, 2010 Filing 477 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #462 Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,, and/or Request for Rule 4 Review and Appeal of Portions of the Magistrate's Order Dated February 4, 2010 (DE 462) with Incorporated Objections and Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
February 26, 2010 Filing 476 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Two (2) Pages in Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and/or Request for Rule 4 Review and Appeal of Portions of the Magistrate's Order Dated February 4, 2010 (DE 462) with Incorporated Objections and Memorandum by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
February 26, 2010 Filing 475 Third Party MOTION for Protective Order as to the Deposition of Nadia Marcinkova by Nadia Marcinkova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldberger, Jack)
February 23, 2010 Filing 474 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Jane Doe re #333 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Net Worth Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe (Mermelstein, Stuart)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER granting #470 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/19/2010. (ir)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 472 AGREED ORDER granting #471 Motion to attend mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/19/2010. (ir)
February 19, 2010 Filing 471 Defendant's MOTION Attend Mediation and Memorandum in Support Thereof as to Jane Doe, 08-80893 by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order)(Pike, Michael)
February 19, 2010 Filing 470 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as to Jane Doe, 08-80893 by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
February 17, 2010 Filing 469 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena, MOTION for Contempt against Alfredo Rodriguez, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. Responses due by 3/8/2010 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Horowitz, Adam)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #464 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal. Deadline extended to 2/26/10. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/11/2010. (ir)
February 11, 2010 Filing 467 RESPONSE/REPLY to #456 Response to Motion Epstein's Reply to Jane Doe #3's Response to Epstein's Motion for Sanctions by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pike, Michael)
February 10, 2010 Filing 466 RESPONSE/REPLY to #465 Response to Motion, Reply to Plaintiff Jane Doe's Objection to Extension of Time to File Appeal and, in the Alternative, Request for Direction to Epstein to Begin Assembling Documents by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
February 9, 2010 Filing 465 RESPONSE to Motion re #464 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Appeal Pursuant to Rule 4, in Connection with this Court's Order Dated February 4, 2010 (DE 462)Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Appeal Pursuant to Rule 4, in Connection with this Court's Order Dated February 4, 2010 (DE 462) Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants Rule 4 filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 2/19/2010. (Edwards, Bradley)
February 9, 2010 Filing 464 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Appeal Pursuant to Rule 4, in Connection with this Court's Order Dated February 4, 2010 (DE 462) by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
February 5, 2010 Filing 463 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #414 Order Notice of Filing Joint Agreed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Agreed Order)(Pike, Michael)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 462 OMNIBUS ORDER DENYING #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions filed by Jane Doe, DENYING #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories filed by Jane Doe, DENYING #196 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories filed by Jane Doe, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production filed by Jane Doe, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #194 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production filed by Jane Doe, DENYING #195 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Response to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions filed by Jane Doe, Motions terminated: #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions filed by Jane Doe, #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories filed by Jane Doe, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 2/4/2010. (sa)
February 3, 2010 Filing 461 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Re-Notice (Date & Location Change) of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff, Jane Doe #7 (Pike, Michael)
February 3, 2010 Filing 460 NOTICE of Striking #459 Notice (Other) filed by Jeffrey Epstein by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
February 3, 2010 Filing 459 STRICKEN BY DE #460 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Re-Notice (Date Change Only) of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff, Jane Doe #7 (Pike, Michael) Modified on 2/4/2010 (tp).
February 2, 2010 Filing 458 Clerks Notice to Filer re #456 Response to Motion. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (tp)
February 1, 2010 Filing 457 REPLY to Response to Motion re #444 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe No. 3. See DE #456 for first part of document and image (tp)
February 1, 2010 Filing 456 RESPONSE to Motion re 451 MOTION for Sanctions and Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 2/11/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Horowitz, Adam)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER Affirming Magistrate Judge Johnson's Discovery Order; denying #327 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/27/2010. (asl)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER Granting By Default #307 Motion to Quash; Granting By Default #307 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 1/27/2010. (sa)
January 22, 2010 Filing 453 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Jane Doe (Edwards, Bradley)
January 14, 2010 Filing 452 Clerks Notice to Filer re #450 Response to Motion,. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (tp)
January 13, 2010 Filing 451 MOTION for Sanctions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. DOCKET CORRECTION - SECOND PART OF DOCUMENT #450 (tp)
January 13, 2010 Filing 450 RESPONSE to Motion re #444 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Defendant's Motion for Sanctions with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Replies due by 1/25/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pike, Michael) Modified on 1/14/2010 (tp). DOCKET CORRRECTION SEE DE 451 FOR SECOND PART OF DOCUMENT
January 13, 2010 Filing 449 Clerks Notice to Filer re #447 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de# 448]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
January 12, 2010 Filing 448 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Jeffrey Epstein re #431 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Presidential Women's Center to Comply with Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by Jeffrey Epstein filed by Jeffrey Epstein. DOCKET CORRECTION SEE DE #447 FOR IMAGE (tp)
January 12, 2010 Filing 447 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #443 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other), #431 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Presidential Women's Center to Comply with Subpoenas Duces Tecum Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant, Epstein's, Motions to Compel (DE 431 and DE 443) (Pike, Michael)
January 12, 2010 Filing 446 NOTICE of Striking #445 Notice (Other) filed by Jeffrey Epstein Notice to Strike 445 by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
January 12, 2010 Filing 445 STRICKEN BY DE #446 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #421 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, #443 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other) Defendant, Epstein's, Notice of Withdrawal of DE 421 and DE 443 (Pike, Michael) Modified added stricken to text on 1/13/2010 (tp).
January 4, 2010 Filing 444 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Horowitz, Adam)
December 29, 2009 Filing 443 RESPONSE/REPLY to #442 Response to Motion to Compel Presidential Women's Center to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum and Incorporated Motion to Compel Presidential Women's Center to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum Regarding Jane Doe 4 by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B)(Pike, Michael)
December 21, 2009 Filing 442 RESPONSE to Motion re #431 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Presidential Women's Center to Comply with Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 12/31/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horowitz, Adam)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER; re Motion to Compel Answers (DE #63 in Case No. 08-80380). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 12/18/2009. (asl)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 440 OMNIBUS ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 12/16/2009. (asl)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 439 OMNIBUS ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 12/16/2009. (asl)
December 14, 2009 Filing 438 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bradley James Edwards (Edwards, Bradley)
December 8, 2009 Filing 437 Clerks Notice to Filer re #436 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
December 7, 2009 Filing 436 NOTICE by Jane Doe of Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order as to the Scope of Inquiry at the Depositions of Jane Doe No. 4's Parents (Horowitz, Adam)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER denying as moot #430 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Jane Doe. See DE #434 , vacating DE #413 , the subject of this appeal. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/3/2009. (ir)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER VACATING #413 Omnibus of November 17, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 12/3/2009. (sa)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 433 OMNIBUS ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part #378 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Barring Second Deposition MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jane Doe and #392 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Against Second Day of Deposition of Plaintiff Extending Past Seven Hours in the Aggregate, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 12/3/2009. (sa)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER Denying #402 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 12/3/2009. (sa)
December 2, 2009 Filing 431 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Presidential Women's Center to Comply with Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 12/21/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pike, Michael)
December 1, 2009 Filing 430 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Jane Doe re #413 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Sanctions, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
November 30, 2009 Filing 429 RESPONSE/REPLY to #422 Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order as to the Scope of Inquiry at hte Depositions of Jane Doe No. 4's Parents by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
November 28, 2009 Filing 428 RESPONSE to Motion re (8 in 9:09-cv-81092-KAM) Third Party MOTION for Protective Order and Incorportated Memorandum of Law filed by Igor Zinoview. Replies due by 12/7/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Hill, Jack)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting #425 Motion to attend mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/24/2009. (ir)
November 23, 2009 Filing 426 RESPONSE/REPLY to #390 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Net Worth Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Horowitz, Adam)
November 23, 2009 Filing 425 Defendant's MOTION Attend Mediation Defendant Epstein's Motion to Attend Mediation and Memorandum in Support Thereof (as to CMA) by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER striking (423) Motion in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM; striking (133) Motion in case 9:08-cv-80232-KAM; striking (151) Motion in case 9:08-cv-80380-KAM; striking (134) Motion in case 9:08-cv-80381-KAM; striking (156) Motion in case 9:08-cv-80811-KAM; striking (120) Motion in case 9:08-cv-80893-KAM; striking (101) Motion in case 9:08-cv-80993-KAM; striking (86) Motion in case 9:08-cv-80994-KAM; striking (71) Motion in case 9:09-cv-80469-KAM; striking (84) Motion in case 9:09-cv-80591-KAM; striking (59) Motion in case 9:09-cv-80656-KAM; striking (19) Motion in case 9:09-cv-80802-KAM; striking (10) Motion in case 9:09-cv-81092-KAM. THE PARTIES HAVE BEEN ORDERED NUMEROUS TIMES NOT TO FILE IDENTICAL PROCEDURAL MOTIONS IN ALL OF THE EPSTEIN CASES.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/23/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(mkz)
November 20, 2009 Filing 423 Defendant's MOTION To Attend Mediation re (238 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1)Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Pike, Michael)
November 20, 2009 Filing 422 RESPONSE in Opposition re #420 Renewed MOTION for Protective Order as to the Scope of Inquiry at the Depositions of Jane Doe No. 4's Parents, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
November 20, 2009 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Calendar Call set for 9/24/2010 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Jury Trial set for 9/27/2010 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Discovery due by 4/12/2010. Expert Discovery due by 7/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 5/7/2010. (ir)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting #415 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/19/2009. (ir)
November 19, 2009 Filing 420 Renewed MOTION for Protective Order as to the Scope of Inquiry at the Depositions of Jane Doe No. 4's Parents, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horowitz, Adam)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER denying as moot #361 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. See DE 119 in case no. 08-80893.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/19/2009. (mkz)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 418 OMNIBUS ORDER GRANTING Motion to Strike incorporated in #410 Response in Opposition filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Jane Doe#4's Motion for Protective Order DE 148 in Case#08-80380 is hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/19/2009. (sa)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER Denying #305 Motion for Sanctions; Denying #305 Motion to Compel; Denying #306 Motion for Sanctions; Denying #306 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/19/2009. (sa)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER Granting #407 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Net Worth Discovery. Response due by 11/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/19/2009. (sa)
November 18, 2009 Filing 415 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery / Trial Deadlines by Jane Doe. (Horowitz, Adam)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER re #405 MOTION for the preservation of evidence filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Please refer to Order for detailed information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/18/2009. (sa)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 413 OMNIBUS ORDER Denying #378 Motion for Protective Order; Denying #378 Motion for Sanctions; Denying #392 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/17/2009. (sa)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER requiring response re #361 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery /Trial Deadlines filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 11/23/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/16/2009. (ir)
November 16, 2009 Filing 411 REPLY to Response to Motion re (405 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) MOTION Order for the preservation of evidence filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Pike, Michael) Modified on 11/18/2009 (ls).
