Chen v. Cayman Arts, Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Carey Chen |
Defendant: |
Cayman Arts, Inc and Scott R Steele |
Case Number: |
9:2010cv80236 |
Filed: |
February 12, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Florida |
Office: |
West Palm Beach Office |
County: |
Palm Beach |
Presiding Judge: |
James I. Cohn |
Presiding Judge: |
Barry S. Seltzer |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
298
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 266 Motion for Reconsideration re 238 Order on Motion for Contempt and 249 Order on Motion for Contempt; denying without prejudice 257 Motion for Criminal Contempt; denying without prejudice 259 Motion for Criminal Contempt; denying without prejudice 271 Motion for Civil Contempt. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/20/2012. (awe)
|
January 11, 2012 |
Filing
237
ORDER denying 227 Motion to Strike and Vacate the Alleged Settlement Agreement and the Stipulation of Dismissal and to further Stay Enforcement of the Alleged Settlement Agreement, by Scott R Steele. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 1/11/2012. (awe)
|
December 12, 2011 |
Filing
230
ORDER granting 220 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Relating to the Digital Copies and Files of Plaintiff's Works and request for sanctions. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/12/2011. (awe)
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing
219
ORDER overruling 218 Renewed Objection; denying 217 Motion for Reconsideration re 216 Order Granting Motion to Compel; denying 217 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 206 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/23/2011. (awe)
|
September 6, 2011 |
Filing
187
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/6/2011. (awe)
|
June 29, 2011 |
Filing
145
ORDER granting 120 Third-Party Plaintiff Cayman Arts, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw Admissions (as to Third-Party Defendants' Requests for Admission); granting 123 Defendants', Cayman Arts,Inc. and Scott R. Steele, Motion to Withdraw Admissions as to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/29/2011. (kas)
|
June 22, 2011 |
Filing
135
ORDER granting 114 Fisher's Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production; granting 117 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatories and Request for Production, Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/22/2011. (kas)
|
March 21, 2011 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting 92 Motion to Strike; striking 91 Motion to Dismiss; directing Third-Party Defendants to respond to 51 Third Party Complaint by 3/25/2011. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 3/21/2011. (awe)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
87
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is GRANTED in Plaintiff's favor as to Count X(a) of the Amended Complaint and Count II of the Counterclaim. In all other respects, summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 2/24/2011. (awe)
|
February 11, 2011 |
Filing
86
ORDER denying 83 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Third-Party Defendants shall respond to 51 Third-Party Complaint by no later than 2/25/2011. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 2/11/2011. (awe)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing
69
ORDER denying 28 Motion to Dismiss; denying 62 Motion for Sanctions. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/24/2010. (awe)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?