Montes v. Chiquita Brands International Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DINA LUZ PEREZ POLO, Elvia Lucia Bolivar Garcia, Rosiris del Carmen Morales, LUZ SORAYA ARANGO RODRIGUEZ, Rosalba Durango, Francisco Javier Villada Llano, Edelmira Padilla Moreno, Luz Ofelia Jaramill Parra, DIANA PATRICIA CORREA MARIN, MARIA MARGARITA RUIZ MORALES, Orlando de Jesus Garcia Betancur, Leocadia Marmolejo Palacios, MARTHA NELLY GEORGE GANAN, TERESA TRILLO NAVARRO, HECTOR MANUEL GUTIERRE CARDENAS, BERNARDINO TAPIAS CORDOBA, GEOVANIS SANTANA DIAZ, Gregoria Tapia Marimon, Maria Dolores Ospina de Mesa, ROSANGELA VIDALES PALACIO, Fanny de Jesus Maldon de Bolivar, CRISTINA PARDO TRIANA, Luz Marina Tuberqui Osorio, Maria Romelia Rios, Maria Glabed Londono Aguirre, LUZ MARY GOMEZ, Liliana Maria Garcia Garcia, Darlis Palma Mosquera, Rosa Esneda Guisao Higuita, Walter Javier Madrigal Goez, MARIA CECILIA BANQUET SANCHEZ, MARIA ELVIRA SANCHEZ DE MENDOZA, HIRNIA CARTAGENA CORDOBA, LIBIA ATENCIO PAJARO, MARTHA ISABEL MARULAND VILLA, PABLO ANTONIO VARELAS, Martha Luz Ayazo Gomez, Maria Rosa Figueroa Pena, AYDA CASTRO BELTRAN, ARISTARCO PALACIOS HINESTROZA, LUZ AIDA RUIZ, Laurina Agueda Narvaez Ramos, KATIA MERCEDES VALLE MENDEZ, Maria Bergelia Mosque Chaverra, Hernan de Jesus Serna, VENANCIO VIERA CORRALES, Emerita Sofia Gonzalez Gonzalez, Gloria Elsy Lopez Munera, Claudia Esther Mena Mosquera, SANDRA ISABEL LOPEZ PENA, TEODORA MARIA CORDERO VILLALBA, ENADIS JUDITH ALTAMIRA BENITEZ, Maria Eugenia Ubaldo Cuesta, SIXTA SOLAR DE JULIO, MILADYS GUERRERO HERRERA, Gloria Eugenia Munoz, FALCONERY GOMEZ PUERTA, Esperanza del Socorro Lujan, ANDREA SANTOYA HERNANDEZ, Ursula del Carmen Caba Marquez, ANA FELICIA DELGADO, Gloria Estella Montoya, CARMEN TULIA MESTRA DORIA, DORA ANGELA DAVID BEDOYA, Luis Alfonso Botero Botero, Nancy Rodas Gallego, Leticia de Jesus Rojas Cardona, Carmen Julia Chica de Suaza, MARIA MARLENEY CANAVE LAVERDE, Luis Eduardo Morales, LUCELLY CARVAJAL NISPERUZA, ELIZABETH CALDERON GALVIS, Gustavo Miguel Villadie Martinez, Marlyn Arcos de Arcos, VERONICA ISABEL GOMEZ LENIS, Ruth Fanery Ochoa Salgado, Maria Elena Carmona de Cardona, NINFA TORRES VERA, JAMEL MACHADO PEREZ, MARIA CONSUELO ZUELTA LAVERDE, DIOCELINA VERGARA JARAMILLO, NURY PARRA LOBON, OSCAR LUIS CHARRASQUI GARCIA, Felicidad Lemos Avila, Maria del Socorro Arroyave, ANA TERESA CORDOBA CORRREA, DORIS DEL CARMEN HOYO DE CAPACHERO, ROSIRIS BORJA GRACIANO, Flor Elena Echavarri Osorio, Maria Evangelina Cana de Morales and Gloria Ines Marin Velasquez
Defendant: Cyrus Freidheim, William A Tsacalis and Steven G Warshaw
Case Number: 9:2017cv80535
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2017 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Steven G Warshaw waiver sent on 5/15/2017, answer due 7/14/2017. (McCawley, Sigrid)
June 16, 2017 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed William A Tsacalis waiver sent on 4/21/2017, answer due 6/20/2017. (McCawley, Sigrid)
June 16, 2017 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed John A Ordman waiver sent on 6/7/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (McCawley, Sigrid)
June 16, 2017 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Robert W Olson waiver sent on 4/21/2017, answer due 6/20/2017. (McCawley, Sigrid)
June 16, 2017 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Keith E Lindner waiver sent on 4/21/2017, answer due 6/20/2017. (McCawley, Sigrid)
June 16, 2017 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Robert F Kistinger waiver sent on 4/26/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (McCawley, Sigrid)
June 16, 2017 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Charles Keiser waiver sent on 5/15/2017, answer due 7/14/2017. (McCawley, Sigrid)
June 16, 2017 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Cyrus Freidheim waiver sent on 5/16/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. (McCawley, Sigrid)
June 16, 2017 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Fernando Aguirre waiver sent on 5/15/2017, answer due 7/14/2017. (McCawley, Sigrid)
May 30, 2017 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to John A Ordman. (gp)
May 26, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) John A. Ordman (McCawley, Sigrid)
May 26, 2017 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Defendant's Address and Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed (ls)
May 25, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) John A. Ordman (McCawley, Sigrid)
May 12, 2017 Filing 13 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Ohio Southern. Case Number 1:17-cv-00157 - Angela Maria Henao Montes et al v. Chiquita Brands International Inc. et al., with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:17-cv-80535-KAM. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 0:08-md-01916-KAM. (gp)
May 9, 2017 Civil Case Terminated/Closing Case for administrative purposes per #12 Order. (gp) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS. The above-styled 2017 actions are CONSOLIDATED in the above-styled MDL proceeding. Until further notice of the Court, all further pleadings in these actions shall bear the case style and number of the lead case, 08-MD-1916-MARRA, In re Chiquita Brands International, Inc., Alien Tort Statute and Shareholders Derivative Litigation, and shall also include the case style and number of any specific ATS or ATA action(s) to which the pleading relates. The Clerk shall place a copy of this Order in all related cases and shall CLOSE Case Nos. 17-80475; 17-80514; 17-80535 and 17-80547, for administrative purposes. (See Order for further details) Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/9/2017. This document relates to: 0:08-MD-01916-MARRA, All ATS Actions, All ATA Actions (gp)
April 28, 2017 Filing 11 Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. (gp)
April 28, 2017 Filing 10 Case transferred in from Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00157. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. (gp)
April 19, 2017 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 9) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 20, 2008, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Kenneth A Marra (pb)
April 4, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Good Standing of Douglas A. Mitchell re doc. #5 by Plaintiff Angela Maria Henao Montes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Mitchell Certificate of Good Standing) (Parry, Ronald) Modified docket text on 4/5/2017 (eh).
March 30, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Good Standing of Jonathan W. Davenport re doc. #6 by Plaintiff Angela Maria Henao Montes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Davenport Certificate of Good Standing) (Parry, Ronald) Modified docket text on 4/5/2017 (eh).
March 17, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5883350) of Jonathan W. Davenport by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Parry, Ronald) Modified on 4/5/2017 (eh).
March 17, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5883340) of Douglas A Mitchell by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Parry, Ronald) Modified to clarify docket text on 3/17/2017 (jlw).