November 16, 2009 Filing 410 RESPONSE/REPLY Epstein's Response in Opposition to Jane Doe No. 4's Motion for Protective Order as to the Scope of Inquiry at the Depositions of Jane Doe No. 4's Parents (DE 148 in #08-80380) and Incorporated Motion to Strike by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
November 16, 2009 Filing 409 RESPONSE to Motion re #405 MOTION Order for the preservation of evidence filed by Herbert Stettin. Replies due by 11/27/2009. (Lichtman, Charles)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER GRANTING ON A TEMPORARY BASIS until 11/17/09 #405 Motion for the Preservation of Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/13/2009. (sa)
November 13, 2009 Filing 407 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #390 Response in Opposition to Motion by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Adam)
November 13, 2009 Filing 406 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #377 Order on Motion to Compel, Notice of Filing Joint Agreed Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Order - Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
November 12, 2009 Filing 405 Emergency MOTION for Order for the Preservation of Evidence & Incorporated Memorandum of Law (as to Jane Doe v Epstein, Case No. 08-cv-80893) by Jeffrey Epstein. (lbc)
November 12, 2009 Filing 404 RESPONSE in Opposition re #392 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Against Second Day of Deposition of Plaintiff Extending Past Seven Hours in the Aggregate, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pike, Michael)
November 12, 2009 Filing 403 RESPONSE in Opposition re #378 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Barring Second Deposition MOTION for Sanctions Epstein's Response in Opposition to Jane Doe's Motion for Protective Order Barring Second Deposition and Incorporated Motion to Strike filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
November 9, 2009 Filing 402 Third Party MOTION for Protective Order and Incorportated Memorandum of Law by Igor Zinoview. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Goldberger, Jack)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER re #383 Notice (Other) filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/5/2009. (tmn)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER granting #386 Motion for Leave to File Deposition; denying #165 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/5/2009. (ir)
November 5, 2009 Filing 399 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Re-Notice (Date Change Only) of Independent Medical Examination of Jane Doe #5 (80381) (Pike, Michael)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER withdrawing #334 Motion to Strike. Withdrawn per DE 359.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/5/2009. (mkz)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting #389 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/5/2009. (tmn)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/5/2009. (tmn)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting #358 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #358 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #333 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Net Worth Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of LawUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #333 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Net Worth Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Responses due by 11/2/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/5/2009. (tmn)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER granting #338 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/5/2009. (tmn)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting #337 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #337 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #310 Motion to CompelPlaintiff, Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #308 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical ExamUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #310 Motion to CompelPlaintiff, Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #308 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical ExamUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #310 Motion to CompelPlaintiff, Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #308 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical ExamUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #310 Motion to CompelPlaintiff, Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #308 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Exam Responses due by 10/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/5/2009. (tmn)
November 3, 2009 Filing 392 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Against Second Day of Deposition of Plaintiff Extending Past Seven Hours in the Aggregate, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
November 3, 2009 Filing 391 RESPONSE/REPLY to #327 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, #293 Order Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Appeal and Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Entered September 10, 2009 (DE 293) with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
November 2, 2009 Filing 390 RESPONSE in Opposition re #333 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Net Worth Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pike, Michael)
November 2, 2009 Filing 389 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response in Opposition to Jane Does 2-8' Motion to Compel Net Worth Discovery with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
October 30, 2009 Filing 388 NOTICE by Jane Doe re #386 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Deposition and Affidavit File Exhibit A-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-3)(Edwards, Bradley)
October 30, 2009 Filing 387 NOTICE by Jane Doe re #386 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Deposition and Affidavit of Filing Corrected Exhibit A-2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2)(Edwards, Bradley)
October 30, 2009 Filing 386 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Deposition and Affidavit by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2)(Edwards, Bradley)
October 30, 2009 Filing 385 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Jane Doe re #165 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Restraining Fraudulent Transfer of ASsets, Appointment of a Receiver To Take Charge of Property of Epstein and to Post a $15 Million Bond to Secure Potential Judgment filed by Jane Doe (Edwards, Bradley)
October 30, 2009 Filing 384 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Re-Notice (Date Change Only) of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff, Jane Doe #3 (80232) (Pike, Michael)
October 30, 2009 Filing 383 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Notice of Filing Joint Agreed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Agreed Order)(Pike, Michael)
October 30, 2009 Filing 382 NOTICE of Striking #379 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Jeffrey Epstein Notice to Strike DE 379 by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
October 30, 2009 Filing 381 Clerks Notice to Filer re #378 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Barring Second Deposition MOTION for Sanctions. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#]. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (tp)
October 30, 2009 Filing 380 Clerks Notice to Filer re #379 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (tp)
October 29, 2009 Filing 379 STRICKEN BY DE #382 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #362 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other), #345 Response to Motion,,, #377 Order on Motion to Compel, Joint Agreed Order on Defendant's Motions for IMEs, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motions and Defendant's Reply (Pike, Michael) Modified on 11/2/2009 (tp).
October 29, 2009 Filing 378 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Barring Second Deposition by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley). Added MOTION for Sanctions on 10/30/2009 (tp).
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 377 OMNIBUS ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #67 Motion to Compel; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #68 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 10/28/2009. (sa)
October 26, 2009 Filing 376 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Notice of Correction/Agreement as to Independent Medical Examinations of Plaintiffs, Jane Doe, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #6 and Jane Doe #7 (Pike, Michael)
October 26, 2009 Filing 375 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Re-Notice (Date Change) of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff, Jane Doe (Pike, Michael)
October 26, 2009 Filing 374 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Re-Notice (Date Change) of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff, Jane Doe #2 (Pike, Michael)
October 26, 2009 Filing 373 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Re-Notice (Date Change) of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff, Jane Doe # 4 (Pike, Michael)
October 26, 2009 Filing 372 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Re-Notice (Date Change) of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff, Jane Doe #7 (Pike, Michael)
October 26, 2009 Filing 371 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Re-Notice (Date Change) of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff, Jane Doe #6 (Pike, Michael)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER Denying #364 Second Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 10/23/2009. (sa)
October 22, 2009 Filing 370 EMERGENCY RESPONSE in Opposition re #364 Second MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (mr1)
October 22, 2009 Filing 368 Clerks Notice to Filer re #362 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de# 367]. It is not necessary to refile this document. Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (tp)
October 22, 2009 Filing 366 Clerks Notice to Filer re #363 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de# 365]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
October 21, 2009 Filing 367 REPLY to Response to Motion re #310 Motion to CompelPlaintiff, Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #308 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #303 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam as to Jane Doe #4, #317 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam of Jane Doe #3 Pursuant to Rule 35, #319 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Examination as to Jane Doe #7 Pursuant to Rile 35, #328 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Jane Doe #5's Independent Medical Exam Pursuant to Rule 35 filed by Jeffrey Epstein. DOCKET CORRECTION SEE DE #362 FOR IMAGE (tp)
October 21, 2009 Filing 365 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Motion by C.M.A. re #331 MOTION for Protective Order as to Defendant, Jeffrey Epstein's, Attendance at Plaintiff's Deposition filed by C.M.A. DOCKET CORRECTION SEE DE #363 FOR IMAGE (tp)
October 21, 2009 Filing 364 Second MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horowitz, Adam)
October 21, 2009 Filing 363 NOTICE by C.M.A. re #331 MOTION for Protective Order as to Defendant, Jeffrey Epstein's, Attendance at Plaintiff's Deposition of Withdrawal (Hill, Jack)
October 21, 2009 Filing 362 RESPONSE/REPLY to #345 Response to Motion,,, Defendant, Epstein's, Reply to Plaintiff, Jane Does 2-8', Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motions for IMEs of Plaintiffs, with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Pike, Michael)
October 20, 2009 Filing 361 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery /Trial Deadlines by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pike, Michael)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER re #282 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Response due 11/3/09. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/20/2009. (ir)
October 19, 2009 Filing 359 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #340 Memorandum in Opposition, #334 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #327 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court as Untimely Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs, Jane Does 2-8' Appeal as Untimely and Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of their Response in Opposition to the Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Pike, Michael)
October 19, 2009 Filing 358 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #333 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Net Worth Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
October 16, 2009 Filing 357 NOTICE by Jane Doe of Additional Evidence of Fraudulent Transfers (Edwards, Bradley)
October 16, 2009 Filing 356 REPLY to Response to Motion re #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories filed by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
October 16, 2009 Filing 355 REPLY to Response to Motion re #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions filed by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
October 16, 2009 Filing 354 REPLY to Response to Motion re #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production filed by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
October 16, 2009 Filing 353 RESPONSE in Opposition re #331 MOTION for Protective Order as to Defendant, Jeffrey Epstein's, Attendance at Plaintiff's Deposition and Notice of Incorporation of Notice of Reliance of Supplemental Authority (DE 324) filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
October 16, 2009 Filing 352 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #302 Notice (Other), #346 Motion for Leave to Appear/Attend Independent Medical Examination Joint Notice of Agreement and Plaintiff, Jane Doe's Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff, Jane Doe's, Motion for Order Permitting Legal Counsel to Attend IME and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Pursuant to the Agreement Hereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pike, Michael)
October 15, 2009 Filing 351 Clerks Notice to Filer re #349 Response/Reply (Other). Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (ls)
October 14, 2009 Filing 350 MOTION to Strike Argument Portion re: #347 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Jane Doe, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe No. 3, Jane Doe No. 4, Jane Doe No. 5, Jane Doe No. 6, Jane Doe No. 7. Responses due by 11/2/2009 (ls)
October 14, 2009 Filing 349 RESPONSE/REPLY to #347 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring and Motion to Strike Argument Portion of Defendant's Notice of Ninety Days Expiring by Jane Doe. (Horowitz, Adam) Modified on 10/15/2009 (ls). (Second Portion Re-docketed at DE #350)
October 14, 2009 Filing 348 Clerks Notice to Filer re #346 Plaintiff's MOTION for Medical Exam Counsel to Appear at IME. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
October 14, 2009 Filing 347 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
October 13, 2009 Filing 346 MOTION for Leave to Appear/Attend Independent Medical Examination by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Bradley) Modified on 10/14/2009 (ls).
