Chen v. Cayman Arts, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Carey Chen
Defendant: Cayman Arts, Inc and Scott R Steele
Case Number: 9:2010cv80236
Filed: February 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Barry S. Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 266 Motion for Reconsideration re 238 Order on Motion for Contempt and 249 Order on Motion for Contempt; denying without prejudice 257 Motion for Criminal Contempt; denying without prejudice 259 Motion for Criminal Contempt; denying without prejudice 271 Motion for Civil Contempt. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/20/2012. (awe)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER denying 227 Motion to Strike and Vacate the Alleged Settlement Agreement and the Stipulation of Dismissal and to further Stay Enforcement of the Alleged Settlement Agreement, by Scott R Steele. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 1/11/2012. (awe)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting 220 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Relating to the Digital Copies and Files of Plaintiff's Works and request for sanctions. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/12/2011. (awe)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER overruling 218 Renewed Objection; denying 217 Motion for Reconsideration re 216 Order Granting Motion to Compel; denying 217 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 206 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/23/2011. (awe)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/6/2011. (awe)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 120 Third-Party Plaintiff Cayman Arts, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw Admissions (as to Third-Party Defendants' Requests for Admission); granting 123 Defendants', Cayman Arts,Inc. and Scott R. Steele, Motion to Withdraw Admissions as to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/29/2011. (kas)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 114 Fisher's Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production; granting 117 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatories and Request for Production, Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/22/2011. (kas)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Strike; striking 91 Motion to Dismiss; directing Third-Party Defendants to respond to 51 Third Party Complaint by 3/25/2011. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 3/21/2011. (awe)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is GRANTED in Plaintiff's favor as to Count X(a) of the Amended Complaint and Count II of the Counterclaim. In all other respects, summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 2/24/2011. (awe)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 83 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Third-Party Defendants shall respond to 51 Third-Party Complaint by no later than 2/25/2011. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 2/11/2011. (awe)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Dismiss; denying 62 Motion for Sanctions. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/24/2010. (awe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Cayman Arts, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Chen
Represented By: Janet Bernstein Teebagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cayman Arts, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?