March 13, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Angela Maria Henao Montes of Related Cases (Parry, Ronald)
March 13, 2017 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
March 12, 2017 Party ELVIRA MARIA BERRIO GOMEZ added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party MONICA PATRICIA MONTERROSA RAMOS and ANA RAQUEL TORDECILLA ROMERO added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party JUVENCIO POLO BEJARANO, ANA CARMELA ORTIZ BEYTAR, RUBIELA PINO BLANDON, JUAN BATISTA BLANQUICET, CRUZ MARINA SALAS CUESTA, ROSA ELISA USUGA DAVID, ANA JOAQUINA GOMEZ, ROSA GOMEZ GOMEZ, MARIA ORLANDA PINO GRACIANO, FARIDES VIDAL MORELO, ADELFA BLANDON MOSQUERA, VICTORIANA CORDOBA MOSQUERA, JEANS FRANKELINE QUEJADA OREJUELA, FREDIS ROJAS PEREA, JAMEL MACHADO PEREZ, JESUS ANTONIO MOSQUERA QUINTO, MARITZA DEL CARMEN RIVAS RENTERIA, DAGOBERTO LEDESMA RODRIGUEZ, LIBARDO SOTELO SANDOVAL, JOSE LUIS GALARCIO VEGA, NINFA TORRES VERA and CHERLIS MORENO WALDO added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party YONI CAICEDO BELLO, AYDA CASTRO BELTRAN, SANDRA JUDITH HINESTROZA CALDERON, YANIDIS FUENTES CAVADIA, SOCORRO MARIA TAPIAS CHAMORRO, VENANCIO VIERA CORRALES, ANA LUCIA ZAPATA DE MURILLO, NORA LUZ YEPES DE YERENA, ZENOBIA MARIA OSORIO GARCIA, SIRIA ROSA LINAN GIRALDO, PETRONA DE JESUS GUEVARA GUZMAN, UDILDE MARIA PASTRANA HERRERA, ROSA MIRAMA BENITEZ MANCO, NATIVIDAD BLANCO SAN MARTIN, TELMA MARIA CORDOBA MARTINEZ, TERESA ARGUMEDO MUNOZ, TABITA ELENA POLO POZO, REMBERTO JOSE RIOS SUAREZ, ROBERT EDUARD VASQUEZ TORO, PASCUALA PEREZ VALENCIA, SILVIA ESTELLA QUICENO VARELA, ROSA MIRAMA CASTRO VARGAS, CLARA LUZ GAMBOA VEGA, YOAIRA ENILZA VEGA and TEODORA MARIA CORDERO VILLALBA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party JOSE BARBOSA BARRIOS, LEYDIS ORTEGA BLANQUICET, LEDYS ASPRILLA CAICEDO, MARCO PALACIO CORDOBA, MATILDE NAGLES CORDOBA, MARIA ELVIRA SANCHEZ DE MENDOZA, NOHEMI DIAZ, LUIS ARMANDO CORDOBA FLOREZ, MARGELINA CORREA FUENTES, NEYLA LUCAS GOMEZ, MARIA FELICIA FLOREZ LOAIZA, LORENA PATRICIA VELLOJIN MARIN, MARIA ROSMIRA TORRES MOLINA, MARIA ELENA GARCIA MONTOYA, MARIA MARGARITA RUIZ MORALES, LUIS URANGO MORELOS, MARIA EDILMA QUINTERO MUNOZ, JOSE EMILIO LIZARDAD MURILLO, MARTHA ISABEL MURILLO MURILLO, LUZ ENEIDA PLAZAS PANTOJA, LUZ MILA PANTOJA, MARILEXI MORENO PENA, LUCIA DEL CARMEN ZAPATA QUICENO, OMAIRA ALVAREZ QUINTERO, MARTINA SALAZAR RODRIGUEZ, MARIA CRESCENCIA MARTINEZ ROMERO, MARIA NAYIBE MAQUILON VALENCIA, LUZ ELENA RESTREPO VELEZ and LUZ MARY ESPITIA ZAPATA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party DORA AMANDA ASPRILLA BLANDON, JAIME ARAGON BORRERO, GLORIA PATRICIA ACEVEDO CARO, FRANCISCO VARGAS CASTILLO, FREDDY ANTONIO SALGADO CAUSIL, ENCARNACION CARMONA CORREA, EDILBERTO CUESTA, FERNEY RODRIGUEZ DAVID, DARIO MORENO GOMEZ, ESTEBANA MARIA PASTRANA HERRERA, GIL DE JESUS ARRIETA LORA, HAYDA LUZ MORENO MENA, DIVA ASTRID MOYA PALACIOS, DALILA FLOREZ PAZ, ELIODORA PARRA RADA, ESTEBANA MURILLO RAMIREZ, DORALBA CORREA SANCHEZ, FRANCIA ELENA MARTINEZ SIERRA, JACKELINE MARIA SIERRA and DALIA MARIA CAICEDO VALOYES added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party CIELO ESTHER VEGA BORJA, HERIBERTA ROMANA CAICEDO, ANA CAROLINA GARCIA CALCEDO, CLOTILDE CHAVERRA CHAVERRA, CARMENZA SALAS CIFUENTES, ANA OFILIA QUIROZ DE QUINTERO, LUCELY MARIA SALGADO GONZALES, CARMEN HERNANDEZ, OSCARINA RICARDO JULIO, VERONICA ISABEL GOMEZ LENIS, CARLOS CORTES LOPEZ, ARELLYS LEYES MORELOS, CENAIDA PALACIOS MOYA, ARISTIDES DIAZ PADILLA, ARGEMIDA DIAZ PEREZ, AYDA RUTH MADERA ROBLEDO, CARLOS CORTEZ RUIZ, LUIS ALFONSO GIRALDO SANCHEZ, ANA MILENA CORDOBA TOVAR, CARMEN CECILIA VARGAS VARGAS, ANAIS MEJIA WILCHENS, NUBIA ESTHER HERRERA YAPEZ and FELICITA DE JUSUS HERREERA YEPEZ added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party MARIA CONSUELO GARCIA CHAVARRIA, ORLIN CASTRILLON DAVID, MARIA ADELINO DAVID DE GUISAO, TURIANO SUAREZ FLOREZ, MARIA OLIVA FRANCO, ROSA EULALIA BORJA GAMBOA, MILADIS GONZALEZ, ANA CECILIA GARCES ISAZA, ISABEL ENA LUNA, CRUZ ELBA NAVARRO MONTIEL, RUBEN DARIO SANTOS MOSQUER, JOSE MERCEDES VAYOLES MURILLO, LIBIA ATENCIO PAJARO, DIONNE GARCIA PINO, LUZ ESTRELLA ZAPATA ROJAS, JULIANA QUINTERO SALAS, MARIA CECILIA BANQUET SANCHEZ, PATRICIA ISABEL GALLEGO SANCHEZ, MARLENY CORREA SEPULVEDA, MARCELINA RENTERIA SERNA, DIANA BEATRIZ MADRIGAL TORRES, MARCIAL DE JESUS LOPEZ UBARNE, FLORALBA VALENCIA URRUTIA, CARMEN TULIA HENRIQUEZ VALENCIA and NIDIAM DEL CARMEN VARGARA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party MODESTA INES SUAREZ BARRAGAN, MARIA ZAPATA BEDOYA, LUZ MERY LOPEZ CARDENAS, ELIZABETH RIVAS CARRIAZO, MARLENY CUESTA CUESTA, ELSA DEL CARMEN BERTEL DE OSORIO, MAGDALENA MONSALVE DE QUINTERO, GUILLERMO AMANCIO YANEZ DIAZ, MIRIAM DEL CARMEN PEREZ ESPITIA, JULIA MARGARITA RODRIGUEZ GARCIA, MARIA HELDA FRANCO GARCIA, LUIS ANIBAL MURILLO HINESTROZA, LIBARDO CORDOBA MOSQUERA, GILMA MONTALVO NINO, ADALGIZA BERMUDEZ OSPINA, SONIA MARIA TEJADO PACHECO, YOLIS FILOMENA DIAS PEREZ, MARIA NELLY LONDONO PINEDA, MARIO RICARDO CASALLAS RIVERA, JOSE DE LOS SANTOS BATISTA ROQUEMES, AMANDA DE JESUS SIERRA, YEINIS JOHANNA YANEZ TEJADA, YADIS YANETH YANEZ TEJADO, MARIA DEL CARMEN BETANCOR URIBE, ADRIANA BEDOYA VARGAS and ANA RAMONA ZAPATA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party NEILA ROSA SUAREZ BARRAGAN, CARLOS ANDRES MARIN BEDOYA, LUZ MARINA GOMEZ BERNAL, YANETH CECILIA GUZMAN BORJA, BLANCA INES HOLGUIN BRAVO, DERLYS DEL CARMEN TORDECILLA CALDERON, ABIUT AMPARO SANCHEZ CORONADO, ANGELA JUDITH SANCHEZ CORONADO, ANA CLARISA DAVID DE TORRES, LUZ MARINA DUARTE DIAZ, WILLIAM DE JESUS TORRES DUARTE, MARIA ISAURA MACHADO DURANGO, CECILIA DEL CARMEN DIAZ FUENTES, JULIA MARGARITA RODRIGUEZ GARCIA, ALBA STELLA HINCAPIE JARAMILLO, DELSI MARIA