October 9, 2009 Filing 345 RESPONSE to Motion re #310 Motion to CompelPlaintiff, Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #308 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #303 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam as to Jane Doe #4, #317 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam of Jane Doe #3 Pursuant to Rule 35, #319 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Examination as to Jane Doe #7 Pursuant to Rile 35, #328 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Jane Doe #5's Independent Medical Exam Pursuant to Rule 35 filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 10/22/2009. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Adam)
October 7, 2009 Filing 344 Clerks Notice to Filer re #341 Notice (Other). Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (tp)
October 6, 2009 Filing 343 RESPONSE in Opposition re #196 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
October 6, 2009 Filing 342 RESPONSE in Opposition re #195 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Response to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
October 6, 2009 Filing 341 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A as cited by Jeffrey Epstein re #339 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael) Modified text on 10/7/2009 (tp).
October 6, 2009 Filing 340 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #334 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #327 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court as Untimely , REsponse to Order to Show Cause, and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1927 by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
October 6, 2009 Filing 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re #194 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
October 6, 2009 Filing 338 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Response to Request to Produce, with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
October 5, 2009 Filing 337 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #310 Motion to CompelPlaintiff, Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #308 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35, #303 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam as to Jane Doe #4, #317 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam of Jane Doe #3 Pursuant to Rule 35, #319 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Examination as to Jane Doe #7 Pursuant to Rile 35, #328 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Jane Doe #5's Independent Medical Exam Pursuant to Rule 35 by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Adam)
October 2, 2009 Filing 336 REPLY to Response to Motion re #306 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe. (Horowitz, Adam)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to #334 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #327 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court as Untimely. Responses due by 10/9/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/2/2009. (ir)
October 1, 2009 Filing 334 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #327 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court as Untimely by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 10/19/2009 (Pike, Michael)
September 30, 2009 Filing 333 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Net Worth Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. Responses due by 10/19/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
September 30, 2009 Filing 332 REPLY to Response to Motion re #296 MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law MOTION Emergency Motion to Allow the Attendance of Jeffrey Epstein At the Deposition of Plaintiffs MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
September 29, 2009 Filing 331 MOTION for Protective Order as to Defendant, Jeffrey Epstein's, Attendance at Plaintiff's Deposition by C.M.A.. (Hill, Jack)
September 25, 2009 Filing 330 RESPONSE to Motion re #296 MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law MOTION Emergency Motion to Allow the Attendance of Jeffrey Epstein At the Deposition of Plaintiffs MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 10/5/2009. (Horowitz, Adam)
September 25, 2009 Filing 329 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #328 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Jane Doe #5's Independent Medical Exam Pursuant to Rule 35 (Pike, Michael)
September 25, 2009 Filing 328 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Jane Doe #5's Independent Medical Exam Pursuant to Rule 35 by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 10/13/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Pike, Michael)
September 24, 2009 Filing 327 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Jane Doe re #293 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
September 24, 2009 Filing 326 RESPONSE in Opposition re #297 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order, #306 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Pike, Michael)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time in which to respond to remaining portions of Discovery Motions atill at issue re #316 Notice (Other) filed by Jeffrey Epstein, ( Response due on or before 10/6/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/23/2009. (sa)
September 23, 2009 Filing 324 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #296 MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law MOTION Emergency Motion to Allow the Attendance of Jeffrey Epstein At the Deposition of Plaintiffs MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #322 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Reliance of Supplemental Authority (Pike, Michael)
September 23, 2009 Filing 323 RESPONSE to Motion re #305 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions andDefendant's MOTION to Compel Deposition of Jane Doe #4 and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 10/5/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Horowitz, Adam)
September 23, 2009 Filing 322 RESPONSE in Opposition re #306 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Pike, Michael)
September 23, 2009 Filing 321 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #278 Notice (Other) Re-Notice of Independent Medical Exam of Plaintiff, Carolyn Margaret Andriano (Pike, Michael)
September 22, 2009 Filing 320 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #319 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Examination as to Jane Doe #7 Pursuant to Rile 35 Notice of Independent Medical Examination (Pike, Michael)
September 22, 2009 Filing 319 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Examination as to Jane Doe #7 Pursuant to Rile 35 by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 10/9/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Pike, Michael)
September 21, 2009 Filing 318 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #317 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam of Jane Doe #3 Pursuant to Rule 35 Notice of Independent Medical Exam of Plaintiff, Jane Doe #3 (Pike, Michael)
September 21, 2009 Filing 317 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam of Jane Doe #3 Pursuant to Rule 35 by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 10/8/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Pike, Michael)
September 18, 2009 Filing 316 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions, #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production Notice of Agreement Relative to Jane Doe's Motions to Compel and Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Remaining Portions Still at Issue (Pike, Michael)
September 18, 2009 Filing 315 Clerks Notice to Filer re #309 Notice (Other). Docket text does not match document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (tp)
September 18, 2009 Filing 314 Clerks Notice to Filer re #308 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. it is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. Docket text does not match document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (tp)
September 18, 2009 Filing 313 Clerks Notice to Filer re #310 Motion to CompelPlaintiff, Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. it is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. Docket text does not match document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (tp)
September 18, 2009 Filing 312 Clerks Notice to Filer re #311 Notice (Other). Docket text does not match document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (tp)
September 17, 2009 Filing 311 NOTICE of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff, Jane Doe #2 (80119) by Jeffrey Epstein re #310 Defendant's MOTION for Medical Exam as to Jane Doe #2 (Pike, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2009 (tp).
September 17, 2009 Filing 310 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiff, Jane Doe #2's Independent Medical Exam Pursuant to Rule 35 as to Jane Doe #2 by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Pike, Michael) Modified relief and text on 9/18/2009 (tp).
September 17, 2009 Filing 309 NOTICE of Independant Medical Examination of Plaintiff Jane Doe #6 (90994) by Jeffrey Epstein re #308 Defendant's MOTION for Medical Exam as to Jane Doe #6 (Pike, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2009 (tp).
September 17, 2009 Filing 308 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Jane Doe #6's Independent Medical Examination Pursuant to Rule 35as to Jane Doe #6 by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Pike, Michael) Modified relief and text on 9/18/2009 (tp).
September 17, 2009 Filing 307 Defendant's MOTION to Quash AND, MOTION for Protective Order and Objections to the Subpoena Served on JP Morgan Chase & Co. Which is Incorrectly Titled and Addressed to Bear Stearns by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pike, Michael)
September 17, 2009 Filing 306 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions and, MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Horowitz, Adam)
September 17, 2009 Filing 305 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and, Defendant's MOTION to Compel Deposition of Jane Doe #4 and Memorandum in Support Thereof ( Responses due by 10/5/2009) by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Errata 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
September 16, 2009 Filing 304 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #303 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam as to Jane Doe #4 (Pike, Michael)
September 16, 2009 Filing 303 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam as to Jane Doe #4 by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 10/5/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Pike, Michael)
September 15, 2009 Filing 302 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #301 Defendant's MOTION for Medical Exam as to Jane Doe (Pike, Michael)
September 15, 2009 Filing 301 Defendant's MOTION for Medical Exam as to Jane Doe by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Pike, Michael)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Granting #295 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Compel Responses. Response due on or before by 9/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/15/2009. (sa)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER Denying #226 Motion for Protective Order Re Contact of Third-Parties by Private Investigators. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/15/2009. (sa)
September 11, 2009 Filing 298 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
September 11, 2009 Filing 297 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
September 11, 2009 Filing 296 EMERGENCY MOTION to Strike #292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ( Responses due by 9/28/2009), and MOTION Emergency Motion to Allow the Attendance of Jeffrey Epstein At the Deposition of Plaintiffs and Response In Opposition to Paintiffs', Jane Doe Nos. 2-8 Motion for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at the Deposition of Plaintiffs, With incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (dj)
September 10, 2009 Filing 295 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions, #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER Granting #288 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions, #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel. Response due on or before by 9/11/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/9/2009. (sa)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 293 OMNIBUS ORDER GRANTING #283 Supplement, filed by Jeffrey Epstein, GRANTING #282 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/9/2009. (sa)
September 9, 2009 Filing 292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order as to Jeffrey Epstein's Attendance at Deposition of Plaintiffs, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
September 8, 2009 Filing 291 RESPONSE/REPLY to #285 Order on Motion to Strike, #226 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #266 Reply to Response to Motion Sur-Reply per DE 285 by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Pike, Michael)
September 4, 2009 Filing 290 NOTICE of Compliance with Order Dated September 2, 2009 by Jane Doe re #285 Order on Motion to Strike (Mermelstein, Stuart)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Granting #228 Emergency Motion for Independent Medical Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/4/2009. (sa)
September 3, 2009 Filing 288 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions, #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #284 Motion to Amend/Correct Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/2/2009. (ir)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #280 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production. Responses due by 9/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/2/2009. (kza)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #277 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/2/2009. (kza)
September 2, 2009 Filing 284 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Modify Discovery Deadlines by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 9/21/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
August 31, 2009 Filing 283 SUPPLEMENT to #242 Order on Motion to Compel Pursuant to Magistrate's Order (DE242) Requesting a More Particularized Showing Demonstrating How The 5th Amendment May Be Asserted to Plaintiff's Request For Production With Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pike, Michael)
August 31, 2009 Filing 282 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Jeffrey Epstein re #242 Order on Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pike, Michael)
August 28, 2009 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #277 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #266 Reply to Response to Motion by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
August 28, 2009 Filing 280 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions, #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
August 27, 2009 Filing 279 REPLY to Response to Motion re #228 Defendant's MOTION for Medical Exam Emergency Motion for IME with Memo of Law filed by C.M.A.. (Hill, Jack)
August 20, 2009 Filing 278 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #228 Defendant's MOTION for Medical Exam Emergency Motion for IME with Memo of Law, #254 Response to Motion, #273 Response/Reply (Other) Agreement Relative to Emergency Motion for IME (Pike, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 277 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #266 Reply to Response to Motion by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 9/8/2009 (Pike, Michael)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #216 Motion to Strike C.M.A.'s Conditional Notice of Intent to Exclusively Rely on Statutory Damages Provided by 18 U.S.C. 2255 (filed as a Response in Opposition to Motion) filed by Jeffrey Epstein. C.M.A.'s Notice of Intent (DE 113 in 08-80811) is hereby striken from the record. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/19/2009. (ir) Modified linkages on 8/20/2009 (wc).
August 19, 2009 Filing 275 Clerks Notice to Filer re (274 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Notice (Other). Docket text does not match document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(tp)
August 18, 2009 Filing 274 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Dr. Hall Cited As Exhibit "B" by Jeffrey Epstein re #273 Response/Reply (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Pike, Michael) Modified text on 8/19/2009 (tp).
August 17, 2009 Filing 273 RESPONSE/REPLY to #254 Response to Motion, for Independent Examination of Plaintiff With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #269 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production. Responses due on or before 8/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/17/2009. (kza)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #265 Motion for Extension of Time to File on or before 8/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/17/2009. (kza)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting #264 Motion for Extension of Time to File on or before August 31, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/17/2009. (kza)
August 17, 2009 Filing 269 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions, #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
August 14, 2009 Filing 268 Sealed Document (rb) (jmd).
August 14, 2009 Filing 267 NOTICE by Jane Doe of Filing Declarations of Jane Doe No. 4 and Y.B. in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Jane Does 2-7 Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jane Doe 4, #2 Declaration of Y.B.)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
August 14, 2009 Filing 266 REPLY to Response to Motion re #226 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
August 13, 2009 Filing 265 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplementary Response Brief Pursuant to Court's Order [DE 242] by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
August 13, 2009 Filing 264 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File With the Clerk Written Objections Directed to Clerk's Order [DE 242] by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pike, Michael)
August 11, 2009 Filing 263 NOTICE TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/11/2009. (ir)
August 11, 2009 Filing 262 RESPONSE to Motion re #223 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Replies due by 8/21/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pike, Michael)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER Granting #259 Emergency Motion for Protective Order Regarding the taking of deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/11/2009. (sa)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 OMNIBUS ORDER Striking as Moot #207 Motion for Protective Order; Granting #213 Motion for Leave to File; Denying (245) Emergency Motion for Protective Order; Denying #250 Emergency Motion for Hearing on Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/11/2009. (sa)
August 10, 2009 Filing 259 EMERGENCY MOTION for Protective Order regarding the taking of her deposition on August 14, 2009. (dj)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRED IN PART re #234 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by C.M.A.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/10/2009. (sa)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 AMENDED ORDER DEFERRING TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT re #216 Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order Regarding Treatment Records, filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/10/2009. (sa)
August 7, 2009 Filing 256 NOTICE by C.M.A. re #216 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiff, CMA's Response to Defendant, Jeffrey Epstein's Motion to Strike CMA's Conditional Notice of Intent to Exclusively Rely on Statutory Damages Provided by 18 U.S.C. 2255 (DE 113), With Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Hill, Jack)
August 7, 2009 Filing 255 REPLY to Response to Motion re #207 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Treatment Records from Parent-Child Center, Inc., Dr. Serge Thys, Dominique Hyppolite/School District of Palm Beach County, Good Samaritan Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital, Florida Atlantic Uni filed by C.M.A.. (Hill, Jack)
August 7, 2009 Filing 254 RESPONSE to Motion re #228 Defendant's MOTION for Medical Exam Emergency Motion for IME with Memo of Law and Incorporated Motion for Protective Order filed by C.M.A.. Replies due by 8/17/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #91 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/7/2009. (ir)
August 7, 2009 Filing 252 Sealed Document. (lbc) (jmd).
August 7, 2009 Filing 251 NOTICE by Jane Doe of Filing Declaration of Jane Doe No. 7 in Furhter Support of Plaintiffs' Jane Does 2-7 Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jane Doe 7)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
August 7, 2009 Filing 250 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re #226 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER Granting #248 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel. Response due on or before by 8/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/6/2009. (sa)
August 6, 2009 Filing 248 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions, #212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
August 5, 2009 Filing 247 RESPONSE/REPLY to #144 Response to Motion, to Identify Plaintiffs by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Pike, Michael)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER denying #245 Emergency Motion for Protective Order regarding deposition of Susan Pope. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/5/2009. (ir)
August 5, 2009 Filing 244 RESPONSE to Motion re #213 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit of Defendant filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Replies due by 8/17/2009. (Pike, Michael)
August 4, 2009 Filing 245 EMERGENCY MOTION for Protective Order Regarding The Depositions of Susan Pope and Dr. Serge Thys and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by C.M.A.. (Attachments: #1 main document continued, #2 document continued, #3 document continued)(lh)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING in part DE 234 Motion for Extension of time. Motion is granted in part as to the motion for extension of time to respond to Defendant's motion to strike. Plaintiff has until August 7, 2009 to file her response to the motion to strike.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/4/2009. (mkz)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #57 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/4/2009. (sa)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRED IN PART #234 Motion for Extension of Time to file a Reply in support of Motion For Protective Order. Reply due by 8/7/2009.Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/4/2009. (sa)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER DEFERRING TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT #216 Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order Regarding Treatment Records filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/4/2009. (sa)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ENDORSED ORDER granting #236 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant may file a reply in excess of 10 pages for a total of 20 pages or less. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/31/2009. (ir)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #113 Motion for No Contact Order. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/31/2009. (ir)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ENDORSED ORDER granting #235 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re #91 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas. Replies due by 8/5/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/31/2009. (ir)
July 31, 2009 Filing 236 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
July 31, 2009 Filing 235 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #144 Response to Motion, by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
July 31, 2009 Filing 234 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #216 Response in Opposition to Motion, by C.M.A.. (Hill, Jack)
July 30, 2009 Filing 233 RESPONSE in Opposition re #113 Plaintiff's MOTION Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe 102's Motion for No-Contact Order which was joined in on by Jane Does 2-7 and this shall be a response to that Notice [DE45] which is technically a joined motion filed by Jane Does 2-7 filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Preserve Evidence. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/30/2009. (ir)
July 30, 2009 Filing 231 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #229 Notice (Other) of Filing Additional Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
July 30, 2009 Filing 230 Clerks Notice to Filer re (228 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION for Medical Exam Emergency Motion for IME with Memo of Law. Emergency Document Filed Electronically; ERROR - The Filer failed to file an emergency document in the conventional paper format. Emergency matters may not be filed electronically, they must be filed in the conventional paper format in the division where the judge is chambered. The Clerk contacted Chambers and corrected the docket text to indicate the document is an emergency matter. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(tp)
July 29, 2009 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 227 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (jmd)
July 29, 2009 Filing 229 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein of IME of Plaintiff CMA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pike, Michael)
July 29, 2009 Filing 228 Defendant's MOTION for Medical Exam Emergency Motion for IME with Memo of Law by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pike, Michael)
July 29, 2009 Filing 226 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Horowitz, Adam)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER striking (223) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM; striking (126) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:08-cv-80232-KAM; striking (143) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:08-cv-80380-KAM; striking (127) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:08-cv-80381-KAM; striking (141) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:08-cv-80811-KAM; striking (107) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:08-cv-80893-KAM; striking (94) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:08-cv-80993-KAM; striking (79) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:08-cv-80994-KAM; striking (52) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:09-cv-80469-KAM; striking (66) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:09-cv-80591-KAM; striking (44) Motion for Protective Order in case 9:09-cv-80656-KAM. Documents stricken for failure to follow Court's orders. Do NOT file identical motion in every Epstein case when that motion is only supposed to be filed in 08-80119. See Case Management Order for details. Filer may refile the motion for protective order correctly in ONLY 08-80119.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/29/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(mkz)
July 29, 2009 Filing 224 NOTICE by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 re #192 Order, Plaintiffs Jane Doe Nos. 101 and 102's Notice of Filing Proposed Order for the Preservation of Evidence in Compliance with Court's Order (DE # 192) and Certificate of Having Conferred (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ezell, Katherine)
July 29, 2009 Filing 223 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Horowitz, Adam)
July 29, 2009 Filing 222 NOTICE of Striking #221 Notice of Compliance, filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 Notice of Striking Docket Entry by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 (Ezell, Katherine)
July 28, 2009 Filing 221 STRICKEN BY DE #222 NOTICE of Compliance WITH COURTS ORDER by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 re #192 Order, #114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 (Ezell, Katherine) Modified on 7/30/2009 (tp).
