Keim v. ADF Midatlantic, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brian Keim
Defendant: ADF Midatlantic, LLC, American Huts, Inc., ADF Pizza I, LLC and ADF PA, LLC
Case Number: 9:2012cv80577
Filed: May 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A. Marra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 299 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Production of Carrier Subpoena Communications. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying 100 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/10/2016. (ir)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER denying 33 Motion to Strike ; denying 33 Motion to Certify Class; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/12/2013. (ir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keim v. ADF Midatlantic, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keim
Represented By: Scott David Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADF Midatlantic, LLC
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Represented By: Moises Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Huts, Inc.
Represented By: Moises Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADF Pizza I, LLC
Represented By: Moises Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADF PA, LLC
Represented By: Moises Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?