MARTINEZ JARAMILLO, MARTA NURY COSSIO MARTINEZ, KATIA MERCEDES VALLE MENDEZ, MARIA EMMA MURRAY QUINTO, WILFER ALEXANDER SIERRA RIVERA, MARIA EDILMA PEREZ SANCHEZ, DENIS ANTONIO AYALA TAPIAS, MARIA EMILSE TORRES, CRISTINA PARDO TRIANA, ANA ALICIA BORJA URIBE, LUIS ALFREDO GUISAO VARGAS, MARLENY DE JESUS OQUENDO VELASQUEZ and NUBIA LUCELLI ZAPATA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party TORIBIO LEMOS BLANDON, OLGA LUCIA MARTINEZ CARDONA, MARIA NOHELIA GALEANO DE OQUENDO, LERBY LUZ ALMARID DIAZ, MARIA ISAURA MACHADO DURANGO, LUZ MARY GOMEZ, RUBIELA ALCARAZ GONZALEZ, ROMELIA GRACIANO GUISAO, JULIA STELLA AREIZA JARAMILLO, SOL MARINA GIRALDO LOAIZA, MARIA FALCONERY PEREZ LOPEZ, INES OFELIA LONDONO MADRIGAL, MARIA OSIRIS GARCIA MENA, MARIA NELY RIOS MINOTA, MARIBEL MOSQUERA, MIRIAM PEREZ MOSQUERA, ROSA HERMELINA MOSQUERA MOSQUERA, ROSANGELA VIDALES PALACIO, SANDRA ISABEL LOPEZ PENA, MARIA BELARMINA CARVAJAL PEREZ, JESUS EULIVER SANTOS, MARIA MARGARITA BEDOYA SERNA, NADYS MENDEZ SOLERA, LUZ DIONE VASQUEZ URREGO and YEANS SHIRLEY OCHOA USUGA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party DIANA PATRICIA SUAREZ BARRAGAN, ADA LUZ MENDOZA BORNOS, ANA DE JESUS MENESES BUSTAMANTE, GERSON ESTEBAN MARQUEZ CARAVAJAL, MARTHA LIBIA CARDONA, MARIA MENA CHAVEDRRA, ALEJANDRINA ZUNIGA CORDOBA, BERNARDINO TAPIAS CORDOBA, SONIA CORDOBA, ELSY ALCIRA CARMONA CORREA, FARA MARIA VACA VIUDA DE CATANO, CARMEN ROSA ANGEL GOMEZ, ELIZABETH AGUIRRE GOMEZ, MARIA NELLY CANAVERAL LAZO, NURY PARRA LOBON, ADELAIDA ROSA VILLADIEGO MERCADO, FRANK GIOVANNY AVENDANO MONSALVE, CRUZ ELENA TORRES MOSQUERA, FLOR CAMPO NUNEZ, ISIDORA SANTOS PALACIOS, MARIA ORLANDA PINO, ANA EDILMA TORRES SEPULVEDA, MERCEDES MARIA VALETA SUAREZ, DIOSELINA VILLA TABON, ALICIA TUBERQUIA VALLE, PABLO ANTONIO VARELAS and MARGOTH LOPEZ DE ZAPATA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ANA CARMELA VILLADIEGO BARRIOS, RUDTH RICARD BATISTA, BERNARDINO ALMANZA BUELVAS, ENIA ELENA ALMANZA BUELVAS, LUZ GENNY GARCIA CARDONA, DORIS DEL CARMEN HOYOS DE CAPACHERO, RUFINO ANTONIO PEREZ FLOREZ, ROSIRIS BORJA GRACIANO, LUZ ANDREA FIGUEROA GUERRA, DIGNA MALVIA AGUILAR LAGARCHA, AURA ELENA CORDOBA MOSQUERA, CLEMENCIA JULIO OJEDA, MARIA TERESA CORCHO PEREZ, ROSA MARIA PUERTA, OMAIRA AYALA RIOS, FLOR MARIA GOMEZ RUEDA, LIBIA ROSA PANIAGUA VARGAS, LUZ ELVIRA PANIAGUA VARGAS and MARIA DE LA ENCARNACION ESPITIA VEGA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ZUNILDA TORRES BALANO, MARIA CRISTINA ALCARAZ BENITEZ, JORGE LUIS VALDEZ BORJA, CARMEN ALICIA POLO BUELVAS, FREDY ANDRES HURTADO CALLE, ANA FELICIA RAGA DE RIVAS, YAYLENIS GISSELLE LEMOS GIRON, DIANA PATRICIA CORREA MARIN, CONSUELO MENA MORENO, CONSUELO DE JESUS OCHOA, NORIS CORRALES ORTIZ, ALFONSO MORENO PEREA, ELIDA ROSA SIVAJA REGINDO, MARIA NELLY HOLGUIN RENGIFO, YARID ASPRILLA ROBLEDO, LUZ DARY TELLEZ ROMERO, MARIA CRESCENCIA MARTINEZ ROMERO, LUZ MARY SERNA, LEINER RAFAEL CARDENAS SUAREZ and DIOSELINA IDARRAGA TORRES added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ANA EMPERATRIZ HUMANEZ BENITEZ, YENY CAROLINA MAZO CARVAJAL, VIRGINIA CAICEDO DURAN, JUANA CARMELA BRAVO GARCIA, MARTHA MARTINEZ GENEZ, ANGELICA MARIA REGINO GOMEX, MILADYS MARGARITA MOLINA GOMEZ, MARIA CRISTINA CHAVERRA HIGUITA, MIRYAM GIRLEZA CALLE JIMENEZ, ELVRIA JUDITH GOMEZ MACHADO, GLADYS ELENA CUESTA MOSQUERA, CONSUELO DEL DOCORRO SANCHEZ PACHECO, ERNESTINA BEJARANO PALMA, INES MARIA RIVERA QUINTANA, LEONEL VARGAS QUINTERO, JUAN ANTONIO LEMOS SALAS, ANGELA MARIA CALDERIN TERAN and ROSA MARIA BENITEZ VARGAS added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ANA RUTH CASTANEDA CASTRO, HIRNIA CARTAGENA CORDOBA, NESLIS ESCOBAR CORREA, SIXTA SOLAR DE JULIO, ISABEL GUISAO DE VASQUEZ, ELENA GARCIA FUENTES, MILADYS MARGARITA MOLINA GOMEZ, NEYLA DORIA GONZALEZ, OLIVA DEL SOCORRO HERNANDEZ, MARIA DIONIS FLOREZ JARAMILLO, AURELIA MARIMON, ISIDRA MARIA CORDOBA MESA, LUZ NELLYS AGAMEZ MORENO, NIDIA PORRA MORENO, JUANA MARTINEZ PALACIOS, MARIA ALBANY CUESTA SALAS, YESID MARIA HOYOS SILGADO, ELISABETH OSPINA VELASQUEZ, ERMINIA JUDITH ARGUMEDO VELASQUEZ and EMERITA ROSA MERCADO ZAPA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party YASMINA ANTONIA AVENDANO BERRIO, HECTOR MANUEL GUTIERREZ CARDENAS, AURA PEREZ DE PADILLA, MIRIAM ISABEL LLORENTE DIAZ, CARMEN TULIA MESTRA DORIA, MARIA LETICIA ORTIZ ESPINOSA, ANA SAFIRA MUNOZ MARIN, YADIRA ROSA LOPEZ NISPERUZA, LUZ MARINA HIGUITA OCHOA, MARIA ELISA GUISAO PUERTAS, LEONEL VARGAS QUINTERO, DINA LUZ PEREZ RAMOS, INES MAGALY QUINTANA RAMOS, PATRICIA MONTERROSA RAMOS, LUDIS NELLY RODRIGUEZ RUIZ, MARIA FLORENCIA MARZOLA SAEZ, NANCY LOPEZ SALAZAR, YOLANDA PEREZ SANCHEZ, ANA FIDELIA CORDOBA VALENCIA and NUBIA DE JESUS GRACIANO VASQUEZ added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ENADIS JUDITH ALTAMIRANDA BENITEZ, MARLE DEL CARMEN CONTRERAS CONTEREAS, OLGA JOSEFA PADILLA CORDERO, LILIAN DEL SOCORRO RESTREPO DE PUERTA, ANA MARIA ARENAS FLOREZ, ANA SILVIA MORENO HERNANDEZ, VIRGELINA CORDOBA HERNANDEZ, OLGA ISABEL PADILLA HOYOS, ANA ISABEL LOPEZ, BLIDA SUSANA GUERRA MARZOLA, ANA LIGIA HERNANDEZ NARCLARES, LUCELLY CARVAJAL NISPERUZA, AURA ROSA GUZMAN SEPULVEDA, MARIA CECILIA MENDOZA SOTO, DORIS ELENA BOLIVAR VASQUEZ and ERMINIA JUDITH ARGUMEDO VELASQUEZ added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ENOLYS RIOS BARRIOS, GLORIA VITAL BERRIO, MIGUEL JIMENEZ BRAVO, LUZ MARIELA VALDERRAMA CASTANO, MARTHA AIDEE MENA CHAVERRA, ANA FELICIA DELGADO, PIEDAD ECHAVARRIA, DONALD VARGAS FUENTES, MARIA UBERLINA RODRIGUEZ GUISAO, MIRLEDYS CECILIA OTERO HIDALGO, DIOCELINA VERGARA JARAMILLO, CARMEN AMPARO LARGO LARGO, ERNELINDA CORDOBA MENA, GLADIS ADRIANA OSORIO, GLORIA DANER PIEDRAHITA PENA, SELENIA DIAZ PENA, FALCONERY GOMEZ PUERTA, BLANCA INES PEREZ PULGARIN, ADA LUZ MARTINEZ REBOLLEDO, MARIA SONIA MONTOYA VELEZ and ANA LUCIA ARGEL VILLALBA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ROCIO DE JESUS QUICENO BETANCUR, GILDARDO REYES CANAS, MARIA UBERLINA RODRIGUEZ DE DURANGO, MARTHA INES TORRES DUARTE, FANNY GARCES GOMEZ, MARIA CRISTINA CHAVERRA HIGUITA, MARTA CECILIA NANCLARES HOLGUIN, MARIA CONSUELO ZUELTA LAVERDE, LUZ ELENA TALEIGUA LLORENTE, MARIA ALEIDA LONDONO, EDILSA YANEZ MARTINEZ, PEDRO POLO MARTINEZ, UBERTO DAVID MARTINEZ, ZENITH CABRERA MINOTA, AMPARO DE JESUS DUARTE PUERTA, ENILERTA DEL CARMEN BLANCO RAMOS, MARIA GEORGINA URREGO SEGURA, ELVA DEL SOCORRO ARIAS TRUJILLO and MARTHA ISABEL MARULANDA VILLA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party OFIR DE MAR PARRA BURITICA, LUIS ELADIO CABRERA, EMMA HIDALGO CUESTA, JOSE MARIA VARELAS DURANGO, YELISSA JULIO ESTRADA, SAULINA GONZALEZ GARCIA, LUBIN ANTONIO GIL, OSCAR ANDRES GOMEZ GRANADA, MARIA OFELIA HERNANDEZ, JOSE ORLANDO AGUIRRE LONDONO, ENORIS DEL CARMEN GONZALAEZ MANCO, JOSE MARIA MESA MERCADO, MARTHA ROCIO GOMEZ MORALES, ENILDA TAPIA RAMIREZ, EVANGELINA MORENO RAMIREZ, CENAYDA DEL SOCORRO PUERTA RODRIGUEZ, ERIKA JULIO TAPIAS and CASILDA ROSA MARTINEZ USUGA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party JUAN DAVID CORDOBA, AIDE MARIA PENA DIAZ, MAGNOLIA ARIAS GUERRA, LUBIN ARMANDO HIGUITA GUTIERREZ, TERESA RODRIGUEZ HERNANDEZ, MILADYS GUERRERO HERRERA, MARIA EUGGENIA PADILLA HOYOS, MARIA CONSUELO JIMENEZ, JOSE DE LOS SANTOS MORELOS LENES, MARIA GENOVEBA BERNAL MEDINA, MARIA IRIS ESTRADA OQUENDO, LIBARDO DE JESUS ABROLEDA PIEDRAHITA, ELKIN DE JESUS RODRIGUEZ QUINTERO, ANA RAQUEL TORDECILLA ROMERA, CARMEN ROSA PALACIO SERNA, MARIA EUFEMIA PINO USAGA and MARTHA MAGDALENA MARTINEZ USUGA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ALEXANDRA BENITEZ, NANCY NEDY MARTINEZ CHAVARRIA, BLANCA ROSA JIMENEZ DAVID, LUZ ROSMIRA ARENAS DURANGO, MARIA MARLENE ARIAS ESTRADA, MARIA INES VELASQUEZ FLOREZ, DAMARYS CASTRO GIRALDO, MARIA OLIVIA HIGUITA GUTIERREZ, MARIA EDERGIRIA HERNANDEZ, JUANA CRISTINA BENITEZ LARGACHA, MARIA EMILSE ZAPATA LOPEZ, GLADIS BARBA PADILLA, SAMUEL DE JESUS MENDOZA PLATA, LIBARDO ANIBAL VARGAS RIVAS, LUZ MIRYAM TABORDA RODRIGUEZ, REINALDO AGUIRRE RODRIGUEZ, DIOSELINA POSADA TORRES and ANIBAL SEPULVEDA USUGA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party DORA ANGELA DAVID BEDOYA, RAFEALA COA BLANQUICET, FARA MARIA VACA VIUDA DE CATANO, ROSANA PINEDA DE LOPEZ, INES JANET MARTINEZ ECHAVARRIA, YENIX DE LOS SANTOS GONZALEZ FAJARDO, ALEXANDRA BIBIANA ACEVEDO FLOREZ, BLANCE LILIA PEREZ GUERRA, RAMIRO SANCHEZ GUTIERREZ, MARIELA VASQUEZ MARIN, ELIZABETH MINA MARMOL, ARGENIS DE JESUS MURILLO, YERLY DEL CARMEN MACHADO MURILLO, HERMES ANTONIO RAMOS ORTEGA, ANA SENET GUISAO PUERTA, NARCISO MARTINEZ RAMOS, BLANCA INES HENAO RUIZ, LUDYS DEL SOCORRO MIRANDA SOTOMAYOR, ELVA DEL SOCORRO ARIAS TRUJILLO and LUZ MIRIAM TUBERQUIA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party NORELIA VALDERRAMA BEDOYA, BEATRIZ ELENA GRACIANO CARDONA, BLANCA ROCIO BENJUMEA CEPEDA, MARIA DEL CONSUELO RUIZ CUADRO, BLANCA GIRALDO DAVID, ELVIA ROSA DAVID, ANA MORELIA VALDERRAMA DE MANCO, LUIS FERNANDO PALACIO DIAZ, OSCAR LUIS CHARRASQUIEL GARCIA, LUZ MARINA PEREA HURTADO, CARMEN DEL TORO JIMENEZ, ROMELIA GUISAO LOPEZ, LUZ MILA MOSQUERA MARTINEZ, LUZ ESTELA MENA MENA, FRANQUELINA SEPULVEDA MONTOYA, JHONY ALEXANDER MORENO RENTERIA, LUZ ELENA ZAPATA ROJAS, LEONEL AREIZA TAMAYO, ANGELICA MARIA VALLESTERO VARGAS and YURANI ANDREA ALVAREZ ZAPATA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party MARGOT VARGAS BENITEZ, RUBY TATIANA CIFUENTES CARO, LUZ EDILMA PALACIO CORDOBA, MARIA CONCEPCION HOYOS DE HOYOS, AMALIA SERNA DE QUINTERO, TERESITA DE JESUS QUIROZ DE ROLDAN, MARTHA NELLY GEORGE GANAN, LUZ MIRIAM ROLDAN GOMEZ, MIGUEL MARIANO VASQUEZ GUERRA, BERTA GULFO HERRA, LUVIS DIAZ MENDOZA, ANA LUCIA ORTIZ NOLASCO, ALBA LUZ ALVAREZ PAEZ, OFELIA MOSQUERA PALACIOS, GLORIA AMPARO HERNANDEZ PEREZ, LUZ NERY MARTINEZ RODRIGUEZ, JOSE JULIAN BENITEZ URREGO and LUZ ADIELA AGUDELO VANEGAS added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ENCARNACION ROMANA BLANDON, HERIBERTO CALDERON CANO, RUBY ESTELLA AGUDELO CASTANEDA, PEDRO NEL VILLARREAL CASTILLO, MARIA LICELLA BEDOYA CORREA, ANA LIRIA VARELA DE AGUIRRE, GEOVANIS SANTANA DIAZ, MIRYAM DEL SOCORRO VARELA GUISAO, LUZ MERY HERNANDEZ HERNANDEZ, LUZ MERY HERNANDEZ HERNANDEZ, ANA ELIZABETH VALLE HIGUITA, LUZ MERIS HIGUITA, RUBIELA SIERRA MARTINEZ, LIRIA ROSA GIRALDO MONTOYA, YAMITH JOSE MACIAS NAVARRO, YUDIS ARTEAGA PEREZ, CARMEN ELENA BEDOYA REYES, LUZ AIDA RUIZ and SANDRA MILENA PINO SOTO added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party MARIA CERAFINA VALENCIA CAICEDO, GLORIA MARIA CARO, CONSUELO RIVAS CARVAJAL, NOEL MELCHOR QUEJADA CHAVERRA, DOMINGA PREN CORDOBA, ROSA ELENA MARIN DE GALLEGO, GLORIA CRUZ ANA MESA FRANCO, MANUEL SALVADOR TABAARES GARCIA, JORGE ELIECER MARTINEZ GONZALEZ, GLADYS EMILSE SUAREZ GUISAO, SHIRLEY YULIANA HERNANDEZ, EUGGENIA MENA HINESTROZA, MARIA MARLENEY CANAVERAL LAVERDE, MARIA EVA CANO MACHADO, JUDITH CORREA MARTINEZ, GERTRUDIS MORENO MESTRA, DORA LIBIA CASTANEDA MONTES, LUZ NANCY HINESTROZA MOSQUERA, MARTHA LONDONO MOSQUERA, MOISES SANTACRUZ SILGADO and PETRONA GALE TORRES added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party MERCEDES SANMARTIN BERRIO, PATRICIA MUNOZ CASTRO, MARIA ELCIRA DEL SOCORRO LONDONO DE MESA, MARIA MARLENEY CASTANO DE VALENCIA, FRANCISCA CUESTA ESPINOSA, FABIOLA DE JESUS TRUJILLO GIRALDO, GLORIA AMPARO DURANGO GIRALDO, LUZ MERY HERNANDEZ HERNANDEZ, MABEL LETICIA CARMONA LAVERDE, YULIANA MONSALVE LOAIZA, ROSA ELVIRA LONDONO, SANDRA BIBIANA YAGARI MORA, LUCIA CARTAGENA MORENO, FABIOLA PEREZ OLIVEROS, EMPERATRIZ MARQUEZ PATERNINA, ORFELINA PANESSO PRENS, DORA ELENA TAMAYO, SARA INES DAVID