July 28, 2009 Filing 220 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order DE #192 by Jeffrey Epstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Critton, Robert)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ENDORSED ORDER granting #218 Motion for Extension of Time to File Court Order. The parties have until 7/28/09 to submit an agreed order granting Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/24/2009. (ir)
July 24, 2009 Filing 218 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit Agreed Order by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
July 23, 2009 Filing 217 REPLY to Response to Motion re #165 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Restraining Fraudulent Transfer of ASsets, Appointment of a Receiver To Take Charge of Property of Epstein and to Post a $15 Million Bond to Secure Potential Judgment filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edwards, Bradley)
July 21, 2009 Filing 216 RESPONSE in Opposition re #207 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Treatment Records from Parent-Child Center, Inc., Dr. Serge Thys, Dominique Hyppolite/School District of Palm Beach County, Good Samaritan Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital, Florida Atlantic Uni filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ENDORSED ORDER granting #208 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Order. The parties have until 7/24/09 to file an agreed order for the preservation of evidence. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/20/2009. (ir)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ENDORSED ORDER granting #209 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's reply may exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/20/2009. (ir)
July 20, 2009 Filing 213 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit of Defendant by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
July 20, 2009 Filing 212 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories by Jane Doe. Responses due by 8/6/2009 (Edwards, Bradley)
July 20, 2009 Filing 211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Request for Admissions by Jane Doe. Responses due by 8/6/2009 (Edwards, Bradley)
July 20, 2009 Filing 210 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production by Jane Doe. Responses due by 8/6/2009 (Edwards, Bradley)
July 20, 2009 Filing 209 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply to Def Memo in Opp to Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Bradley)
July 20, 2009 Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit Agreed Order Pursuant to DE 192 by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
July 20, 2009 Filing 207 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Treatment Records from Parent-Child Center, Inc., Dr. Serge Thys, Dominique Hyppolite/School District of Palm Beach County, Good Samaritan Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital, Florida Atlantic University and Glorida C. Hakkarainen, M.D. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by C.M.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hill, Jack)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying #65 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/16/2009. (ir)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #128 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/16/2009. (ir)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Granting #201 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for No Contact. Response due on or before 7/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 7/14/2009. (sa)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Granting #200 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to #91 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90). Reply due on or before 7/31/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 7/14/2009. (sa)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER striking (194) Motion to Compel; striking (195) Motion to Compel; striking (196) Motion to Compel in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM; striking (120) Motion to Compel; striking (121) Motion to Compel; striking (122) Motion to Compel in case 9:08-cv-80232-KAM; striking (137) Motion to Compel; striking (138) Motion to Compel; striking (139) Motion to Compel in case 9:08-cv-80380-KAM; striking (121) Motion to Compel; striking (122) Motion to Compel; striking (123) Motion to Compel in case 9:08-cv-80381-KAM; striking (130) Motion to Compel; striking (131) Motion to Compel; striking (132) Motion to Compel in case 9:08-cv-80811-KAM; striking (97) Motion to Compel; striking (98) Motion to Compel; striking (99) Motion to Compel in case 9:08-cv-80893-KAM; striking (88) Motion to Compel; striking (89) Motion to Compel; striking (90) Motion to Compel in case 9:08-cv-80993-KAM; striking (73) Motion to Compel; striking (74) Motion to Compel; striking (75) Motion to Compel in case 9:08-cv-80994-KAM; striking (43) Motion to Compel; striking (44) Motion to Compel; striking (45) Motion to Compel in case 9:09-cv-80469-KAM; striking (60) Motion to Compel; striking (61) Motion to Compel; striking (62) Motion to Compel in case 9:09-cv-80591-KAM; striking (38) Motion to Compel; striking (39) Motion to Compel; striking (40) Motion to Compel in case 9:09-cv-80656-KAM MOTIONS STRICKEN FOR FAILURE TO FOLLOW COURT'S ORDERS. DISCOVERY MOTIONS ARE ONLY TO BE FILED IN 08-80119, NOT IN EVERY EPSTEIN CASE.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/14/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(mkz)
July 13, 2009 Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #145 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order order)(Pike, Michael)
July 13, 2009 Filing 200 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #144 Response to Motion, by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Granting #185 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 7/13/2009. (sa)
July 13, 2009 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #165 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Restraining Fraudulent Transfer of ASsets, Appointment of a Receiver To Take Charge of Property of Epstein and to Post a $15 Million Bond to Secure Potential Judgment by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
July 10, 2009 Filing 197 Sealed Document (asl) (jmd).
July 10, 2009 Filing 196 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Jane Doe. Responses due by 7/27/2009 Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Edwards, Bradley)
July 10, 2009 Filing 195 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Response to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions by Jane Doe. Responses due by 7/27/2009 Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Edwards, Bradley)
July 10, 2009 Filing 194 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production by Jane Doe. Responses due by 7/27/2009 Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Edwards, Bradley)
July 10, 2009 Filing 193 NOTICE by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 re #191 Order Notice of Filing Non-Prosecution Agreement Under Seal for In Camera Review (Ezell, Katherine)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER on #114 Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. Parties to submit proposed order by 7/20/09. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/6/2009. (ir)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER to file non-prosecution agreement under seal for in camera review. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/6/2009. (ir)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ENDORSED ORDER granting #188 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #165 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Restraining Fraudulent Transfer of Assets, Appointment of a Receiver To Take Charge of Property of Epstein and to Post a $15 Million Bond to Secure Potential Judgment. Responses due by 7/16/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/7/2009. (ir)
July 6, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #91 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90). Replies due by 7/14/2009. (See DE# 189.) (wc)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #186 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply. Defendant has until July 14, 2009 to file a Reply to Plaintiffs Jane Doe's 2-7 Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Identity.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/6/2009. (mkz)
July 6, 2009 Filing 188 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #165 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Restraining Fraudulent Transfer of ASsets, Appointment of a Receiver To Take Charge of Property of Epstein and to Post a $15 Million Bond to Secure Potential Judgment by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying motion to reset trial dates and pretrial deadlines for Cases 08-80811 and 08-80893. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/5/2009. (ir)
July 6, 2009 Filing 186 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #144 Response to Motion, by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
July 2, 2009 Filing 185 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order A)Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM, 9:08-cv-80893-KAM(Horowitz, Adam)
June 29, 2009 Filing 184 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO UNSEAL THE NONPROSECUTION AGREEMENT Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to File Under Seal Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay or, in the Alternative, to Unseal the Non-Prosecution Agreement filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. (Ezell, Katherine)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #182 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply. Defendant shall file a Reply to Plaintiff, Jane Doe (80893)'s Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Cases from Current Trial Docket on or before July 6, 2009.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/26/2009. (mkz)
June 26, 2009 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #146 Response in Opposition to Motion by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
June 26, 2009 Filing 181 RESPONSE/REPLY to #147 Response in Opposition to Motion by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
June 24, 2009 Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Stay held on 06\12\09 before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Court Reporter: Larry Herr, Phone: 305-523-5290. 1-51 pages. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/15/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2009. (lh)
June 23, 2009 Filing 179 Clerks Notice to Filer re #177 . ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#178]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
June 22, 2009 Filing 178 REPLY to Response to Motion re #114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. [See Image at DE #177] (ls)
June 22, 2009 Filing 177 RESPONSE in Support re #114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Josefsberg, Robert)
June 22, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #128 MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO UNSEAL THE NONPROSECUTION AGREEMENT. Replies due by 6/30/2009. (See DE# 174.) (wc)
June 22, 2009 Filing 176 NOTICE of Striking #167 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated MemoranPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated Memoran filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 Plaintiff's Notice of Striking Docket Entry by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 (Josefsberg, Robert)
June 22, 2009 Filing 175 Clerks Notice to Filer re #169 . ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting (DE 169) Unopposed Amended Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply. Plaintiffs have until June 30, 2009 to file their reply.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 06/22/2009. (mkz)
June 22, 2009 Filing 173 Clerks Notice to Filer re #167 . CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The proposed order was not attached. Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (ls)
June 22, 2009 Filing 172 Clerks Notice to Filer re #165 . ERROR - The Filer did not select all motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying as moot #166 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. See Amended Motion (DE 169).. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/22/2009. (mkz)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #148 Motion to Amend/Correct.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/22/2009. (mkz)
June 22, 2009 Filing 169 Unopposed Amended Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #128 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay or, in the alternative, to Unseal the Non-Prosecution Agreement filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josefsberg, Robert) Modified on 6/22/2009 (ls).
June 22, 2009 Filing 168 REPLY to Response to Motion re #114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josefsberg, Robert) Modified on 6/22/2009 (ls).
June 19, 2009 Filing 167 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josefsberg, Robert) Modified on 6/22/2009 (ls).
June 19, 2009 Filing 166 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #128 MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO UNSEAL THE NONPROSECUTION AGREEMENT by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josefsberg, Robert) Modified on 6/22/2009 (ls).
June 19, 2009 Filing 165 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Restraining Fraudulent Transfer of ASsets, Appointment of a Receiver To Take Charge of Property of Epstein and to Post a $15 Million Bond to Secure Potential Judgment by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Bradley) Modified on 6/22/2009 (ls).
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ENDORSED ORDER granting #162 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to response to Motion to Strike. Replies due by 6/26/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/19/2009. (ir)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ENDORSED ORDER granting #161 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to response to Motion to Strike. Replies due by 6/26/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/19/2009. (ir)
June 18, 2009 Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #146 Response in Opposition to Motion by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
June 18, 2009 Filing 161 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #147 Response in Opposition to Motion by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ENDORSED ORDER granting #157 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #145 Notice of Joinder in Plaintiffs Jane Does 101 and 102 Motion for No Contact Order. Responses due by 7/14/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/17/2009. (ir)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ENDORSED ORDER granting #158 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re #144 Response to Motion to Compel Identity. Replies due by 6/29/2009.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/17/2009. (ir)
June 17, 2009 Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #144 Response to Motion, by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
June 17, 2009 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #145 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER STRIKING (68 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM, 35 in 9:09-cv-80469-KAM, 30 in 9:09-cv-80656-KAM, 45 in 9:09-cv-80591-KAM, 83 in 9:08-cv-80893-KAM, 145 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM, 116 in 9:08-cv-80811-KAM, 114 in 9:08-cv-80232-KAM, 82 in 9:08-cv-80993-KAM, 115 in 9:08-cv-80381-KAM, 131 in 9:08-cv-80380-KAM) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Jane Doe, (29 in 9:09-cv-80656-KAM, 114 in 9:08-cv-80381-KAM, 115 in 9:08-cv-80811-KAM, 144 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM, 130 in 9:08-cv-80380-KAM, 67 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM, 113 in 9:08-cv-80232-KAM, 81 in 9:08-cv-80993-KAM, 82 in 9:08-cv-80893-KAM, 34 in 9:09-cv-80469-KAM, 44 in 9:09-cv-80591-KAM) Response to Motion, filed by Jane Doe. THESE DOCUMENTS SHOULD BE FILED ONLY IN CASE 08-80119.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 06/15/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al. (lc3)
June 12, 2009 Filing 155 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Jane Doe No. 101. (Ezell, Katherine)
June 12, 2009 Filing 154 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra: Motion Hearing held on 6/12/2009 re #65 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #56 Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Court Reporter: Larry Herr, Phone: 305-523-5290 (ir)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ENDORSED ORDER granting Martin G. Weinberg #140 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Counsel must contact the courtroom deputy at 561-514-3765 to make arrangement to appear telephonically. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/10/2009. (ir)
June 10, 2009 Filing 152 RESPONSE to Motion re #128 MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO UNSEAL THE NONPROSECUTION AGREEMENT filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Replies due by 6/22/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pike, Michael)
June 10, 2009 Filing 151 RESPONSE to Motion re #114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Replies due by 6/22/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Pike, Michael)
June 10, 2009 Filing 150 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jeffrey Epstein. Amendment to #69 Answer to Amended Complaint, #56 Amended Complaint. (Pike, Michael)
June 9, 2009 Filing 149 RESPONSE/REPLY to #124 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Motion to Compel Identity by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Pike, Michael)
June 9, 2009 Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #69 Answer to Amended Complaint by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 6/26/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
June 8, 2009 Filing 147 RESPONSE in Opposition re #104 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Cases from Current Trial Docket filed by C.M.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hill, Jack)
June 8, 2009 Filing 146 RESPONSE in Opposition re #104 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Cases from Current Trial Docket filed by Jane Doe. (Edwards, Bradley)
June 8, 2009 Filing 145 NOTICE by Jane Doe re (113 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Plaintiff's MOTION Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe 102's Motion for No-Contact Order -Plaintiffs Jane Does 2-7 Notice of Joinder Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Horowitz, Adam)
June 8, 2009 Filing 144 RESPONSE to Motion re (91 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90) filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 6/18/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Horowitz, Adam)
June 5, 2009 Filing 143 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #94 Response in Opposition to Motion, #67 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Response to 1st RTP, #93 Response in Opposition to Motion, #110 Response/Reply (Other), #68 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Answers to 1st Interrogs by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
June 5, 2009 Filing 142 NOTICE of Striking #141 Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by Jeffrey Epstein by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
June 5, 2009 Filing 141 STRICKEN BY DE #142 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #124 Response in Opposition to Motion, #113 Plaintiff's MOTION Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe 102's Motion for No-Contact Order, #91 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90) by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael) Modified on 6/8/2009 (tp).
June 5, 2009 Filing 140 MOTION for Limited Appearance by Telephone for Martin G. Weinberg, Filing Fee $75.00, Receipt #725916. (cw)
June 5, 2009 Filing 139 NOTICE of Striking #133 Defendant's MOTION for Limited Admission by Telephone filed by Jeffrey Epstein by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying #133 Motion for Limited Admission by telephone. See Clerks Office's instructions in DE 135. The attorneys may file motions to appear telephonically at the hearing if their pro hac vice motions, filed conventionally 06/04/09, are granted.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 06/04/2009. (lc3)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER STRIKING (112 in 9:08-cv-80381-KAM, 111 in 9:08-cv-80232-KAM, 136 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM, 111 in 9:08-cv-80811-KAM, 128 in 9:08-cv-80380-KAM, 65 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM, 79 in 9:08-cv-80893-KAM, 42 in 9:09-cv-80591-KAM, 27 in 9:09-cv-80656-KAM, 32 in 9:09-cv-80469-KAM, 79 in 9:08-cv-80993-KAM) Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 Document stricken for failure to follow Court's orders. DO NOT FILE A DOCUMENT IN EVERY EPSTEIN CASE if it is to be filed only in 08-80119. See Case Management Order and contact CM/ECF Support for assistance in proper filing.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/4/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al. (lc3)
June 4, 2009 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to Motion re (113 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Plaintiff's MOTION Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe 102's Motion for No-Contact Order Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Reply to Defendant Jeffrey Epstein's Response to Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for a No-Contact Order filed by Jane Doe No. 101, Jane Doe No. 102. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Ezell, Katherine)
June 3, 2009 Filing 135 Clerks Notice of Instruction to Filer Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion. Pursuant to 2B in the Administrative Procedures, a motion to make a limited appearance must be filed in the conventional manner along with the applicable filing fee. LOCAL COUNSEL IS INSTRUCTED TO 1. FILE A NOTICE TO STRIKE DE#133 Defendant's MOTION for Limited Admission by Telephone filed by Jeffrey Epstein AND 2. CONVENTIONALLY FILE AN ORIGINAL MOTION TO MAKE A LIMITED APPEARANCE ALONG WITH THE APPLICABLE FILING FEE. (cw)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting #102 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 5/20/09 to file a Reply to Plaintiffs' Jane Does 2-7 Responses in Opposition to Motion to Compel Answers to First set of Interrogatories and First Request to Produce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/3/2009. (sa)
June 3, 2009 Filing 133 Defendant's MOTION for Limited Admission by Telephone by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Pike, Michael)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting #87 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel. Response due by 5/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/1/2009. (sa)
June 1, 2009 Filing 131 Sealed Document. (igo) (jmd).