TORRES, JUANA LEONOR PADILLA VALOYES and SARA ESTER ORTEGA ZAPATA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party ANGELA DARIO CANAS BUILES, ELIDA DEL CARMEN LOPEZ CUELLO, DORA ALBA PEREZ DE MASO, RUBICELLY PIEDRAHITA GONZALEZ, SAMUEL RODRIGUEZ HERNANDEZ, ARISTARCO PALACIOS HINESTROZA, EIDA MARIA ASPRILLA IBARGUEN, MARCELINA VALENCIA MARTINEZ, NANCY DEL CARMEN OQUENDO MAZO, ALBA JEANY YEPES MORALES, CARMEN GLORIA PAZ MOSQUERA, SECILIA PALACIO MOSQUERA, SONIA IRENE PALACIO RENTERIA, GLORIA GLADYS VILLA RESTREPO, ORFELIA NELLY QUINTERO RESTREPO, EUSEBIA SEPULVEDA SEPULVEDA, JULIO CESAR ALVAREZ VALENCIA, MARIA OLIVA VALLEJO, AMELIA ROSA REYES VERTEL and BERNARDO ADAN ALZATE VILLA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party MARIA HERSILIA CARMONA, LUZ MARINA MONTOYA CARVAJAL, CARMEN TULIA CORDOBA CUESTA, MARIA MARGARITA CALLE DE VILLA, CARLOS ENRIQUE MUNOZ ECHAVARRIA, MIRIAM MONTOYA GARCIA, ELVIRA MARIA DERRIO GOMEZ, BLANCA MIRYAM SIERRA HERNANDEZ, JUAN CARMILO POSADA LOPEZ, MARIA CATALINA MOSQUERA MOSQUERA, SHIRLEY JOHANA PENA PENAGOS, DEYANIRA DEL CARMEN PEREZ, SANDRA MILENA GARCES PRIOLO and ARINDA DEL SOCORRO MONTES TUIRAN added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party SOL MARIA BASIL BEDOYA, PAULA ANDREA MONTOYA BLANDON, SUREYA VALOYES CAICEDO, SALVADORA VARGAS CORDERO, TOMASA MANYOMA CORDOBA, ROSA ELERNY SALAS CUESTA, ELIDA BELENO DE GARCIA, ANATILDE CARVAJAL DE MARTINEZ, ROSA ANGELICA DUARTE, ADELA SOFIA SUAREZ MONTIEL, YENNY ZAPATA NAVARRO, JAIRO DE JESUS ALVAREZ PADILLA, RAMON GONZALO RENTERIA PALACIOS, VISITACION ROA RAMIREZ, ROBERTO ENRIQUE BARRIOS REYES, DIANA ESTER VALOYES SALAS, ELEIDA DIAZ SILGADO, GLEN GONZALEZ TORRES and NURMA MORENO TORRES added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party LIBORIA RENTERIA CORDOBA, ANA TERESA CORDOBA CORRREA, OFELIA PALACIO COSSIO, LUZ MARY GAMBOA CUESTA, NEYIS CAICEDO DE GARCES, SIRIS PRETEL DURANGO, ELIZABETH CALDERON GALVIS, MARLENY GIRALDO GARCIA, ROSA MARIA CORDOBA MANCO, AMPARO OCANO MOGOLLON, CONCEPCION LEMOS MORENO, LUIS FERNANCO CORDOBA PALACIOS, DINA LUZ PEREZ POLO, LINA PATRICIA PEREZ QUINTO, JUANA ROBLEDO RIVAS, EDER LUIS PEREZ ROJAS, ARCADIA MARIA ROMANA ROMANA, GERARDO MEDRANO SANCHEZ, HERMINIO ARRIAGA SERNA, ELENA CONTRERAS TORDECILLA and DIOCELINA DEL CARMEN JENEY VERGARA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party VIRGINIA VALENCIA BALDRICH, ISABEL BARRAGAN CORTEZ, JOSE LUBIN CORDOBA CUESTA, FLOR NOHELIA PENA DURANGO, MATILDA SERRANO GARCIA, NIDIA MATURANA GARCIA, ANA EVA GARCIA GIRALDO, JOVITA PEREA GUARADIA, MARIA DEL ROSARIO DAVID GUZMAN, ANDREA SANTOYA HERNANDEZ, JORGE ELIECER PALACIOS HURTADO, YASNEY TOVAR JULIO, MARTA CECILIA CASTRILLON LOPERA, GLORIA EMILSE CASTANO MAYA, ANA LIGIA OCAMPO MONTES, DIOSDADA RIVAS MORENO, KATIA MARIA CAUSIL NIETO, JOSEFA PRIMERA POLO, YULIETH PAOLA COGOLLO RODRIGUEZ, YASMIN INES RODRIQUES, YUDIS ESTER MADRID SUAREZ and MARIA FERNEDYS GUISAO VILLA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party SERGIA CAMACHO CASTRO, RUTH OMAIRA MOSQUERA CORDOBA, ROSALBA GOMEZ DE HIGUITA, ROSARIO BERRIO DE TRESPALACIO, OCTAVIO ANTONIO RUEDA GOMES, PETRONA JOAQUINA GUERRA, SANDRA PATRICIA MORENO HERNANDEZ, SANDRA PATRICIA FIGUEROA LADEUS, OLIVIA CORDOBA MELENDEZ, ROSALBA VIBA MENAS, ROSALBA PEREZ MORENO, ROSA MARIA MOSQUERA MOSQUERA, TERESA TRILLO NAVARRO, OLGA CECILIA RESTREPO OCHOA, SARIDY ROJAS ORDONEZ, SEGUNDO RUBIDES, POLICARPA RAMOS SALGADO, SUSANA MARIA JULIO SUCERQUIA and SANDRA PATRICIA GRAJALES UPEGUI added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party MARIA OCTAVINA BERRIO, NELBO ESTER BERRIO CASTANO, NANCY RAMOS CORDOBA, NICANOR MENA ESCUDERO, NATALIA ANDREA ZUNIGA LOPEZ, RAQUEL RAMIREZ PALACIO MOSQUERA, MARIA YOLANDA HERRERA OBANDO, NELIDA PEREIRA PAEZ, NETYS MARINA TAPIA RAMIERZ, MARIANA RIVAS ROBLEDO, MARIANA RIVAS ROBLEDO, NURY LUCIA MARZOLA SAEZ, NUBIA SHIRLEY VASQUEZ TORO, MARIALA PAS CORDOBA VALENCIA and NANCY ESTELLA ESTRADA VELOZA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party LUCINA MANCO BONILLA, MARIA CEMIDA CANO CANO, MARIA ANGELINA PARAMO CARRANZA, LUCILA GOMEZ CHARRIS, MARGARITA CHICA CHICA, MARI DEL SOCORRO GUTIERREZ, LUZ NERY OSORIO HERNANDEZ, LUZ MALLIBI BETANCORTH IMBA, MARCO ANTONIO QUEJADA JIMENEZ, MARGARITA PADILLA MORELO, MARIA LUISA MEDINA MOYA, LUZMILA RIVAS ROBLEDO, LUZ SORAYA ARANGO RODRIGUEZ and LUIS ALFREDO BETANCUR VALENCIA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 12, 2017 Party JOSE MANUEL BERTEL BUELVAS, GLORIA EMILSE HIGUITA FERRERO, GREGORIA QUEJADA GALVAN, IRISOL MONTES GOMEZ, LILIANA JIMENEZ LONDONO, JUANA GARCES LOPEZ, AURELIO MURILLO, INDIRA ELENA NAVAS PEREA, FRANCISCA RODRIGUEZ RAMOS, LEDIZ MARIA RENTERIA ROBLEDO, GERTRUDIZ RODRIGUEZ, ISABEL ROSA FERIA SUAREZ, KATERINE VELASQUEZ TERAN and GLORIA ESTELLA BEDOYA ZAPATA added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Felicidad Lemos Avila, Edenia Solar Batista, Elibardo Santo Mendoza Causil, Elena Bello Espitia, Farid Yinet Arias Garcia, Feniz Moya Gutierrez, Fidencia Guerrero Julio, Elena del Socorro Herrera Lopez, Falco Nery Quiroz Lopez, Edelmira Contreras Martinez, Marileny Becerra Martinez, Rosa Esther Martinez Miranda, Dioselina Mosquera Palacios, Dioselina Otalvaro Toro and Energida Nery Salgado Vital added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Arelis del Carmen Romero Arcia, Dilma Maria Molina Arevelo, Daisy Judith Ricardo Barrios, Reyes Berrio Blanco, Porifiro Manuel Gonzalez Carrascal, Elda de Jesus Cardona Castaneda, Manuel Salvador Blandon Castano, Monica Liliana Trujillo Cedeno, Remberto Fredy Rojas Chicas, Benilda Moya Cordoba, Casilda Yepes Correa, Rosalba Barrios Diaz, Ana Mercedes Garcia Echavarria, Adriana Patricia Galindo, Angela Maria Sabala Gamboa, Daris Enidia Varela Garcia, Yaqueline