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #129 Motion to Reschedule Hearing. The hearing will not be reset. However, Robert Josefsberg may appear telephonically. Mr. Josefsberg shall contact the courtroom deputy at 561-514-3765 chambers at least 24 hours prior to the hearing.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 06/01/09. (lc3)
June 1, 2009 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Calendar Call set for 5/28/2010 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Jury Trial set for 6/1/2010 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Discovery due by 12/11/2009., Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2010. (ir)
May 29, 2009 Filing 129 MOTION for Hearing MOTION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Josefsberg, Robert)
May 29, 2009 Filing 128 MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO UNSEAL THE NONPROSECUTION AGREEMENT by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Ezell, Katherine)
May 29, 2009 Filing 127 RESPONSE to Motion re #113 Plaintiff's MOTION Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe 102's Motion for No-Contact Order filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Replies due by 6/8/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pike, Michael)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #65 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #56 Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2009 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/29/2009. (ir)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER STRIKING (124 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM, 105 in 9:08-cv-80811-KAM, 74 in 9:08-cv-80993-KAM, 72 in 9:08-cv-80893-KAM, 106 in 9:08-cv-80232-KAM, 123 in 9:08-cv-80380-KAM, 35 in 9:09-cv-80591-KAM, 25 in 9:09-cv-80469-KAM, 60 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM, 22 in 9:09-cv-80656-KAM, 107 in 9:08-cv-80381-KAM) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101 DO NOT FILE IN EVERY EPSTEIN CASE. SEE ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/29/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al. (lc3)
May 29, 2009 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re (90 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identify Doe in Style of Case and in Third-Party Subpoenas, (91 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90) filed by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Ezell, Katherine)
May 29, 2009 Filing 123 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein re #102 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to (39 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM) Response in Opposition to Motion, (40 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM) Response in Opposition to MotionDefendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to (39 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM) Response in Opposition to Motion, (40 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM) Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Pike, Michael)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ENDORSED ORDER granting #111 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #91 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90). Jane Does 2-7 Responses due by 6/11/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/28/2009. (ir)
May 29, 2009 Filing 121 RESPONSE to Motion re (72 in 9:08-cv-80380-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (62) Amended Complaint, (57 in 9:08-cv-80232-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (50) Amended Complaint, (24 in 9:08-cv-80893-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (1) Complaint, (23 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (18) Amended Complaint, (22 in 9:08-cv-80993-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (19) Amended Complaint, (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint, (68 in 9:08-cv-80381-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (60) Amended Complaint, (51 in 9:08-cv-80811-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (40) Amended Complaint and or Continue Action Filed Pursuant to Court's Order Requesting Government's Position filed by United States of America. Replies due by 6/8/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Villafana, Ann Marie)
May 29, 2009 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ann Marie C. Villafana on behalf of United States of America Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Villafana, Ann Marie)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #104 Motion to Continue as to Jane Does 2-7 and reserved as to C.M.A. and Jane Doe 80893. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/28/2009. (ir)
May 28, 2009 Filing 118 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #67 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Response to 1st RTP, #68 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Answers to 1st Interrogs by Jeffrey Epstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pike, Michael)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER STRIKING Notice by Jane Doe in all Epstein cases EXCEPT in case 08-80119. This Notice should only be filed in 08-80119, not in all of the Epstein cases... Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/28/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al. (lc3)
May 27, 2009 Filing 116 NOTICE by Jane Doe re (111 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (91 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90)Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (91 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Horowitz, Adam)
May 27, 2009 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Identify C.M.A. in Third-Party Subpoenas for Purposes of Discovery, or Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss Sua Sponte, With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Pike, Michael)
May 26, 2009 Filing 114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe No. 102's Motion for an Order for the Preservation of Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe No. 101, Jane Doe No. 102. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM, 9:09-cv-80591-KAM, 9:09-cv-80656-KAM(Ezell, Katherine)
May 22, 2009 Filing 113 Plaintiff's MOTION Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 101 and Jane Doe 102's Motion for No-Contact Order by Jane Doe No. 102, Jane Doe No. 101. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Portion to Plea Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - 4/17/09 letter, #3 Exhibit C - 5/16/09 e-mail, #4 Exhibit D - 5/18/09 letter, #5 Exhibit E - 5/21/09 letter, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Josefsberg, Robert)
May 22, 2009 Filing 112 NOTICE of Compliance with S.D.Fla.L.R.7.1(A)(3) by Jeffrey Epstein re #104 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Cases from Current Trial Docket filed by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
May 21, 2009 Filing 111 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (91 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90) by Jane Doe No. 6, Jane Doe No. 7, Jane Doe, Jane Doe No. 5, Jane Doe No. 4, Jane Doe No. 3. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Mermelstein, Stuart)
May 20, 2009 Filing 110 RESPONSE/REPLY to #93 Response in Opposition to Motion To Compel Answers To Discovery by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Pike, Michael)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER STRIKING in all Epstein cases EXCEPT case no. 08-80119: Notice by C.M.A. of Filing Withdrawal of Previously Raised Objections to Epstein's Motion to Compel and/or Identify. This Notice should only be filed in 08-80119, not in all of the Epstein cases.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/20/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al. (lc3)
May 20, 2009 Filing 108 NOTICE by C.M.A. of Filing Withdrawal of Previously Raised Objections to Defendant, Jeffrey Epstein's Motion to Compel And/Or Identify C.M.A. in the Style of This Case and Motion to Identify C.M.A. in Third-Party Subpoenas for Purposes of Discovery, Or, Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss Sua Sponte, With Inorporated Memorandum of Law Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Hill, Jack)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #105 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Ross Tein terminated. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/20/2009. (ir)
May 20, 2009 Filing 106 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re #105 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as as Co-counsel filed by Jeffrey Epstein. The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the Motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include all applicable relief events. (tp)
May 19, 2009 Filing 105 MOTION Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Co-Counsel by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tein, Michael) Modified relief on 5/20/2009 (tp).
May 19, 2009 Filing 104 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Cases from Current Trial Docket by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 6/8/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Pike, Michael)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ENDORSED ORDER granting #101 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #91 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90). Responses due by 5/26/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/18/2009. (ir)
May 18, 2009 Filing 102 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to (39 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM) Response in Opposition to Motion, (40 in 9:08-cv-80994-KAM) Response in Opposition to Motion by Jeffrey Epstein. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al.(Pike, Michael)
May 15, 2009 Filing 101 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Identify C.M.A. in Third-Party Subpoenas for Purposes of Discovery, or Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss Sua Sponte, With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by C.M.A.. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM, 9:08-cv-80811-KAM(Hill, Jack)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying as moot #95 Motion. See Order consolidating cases.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/14/2009. (lc3)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER REQUESTING UNITED STATES PROVIDE POSITION TO MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/14/2009. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Motion to Stay DE 51) Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al. (ir)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Hereinafter all motions and other court filings that relate to discovery and all procedural motions that relate to multiple cases shall be styled with all of the case names and numbers and shall be filed in Case No. 08-80119-CIV-MARRA. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/14/2009. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80119-KAM et al. (ir)
May 13, 2009 Filing 97 RESPONSE/REPLY to #82 Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay and/or Continue Action by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
May 12, 2009 Filing 96 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re #95 Defendant's MOTION Require Plaintiff to Use Proper Case Style filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Error - Docket text does not match document; Correction - Docket text modified by Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
May 11, 2009 Filing 95 Defendant's MOTION for Order Requiring that plaintiff use Proper Case Style in all Filings by Jeffrey Epstein. (Critton, Robert) Modified on 5/12/2009 (ls). [Text modified by Clerk]
May 6, 2009 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Response to 1st RTP , Overrule Objections and for an Award of Reasonable Expenses filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horowitz, Adam)
May 6, 2009 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Answers to 1st Interrogs and for an Award of Reasonable Expenses filed by Jane Doe. (Horowitz, Adam)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ENDORSED ORDER granting (89) Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80232-KAM; granting (97) Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80380-KAM; granting (82) Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80381-KAM; granting (46) Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80993-KAM; granting (37) Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80994-KAM in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM. ( Replies due by 5/20/2009.). Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/5/2009. (ir)
May 5, 2009 Filing 91 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identity of Doe in Style of Case and Third-Party Subpoenas (replaces Docket entry 90) by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 5/22/2009 (Critton, Robert)
May 5, 2009 Filing 90 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Identify Doe in Style of Case and in Third-Party Subpoenas by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 5/22/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Critton, Robert)
May 5, 2009 Filing 89 Motion for Extension of Time to File REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #56 Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael) Modified on 5/6/2009 (ir).