Albarez Giraldo, Diana Lisbet Bedoya Grajales, Dina Luz Navas Guerrero, Alba Maria Rojas Gutierrez, Angela Maria Mesa Hernandez, Landra Suris Jimenez, Rosiris de los Angeles Gonzalez Lambertinez, Consuelo Martinez Lan, Candida Maria Muentes Manjarrez, Dada Alberta Martinez, Cruz Elena Vasquez Montoya, Darlis Palma Mosquera, Gloria Elsy Lopez Munera, Aliria Arias Nabales, Carmen Quintana Noble, Bety Yully Vivas Palacios, Maria Elena Castro Patino, Marta Lucia Marin Patino, Ana Escilda Pena Pena, Margarita Navarro Pineda, Renan Perea Ramirez, Walter Romero Ramos, Martha del Toro Ricardo, Adelaida del Carmen Ruiz Ruiz, Ruth Fanery Ochoa Salgado, Purificacion Garcia Sevilla, Carlos Alberto Gonzalez Taborda, Teresa de Jesus Valencia Tobon, Marcelino Pajaro Tordecilla, Luz Amparo Jimenez Vasquez, Betilda Rosa Correa Yanez, Ana Luisa Franco de Morelo, Alba Rosa Arboleda de Oquindo and Ana Eva Bran de Palacio added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Ana Devora Agudelo Arenas, Maria Ofelia Toro Baena, Martha Ruth Henao Ballesteros, Hector Gabriel Castaneda Builes, Maria Nubia Ramirez Canaveral, Edwin de Jesus Arango Cano, William Castano Cardona, Luz Nerina Carvajal Carvajal, Lucelys Chiquillo Casarrubia, Luz Mariela Valderrama Castano, Ana Dilma Herrera Cossio, Luz Mila Durango Durango, Maria de Jesus Zarza Escobar, Ovidio Espinosa, Nancy Banda Genes, Gloria Ines Gomez, Maria Josefa Jimenez Gomez, Monica Cecilia Puerta Gomez, Eudilia Rosa Diaz Hernandez, Maria de los Santos Hernandez, Maria Nubia Higuita Higuita, Olga Patricia Usuga Loaiza, Alcira Hernandez Luna, Luz Mila de Jesus Velasquez Manco, Dionisio Medrano Medrano, Dora Isabel Sanchez Mejia, Noris Isabel Graces Mogrovejo, Maria Nazareth Londono Monsalve, Maria Elias Palencia Morelo, Jose de Jesus Castano Olea, Marta Elena Loaiza Orozco, Flor Elena Echavarria Osorio, Consuelo Guzman Padierna, Ruth del Carmen Castro Palacio, Bergnuil del Carmen Reyes Perez, Dario de Jesus Marin Restrepo, Pedro David Hernandez Rivera, Carmen Rocio Zapata Rodriguez, Pedro Manuel Chima Salgado, Judith Maria Palacio Sanchez, Martha Gladis Sarasty, Rosa Magnolia Guisao Sepulveda, Juan Severo Obregon Serna, Osiris Tordecilla Sotelo, Ana Lucia Contreras Tordecilla, Maria Georgina Torres, Carmen Emilia Quejada Urrego, Gregoria Valencia, Martha Ines Loaiza de Londono and Ana de Jesus Mosquera de Palacios added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Maria Maribel Ramirez Agudilo, Marisol Sanchez Alvarez, Dioselina Goez Arango, Gloria Cecilia Arango, Yolanda Porras Arias, Carmen Tulia Vasquez Arredondo, Maria del Socorro Arroyave, Yuri Angelica Arroyave, Carmen Tulia Bedoya Bedoya, Luz Elena Perez Bedoya, Maria Amparo Ocampo Bedoya, Jorge Palacios Bolivar, Luz Amparo Ramirez Botero, Sandra Milena Gonzalez Bravo, Casimira Palacios Cabrera, Clarivel Borja Cartagena, Marta Elena Rodriguez Carvajal, Aracelly Graciano Catano, Carmen Emilia Roldan Cortes, Dora Eugenia Chaverra Echeverry, Adriana Maria Ospina Fernandez, Guillermina Ayazo Florez, Ramon Antonio Sanchez Garcia, Blanca Ruth Osorio Gutierrez, Margarita Campino Gutierrez, Margarita Campino Gutierrez, Maria Rosbeny Gutierrez, Reyes Santos Gonzalez Herrera, Maria Margarita Jaramillo, Jose Plutarco Restrepo Lopez, Rocio del Socorro Upegui Lopez, Aracelly Marin, Magdalena del Socorro Rios Marin, Amparo Ocano Mogollon, Reinaldo de Jesus Molina Molina, Gloria Estella Montoya, Maria Martinez Montoya, Gloria Yaneth Mosquera, Elena Cordoba Moya, Luz Marina Tuberquia Osorio, Luz Nelly Rios Ospina, Liliana Eugenia Marin Patino, Onelia Elvira Romana Perez, Etelvina Ercilia Pineda, Ruben Dario Gomez Pineda, Maria del Carmen Posada, Rosa Elena Durango Pulgarin, Nubia Amparo Quintana Quintana, Martha Yolanda Echeverry Quintero, Alicia Toro Ramirez, Cleotilde Hoyos Ramirez, Maria Isabel Rivas Ramirez, Maria Senobia Serna Rengifo, Maria Rene Murillo Renteria, Maria Cruz Elena Mena Renteria, Aracelly Del Carmen Rodriguez, Gloria Maria Marulanda Rodriguez, Marta Lia Roman, Jhon Mario Munoz Ruiz, Orfelina de Jesus Tirado Saya, Maria Evelia Taborda Taborda, Maria Nilia Ocampo Toro, Cesar Adolfo Sepulveda Torres, Flor Marina Vasquez Urrego, Alba Usuga, Margarita Fernandez de Castano, Ana Ligia Cifuentes de Higuita and Maria del Rosario Arieza de Torres added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Sandra Patricia Aguilar, Maria Glabed Londono Aguirre, Adijandro Arquinoc Alvarez Arango, Luz Marina Durango Arango, Maria Laura Goez Arango, Luz Marina Restrepo Arredondo, Maria Gumercinda Asprilla, Blanca Isabel Corcho Avila, Luz Mary Rodriguez Bermudez, Ena Judith Pitalua Clemente, Nohelia Martinez Cordoba, Leidy Johana Arias Cuartas, Hector Beltran Cuesta, Edilia Estella Alzate Diez, Luz Elena Moreno Garcia, Maria Victoria Carmona Garcia, Martha Lucia Portillo Genes, Martha Luz Ayazo Gomez, Aida Patricia Molina Gonzalez, Liliana Patricia Orrego Gonzalez, Duber Antonio Payares Graciano, Doris Tabarez Hidalgo, Luceni Escobar Higuita, Rosa Esneda Guisao Higuita, Maria Ligia Hincapie Hincapie, Everlides del Socorro Palacio Hinestroza, Luz Marina Manco Jaramillo, Jose Efrain Gil Jimenz, Esmeralda Maria Avila Lopez, Esperanza del Socorro Lujan, Remberto Jose Saez Martinez, Rosiris del Carmen Sibaja Martinez, Serafina Renteria Martinez, Sixta Cledis Pereira Martinez, Alfidio Torres Mercado, Yudy Paola Agudelo Molina, Roberto Manuel Mora Monterrosa, Gloria Patricia Rincon Moreno, Gloria Eugenia Munoz, Maria del Carmen Hernandez Negrete, Georgina Cardona Oquendo, Marisol Cordoba Palacios, Maria Doris Cuartas Parra, Milda Ruiz Pediata, Luis Alberto Nunez Pena, Martha Inex Mejia Pertuz, Mirian Duarte Puerta, Orlanda Duarte Puerta, Elizabeth Ramirez Ramirez, Maria Consuelo Ramirez, Antonio Maria Restrepo Restrepo, Ana Elvia Benitez Rojas, Jhon Mario Munoz Ruiz, Yaidi Roman Santacruz, Teolinda Evagelista Cordero Santos, Rosa Magnolia Guisao Sepulveda, Ana Lucila Sepulveda Serna, Hernan de Jesus Serna, Nery Charrasquel Solar, Omaira Cuadraolo Torres, Luz Aida Serna Vargas, Rosa Adelfa Munoz Vasquez, Gloria Ines Marin Velasquez, Mary Cano Velaszuez, Luz Nelly Sanchez Vilareal, Rosa Emilia Caro de Bermudez, Gabriela Botero de Botero, Berta Pertuz de Bravo, Iluminada del Carmen Lambertino de Espitia, Maria Adelina David de Guisao, Rosmira Guisao de Lopez, Gabriela Durango de Pena, Maria Elena Posada de Sanchez and Ana Josefa Gaviria de Valencia added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Rocio Alvarez, Luz Marina Durango Arango, Maria Laura Goez Arango, Sandra Milena Pacheco Bedoya, Elias Manuel Ballestra Berrocal, Claudia Patricia Guzman Borja, Ana Delia Duarte Castano, Rusmira Barrios Diaz, Pastora Durango, Rosalba Durango, Hermelinda Cogollo Fuentes, Reynit Martinez Garcia, Gloria Nelly David Giraldo, Walter Javier Madrigal Goez, Liliana Patricia Orrego Gonzalez, Yonis Oveis Corcho Gonzalez, Rocio Amparo Velasquez Guisao, Luis Alberto Guzman, Arminda Mosquera Ibarguen, Felipa Murillo Ibarguen, Marleny del Socorro Jarmillo, Amin Cavadia Lemos, Rosalba Jimenez Lopez, Aracely Arango Mazo, Jazminy Ortiz Mendoza, Clara Elena Cordoba Mesa, Rosiris del Carmen Morales, Edelmira Padilla Moreno, Marcelina Cabrera Moreno, Diana Maria Ortega Oquendo, Rosa Mirian Gonzalez Osorio, Yadira Moreno Palacio, Zulma Maria Guerrero Palacio, Leocadia Marmolejo Palacios, Noris del Carmen Florez Peinado, Saturina Moreno Perea, Rosa Elena Duranco Pulgarin, Alicia Casallas Qunitero, Laurina Agueda Narvaez Ramos, Tanislada Salas Romana, Pedro Franco Ruiz, Rosa Basilia Ramirez Sanchez, Transito Asenal Tovar Sanclemente, Rosa Maria Gomez Sepulveda, Rosa Elena Serna Serna, Tony Correa Serpa, Martha Ines Charrasquiel Solar, Maria Salome Urrutia, Claudia Elena Murillo Velez, Ruth Isabel Mejia Villa, Bercelia Rosa Martinez Zabala, Marlyn Arcos de Arcos, Maria Idalis Gallego de Batista, Rosalba Ospina de Benitez, Sonny del Carmen Renteria de Escobar and Ana de Jesus Areiza de Rodriguez added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Nery Nicolasa Quintero Agudelo, Marta Oliva Marin Betancur, Maria Lilia Blandon Blandon, Maria Angelina Paramo Carranza, Maria Bergelia Mosquera Chaverra, Maria Elena Andrade Cordoba, Ovidio de Jesus Arroyabe Correa, Jaudith Petana Cuadrado, Maria Eugenia Ubaldo Cuesta, Pastora Durango, Margarita del Carmen Redondo Espitia, Nelsy Maria Penafiel Espitia, Maria Bertilda Giraldo, Mariela Arbelaez Giraldo, Maria Gudiela Gil Herrera, Maria Luz Milo Gil Herrera, Mercedes del Socorro Higuita, Nelly Ester Solar Jimenez, Luz Miryan Serna Lopez, Nasira Sofia Montalvo Macea, Maria Esther Trejos Machado, Maria Idiani Hernandez Manco, Maria Yolanda Munoz Marin, Nora Elena Rivera Marin, Manuel de Jesus Cordoba Mena, Marvelis Marquez Morelo, Maria Danila Mosquera, Maria Epifania Palacios Mosquera, Nilsan Mena Mosquera, Margarita Isabel Munoz, Maria Doralina Mosquero Ortiz, Maria Luzmila Ortiz, Maria Albertina Torres Osorio, Maria de los Angeles Osorno, Maria Rosa Figueroa Pena, Maria Eusmelia Puerta, Maria Sabina Marciana Rivas, Marina de Jesus Hoyos Rivas, Maria Georgina Ballesteros Rodriguez, Marta Cecilia Sepulveda Sanchez, Martha Ines Arias Sanchez, Ofelia Ines Sabas Sanchez, Victor Sepulveda, Maria la Luz Sosa Sosa, Maria Lucia Restrepo Sossa, Maria Ernestina Rivera Usuga, Nestor Alberto Moya Vargas, Maria del Rocio Roldan Velasquez, Maria Lucelly Quintero de Graciano, Maria Consuel Urrego de Herrera, Maria Dolores Ospina de Mesa, Maria Onelia Correa de Mesa, Maria Evangelina Canas de Morales and Mercedes Vive de Prieto added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Jhojana Vinasco Alcazar, Maria Ofelia Largo Alvarez, Manuel Antonio Corcho Anaya, Gloria Aydee Gonzalez Arbelaez, Gumercinda Gaviria Bolano, Georgina Maria Diaz Calle, Francia Elena Medrano Cardona, Leticia de Jesus Rojas Cardona, Ligia Esther Correa Carmona, Luz Gladys Higuita Caro, Luz Aidee Galeano Castano, Luz Dary Usuga Celada, John Kennedy Manco Clavijo, Irma Yaneth Duque, Elizabeth Jaramillo Espinosa, Luz Mery Guerra Feria, Gloria Stella Graciano Gallego, Luciria Agamez Godoy, Emerita Sofia Gonzalez Gonzalez, Jhon Jairo Ibarguen, Jose Faustino Giron Ibarguen, Luis Alberto Barrios Iriarte, Elba Yaneth Quintero Londono, Luz Dary Luna Makew, Brunilda Mena, Luz Dary Montoya Moreno, Juliana Lozano Mosquera, Leonor Olivia Renteria Murillo, Luz Elena Osorno Oquendo, Luz Edilia Goez Osario, Esmeralda del Sagrario Velez Pareja, Lilian Melania Ramirez Perea, Jairo Manuel Rangel Perez, Elizabeth Aguirre Quintero, Jesus Algidio Mosquera Ramirez, Hilda Rosa Moreno Regino, Jose Raul Correa Rojo, Fanny de Jesus Restrepo Sepulveda, Liliana Patricia Loaiza Urrego, Luz Marina Urrego Usuga, Luz Marina Cordoba Valencia, Jose de Jesus Varelas, Hermelia Vasquez, Lucelly Johana Jaramillo Velasquez, Luz Mery Puentes Vergara, Laura Veronica Restrepo Villa, Fanny de Jesus Restrepo Zapata, Luz Alba Flores de Jaramillo, Fabiola del Socorro Serna de Lemus and Griselvina Gomez de Mayo added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Bernado Lopez Alvarez, Doris Areiza, Cleofe Cuesta Blandon, Berlis Julieth Castano Bolivar, Bibiana Maria Chaverra, Carmen Tulia Asprilla Cordoba, Bellanira David, Consuelo Meneses Echeverri, Consuelo Meneses Echeverri, Ana Dolia Bolivar Garcia, Cenelina Patricia Gallego Garcia, Blanca Ines Perez Giraldo, Diana Amparo Lopez Higuita, Dora Neida de Jesus Rojas Londono, Ediltrudis del Carmen Arizal Macea, Clarivel Ayala Miranda, Claudia Esther Mena Mosquera, Doriela Amparo Palacio, Dina Luz Herrera Parra, Edith Avila Perez, Cesar Augusto Bolivar Rendon, Dora