May 4, 2009 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #86 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
April 29, 2009 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #67 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Response to 1st RTP, #68 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Answers to 1st Interrogs by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Protective Order and Consolidating Cases for Purposes of Discovery. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/28/2009. (cqs)
April 27, 2009 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support re #66 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting #80 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response in Opposition to #67 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Response to First Request to Produce, #68 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Answers to 1st Interrogatories. Response due by 4/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 4/27/2009. (sa)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting #70 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply Memoranda as to #63 Response to Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents. Reply due by 4/20/2009.Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 4/27/2009. (sa)
April 23, 2009 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #56 Amended Complaint filed by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 20, 2009 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Support re #57 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Jane Doe. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 17, 2009 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #67 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Response to 1st RTP, #68 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Answers to 1st Interrogs by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 17, 2009 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Motion re #66 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Replies due by 4/27/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pike, Michael)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ENDORSED ORDER granting (77) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (66 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM; granting (84) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (66 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support in case 9:08-cv-80380-KAM; granting (35) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (66 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support in case 9:08-cv-80993-KAM in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM. ( Responses due by 4/24/2009). Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/17/2009. (ir)
April 16, 2009 Filing 77 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #66 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support, 74 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 72 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ENDORSED ORDER granting (75) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM; granting (67) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80232-KAM; granting (82) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80380-KAM; granting (73) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80381-KAM; granting (33) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80993-KAM; granting (27) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (65 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Defendant's MOTION to Stay re (56) Amended Complaint in case 9:08-cv-80994-KAM in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM. ( Responses due by 4/23/2009). Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/14/2009. (ir)
April 13, 2009 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response /Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Stay and/or Continue Action by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ENDORSED ORDER granting (73) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (66 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (66 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support in case 9:08-cv-80232-KAM; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (66 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support in case 9:08-cv-80380-KAM; granting (31) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (66 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support in case 9:08-cv-80993-KAM in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM. Responses due by 4/16/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/13/2009. (ir)
April 10, 2009 Filing 73 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #66 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support, 72 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, (Amended) by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #66 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support. Responses due by 4/13/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/7/2009. (ir)
April 6, 2009 Filing 71 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #66 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Jeffrey Epstein. (Pike, Michael)
April 3, 2009 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #63 Response to Motion, to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
April 2, 2009 Filing 69 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint (Second) by Jeffrey Epstein.(Pike, Michael)
April 2, 2009 Filing 68 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Answers to 1st Interrogs by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 4/20/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Critton, Robert)
April 2, 2009 Filing 67 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Response to 1st RTP by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 4/20/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Critton, Robert)
March 26, 2009 Filing 66 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Jane Doe No. 3, Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mermelstein, Stuart)
March 25, 2009 Filing 65 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #56 Amended Complaint by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 4/13/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pike, Michael)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting #62 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 3/24/2009. (sa)
March 25, 2009 Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re #57 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Replies due by 4/6/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Critton, Robert)
March 18, 2009 Filing 62 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with proposed Order by Jeffrey Epstein. (Critton, Robert)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #57 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Responses due by 3/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 3/12/2009. (kza)
March 6, 2009 Filing 60 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #57 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support with proposed Order by Jeffrey Epstein. (Critton, Robert)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ENDORSED ORDER granting #58 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Jeffrey Epstein response due 4/3/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/5/2009. (ir)
March 4, 2009 Filing 58 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #56 Amended Complaint with proposed Order by Jeffrey Epstein. (Critton, Robert)
March 2, 2009 Filing 57 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Jane Doe. Responses due by 3/19/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Horowitz, Adam)
February 27, 2009 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second), filed by Jane Doe.(Horowitz, Adam)
February 23, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE by Jane Doe of Change of Name of Plaintiff's Counsel (Horowitz, Adam)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #46 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/12/2009. (ir)
December 30, 2008 Filing 53 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein of Withdrawal as Co-Counsel (Tein, Michael)
November 13, 2008 Filing 52 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re #50 Response/Reply (Other) filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Error - Wrong Event Selected; Correction - Redocketed by Clerk as Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss". Instruction to Filer - In the future, please select the proper event. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
November 10, 2008 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #42 Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement filed by Jeffrey Epstein. See DE #50 for image (tp)
November 10, 2008 Filing 50 RESPONSE/REPLY to #49 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Jeffrey Epstein. (Critton, Robert)
October 31, 2008 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #46 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #42 Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2008 Reset Deadlines as to Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (49) Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement. Responses due by 10/31/2008. (ir)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting (47 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (46) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (42) Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement ( Responses due by 10/31/2008) in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM; granting (43) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (47 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (46) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (42) Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement in case 9:08-cv-80232-KAM; granting (55) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (47 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (46) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (42) Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement in case 9:08-cv-80380-KAM; granting (53) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (47 in 9:08-cv-80119-KAM) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (46) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (42) Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement in case 9:08-cv-80381-KAM in case 9:08-cv-80119-KAM. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/24/2008. (ir)
October 24, 2008 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #46 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #42 Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2008 Filing 46 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #42 Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 10/24/2008 (Critton, Robert)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/25/2010 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Calendar Call set for 1/22/2010 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2008. Discovery due by 8/3/2009. Motions due by 8/31/2009. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson for Discovery Proceedings, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. 15 days to appoint mediator. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/29/08. (ir)
September 25, 2008 Filing 44 SCHEDULING REPORT- Rule 26(f). (Herman, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying as moot #40 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/23/08. (ir)
September 22, 2008 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Jane Doe.(Herman, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2008 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #40 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by Jane Doe. (Herman, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2008 Filing 40 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 9/22/2008 (Tein, Michael)
August 28, 2008 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re #39 Notice (Other) filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Error - Wrong Event Selected; Correction - Redocketed by Clerk as Notice of Attorney Appearance. Instruction to Filer - In the future, please select the proper event. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
August 27, 2008 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Pike, Robert Deweese Critton, Jr on behalf of Jeffrey Epstein See DE #39 for image (tp)
August 27, 2008 Filing 39 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein (Pike, Michael)
August 7, 2008 Reset Answer Due Deadline: Jeffrey Epstein response due 9/4/2008. (ir)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 Motion to approve stipulation for acceptance of service of process and agreed date for defendant's responses to complaints. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/6/08. (ir)
August 6, 2008 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Approve Stipulation for Acceptance of Service of Process and Agreed Date for Defendant's Response to Complaints by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Stipulation)(Herman, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL. The Clerk shall unseal DE 30 Sealed Document, 29 Sealed Document and make them available for public inspection through CM/ECF. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/4/08. (ir)
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Stay; granting nunc pro tunc #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond ; denying as moot #27 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/4/08. (ir)
July 30, 2008 Filing 32 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Waiver of Service (Tein, Michael)
July 29, 2008 Filing 31 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Defendant's Notice of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tein, Michael)
July 28, 2008 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Defendant's MOTION to Stay filed by Jeffrey Epstein. {Originally DE # 30 } (gp)
July 28, 2008 Filing 37 MOTION to File Under Seal Reply to Plaintiffs' responses to his motions for stay, under seal by Jeffrey Epstein. {Originally DE # 29 } (gp) Modified on 8/12/2008 (gp).
July 28, 2008 Filing 30 UNSEALED Sealed Document. (tas) -Modified on 8/12/2008 **For Image please see DE #38 ** (gp).
July 28, 2008 Filing 29 UNSEALED Sealed Document. (tas) -Modified on 8/12/2008 **For Image please see DE #37 **(gp).
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/25/08. (ir)
July 25, 2008 Filing 27 MOTION for Hearing Defendant's Request for Oral Argument by Jeffrey Epstein. (Tein, Michael)
July 21, 2008 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Jeffrey M. Herman. re #22 Order to Show Cause and Service of Process by Jane Doe. (Herman, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2008 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 Defendant's MOTION to Stay and Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe. Replies due by 7/28/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why default should not be entered against Defendant. Show Cause Response due by 7/28/2008. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/16/08. (ir)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying motion to file Ex Parte and Under Seal. The clerk shall unseal DE 19 and 20 and make them available for inspection through CM/ECF at the earliest possible time. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/16/08. (ir) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2008: #1 docket sheet) (bs).
July 10, 2008 Filing 24 UNSEALED Notice of Continued Pendency of Federal Criminal Action by Jeffrey Epstein (previously filed as 20 sealed document) (bs)
July 10, 2008 Filing 23 UNSEALED MOTION to Seal by Jeffrey Epstein. (previously filed as 19 sealed document) (bs)
July 10, 2008 Filing 20 Sealed Document. (yc) UNSEALED see DE #24 . Modified on 7/17/2008 (bs).
July 10, 2008 Filing 19 Sealed Document. (yc) UNSEALED see DE #23 . Modified on 7/17/2008 (bs).
July 10, 2008 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #12 Defendant's MOTION to Stay by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Adam)
July 8, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ross Tein on behalf of Jeffrey Epstein (Tein, Michael)
July 1, 2008 Filing 16 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Concerning Motion To Stay [DE 12] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldberger, Jack)
June 30, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE by Jeffrey Epstein Of Filing Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goldberger, Jack)
June 24, 2008 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Clerk to Enter Default Against Defendant, or Alternatively, for an Enlgargement of Time to Serve Process, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jane Doe. (Herman, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2008 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond To Complaint by Jeffrey Epstein. (Goldberger, Jack)
June 20, 2008 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Stay by Jeffrey Epstein. Responses due by 7/10/2008 (Goldberger, Jack)
June 13, 2008 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Clerk to Enter Default Against Defendant, or Alternatively, for an Enlgargement of Time to Serve Process, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Replies due by 6/23/2008. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Richard Barnett)(Goldberger, Jack)
June 13, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Alan Goldberger on behalf of Jeffrey Epstein (Goldberger, Jack)
June 11, 2008 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Clerk to Enter Default Against Defendant, or Alternatively, for an Enlgargement of Time to Serve Process, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. Responses due by 6/30/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Horowitz, Adam)
June 6, 2008 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Denying for Improper Service #7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk Against Defendant (tp)
May 29, 2008 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk Against Defendant by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Text of Proposed Order Default Ord)(Horowitz, Adam)
May 27, 2008 Filing 6 NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: re #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Jane Doe. Error: Wrong Event Selected; Correction=Redocketed as "Summons returned executed", D.E. #5 . Instruction to Filer=In the future please select "summons returned executed" as the proper Event. (lk)
May 22, 2008 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Jeffrey Epstein served on 5/7/2008, Answer due 5/27/2008. (lk)
May 22, 2008 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jeffrey Epstein on May 7, 2008, filed by Jane Doe. (Herman, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and Joint Scheduling Report.Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/8/08.(ir)
February 6, 2008 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Epstein. (lk)
February 6, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Epstein; Filing fee $ 350. Receipt#: 542215, filed by Jane Doe No.2.(lk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Herman
Represented By: Stuart S. Mermelstein
Represented By: Adam D. Horowitz
Represented By: Bradley James Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 6
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Herman
Represented By: Stuart S. Mermelstein
Represented By: Adam D. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 102
Represented By: Robert C. Josefsberg
Represented By: Katherine Warthen Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 4
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Herman
Represented By: Stuart S. Mermelstein
Represented By: Adam D. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe II
Represented By: Isidro Manuel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 5
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Herman
Represented By: Stuart S. Mermelstein
Represented By: Adam D. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 3
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Herman
Represented By: Stuart S. Mermelstein
Represented By: Adam D. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: C.M.A.
Represented By: Richard Horace Willits
Represented By: Jack Patrick Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 7
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Herman
Represented By: Stuart S. Mermelstein
Represented By: Adam D. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 101
Represented By: Robert C. Josefsberg
Represented By: Katherine Warthen Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Epstein
Represented By: Jack Alan Goldberger
Represented By: Michael James Pike
Represented By: Robert Deweese Critton, Jr.
Represented By: Martin G. Weinberg
Represented By: Michael Ross Tein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States of America
Represented By: Ann Marie C. Villafana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: Jean Luc Bruhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?