Alba Ramirez Restrepo, Benicio Cordoba Romana, Balvina Villero Rosario, Ela Patricia Arcia Sanchez, Edwin Nolberto Nieto Triana, Carlos Enrique Aguirre Tuberquia, Maria Graciela Herrera de Gil and Clara Rosa Uribe de Guisao added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Araceli Sepulveda Gutierrez, Araceli Sepulveda Gutierrez, Ana Tereza Mosquera Hurtado, Arcelio Arrieta Lora, Ayde Rosa Florez Manco, Angela Maria Montoya, Ana Ofelia Torres Torres and Arnolis Deys Gomez Vargas added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Luz Ney Ruiz Bustamante, Alejandro Ivan Bastidas Contreras, Alejandra Milena Hoyos David, Ana Joaquina Cuesta Escobar, Elvia Lucia Bolivar Garcia, Amanda de Jesus Guzman, Alba Esther Manco, Ana Dolores Buenano Martinez, Ana Josefa Espinoza Muriel, Amparo Osorio Osorio, Adriana Marledy Sanchez Posada, Alvaro Antonio Rodriguez, Alicia de Jesus Manco Velez, Adriana Patricia Isaza Zuleta and Ana de Jesus Vallejo de Hernandez added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Gloria Isabel Aguirre, Claudia Yanet Serna Arango, Alexandra Munoz Arias, Blanca Cecilia Canaveral, Argemiro Manuel Espriella Casarrubia, Maria Elena Montoya Colorado, Carlos Enrique Arena Durango, Luz Dary Carvajal Graciano, Maria del Rosario David Guzman, Teresa Lopez Julio, Maria Debora Duarte Lopez, Elvira del Carmen Lozano Lozano, Hector de Jesus Rivera Marin, Rosmira Suarez Metrio, Marlene Maria Marmol Perez, Maria de La Paz Blandon Pulgarin, Cila Maria Correa Sea, Luis Albeiro Moncada Trejos, Damaris Vergara Trespalacios, Lucila Mancilla de Gaviria, Lucila Mancilla de Gaviria and Silvia Amparo Giraldo de Obando added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Martin Eliecer de las Aguas Bello, Gladys Nunez Benitez, Maria Gabriela Benitez, Flor Maria Gaspar Causil, Maria Marleny Castro De Ocampo, Carlos Enrique Arena Durango, Cecilia Rosa Espitia, Elena Bello Espitia, Luis Antonio Guisao, Martha Cecilia Cardona Henao, Margarita Sofia Castillo Lambertinez, Ledys Naudith Yanes Leon, Francisco Javier Villada Llano, Gustavo Alonso Coneo Macias, Gregoria Tapia Marimon, Flor Angela Medina, Maria Luisa Mesa Mestra, Maria del Carmen Usuga Molina, Ana Lucia Molla Moreno, Luz Mila Buenano Rios, Luz Mila Buenano Rios, Gladys Maria Montes Urango, Lucy Andrea Usme Valencia, Natacha Piedrahita Valencia, Luz Mery Sanchez de Alvarez, Martina Cordoba de Berrio, Maria Elena Carmona de Cardona, Blanca Margarita Raigoza de Echavarria, Blanca Margarita Raigoza de Echavarria, Alicia Garcia de Gaviria and Maria Rosmira Velez de Henao added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Olivia Arango Andrade, Sonia Elizabeth Patino Bedoya, Zulia Cuesta Blandon, Rodolfo de Jesus Cardona, Rosalba Bedoya Echavarria, Liliana Maria Garcia Garcia, Rosa Edilma Lopez Gaviria, Juan Fernando Marin Londono, Policarpa De Los Dolores Lopez Marin, Luz Adriana Gonzalez Ocampo, Luz Neriz Martinez Pedroza, Sandra Milena Medina Quintero, Maria Gabriela Restrepo Velez, Fanny de Jesus Maldonado de Bolivar, Rosana Tabares de Gaviria, Rosana Tabares de Gaviria, Teresa De Jesus Gaviria de Gomez and Marta Ligia Pavas de Rojas added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Martha Lia Arenas, Merdado Argote, Marleni Villada Buitrago, Maria Teresa Buritica, Maria Luz Bedoya Echavarria, Nancy Rodas Gallego, Maria Elena Rios Gaviria, Luz Mery Garcia Henao, Maria Consuelo Marulanda Martinez, Marleny Restrepo Marulanda, Marleny Restrepo Marulanda, Marleny Mazo, Maria Olga Rios Molina, Luz Mery Munoz Munoz, Marta Lina Otalvaro Otalvaro, Maria Olivia Florez Pavas, Maria Consuelo Montoya Ramirez, Maria Romelia Rios, Luz Marina Rodriguez Valencia, Maria Cecilia Florez Valencia, Miguel Angel Valencia Valencia, Maria Cielo Villada, Maria Elvia Orozco de Arias, Margarita de Jesus Correa de Bedoya, Maria Omaira Gaviria de Molina, Martha Cecilia Ocampo de Otalvaro, Magdalena Ines Ocampo de Perez and Ofelia Valencia de Rios added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Jorge Ivan Ocampo Arenas, Jaime de Jesus Gaviria Botero, Luis Alfonso Botero Botero, Claudia del Socorro Rios Castro, Flor Maria Arias Galeano, Luz Dary Bedoya Gaviria, Gloria Patricia Valencia Lopez, Policarpa de los Dolores Lopez Marin, Liliana Patricia Alvarez Mazo, Luis Eduardo Morales, Heriberto de Jesus Patino Ocampo, Celina de Jesus Otalvaro Osorio, Gloria del Carmen Carmona Perez, Lucia Molina Rios, Celia Margarita Tobon Tobon, Celia Margarita Tobon Tobon, John Julio Castaneda Toro, Jesus Maria Villada Valencia, Diana Patricia Velasquez, Clara Rosa Cardenas de Gutierrez, Elvia Tobon de Jurado and Cecilia Rios de Rincon added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Blanca Luz Villada Alzate, Amparo Henao Arias, Ana Maris Cardona De Pavas, Adriana Patricia Villada Grisales, Maria Cristina Chaverra Higuita, Bernarda Osorio Marulanda, Ruth Nelly Estrada Munoz, Maria Soely Florez Orozon, Blanca Ruth Osorio, Gloria Nelly Tuberquia Osorio, Maria Nubia Gonzalez Patino, Ana Fabiola Monsalve Pulgarin, Blanca Olivia Toro Rios, Maria Olivia Castro Rios, Carmen Dolores Carmona Roman, Virginia de Jesus Sanchez, Ana Maria Gaviria Tabares, Carlos Alberto Florez Valencia, Jesus Maria Villada Valencia, Yhirley Vanesa Ochoa Velez, Carmen Emilia Villa, Olga Del Socorro Rodas Villada, Teresa De Jesus Zapata, Betsabe Mejia de Lopez, Maria Isabel Ocampo de Ocampo, Emilce del Socorro Castro de Patino, Maria Nubia Jimenez de Ramirez and Carmen Julia Chica de Suaza added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Maria Consuelo Morales Castano, Maria del Rocio Calle Gonzalez, Maria del Rosario Pulgarin Garces, Maria Graciela Caro Alavarez, Maria Graciela Caro Alavarez, Maria Leticia Correa, Maria Lilian Quintero Ramirez, Maria Lucelly Agudelo, Maria Marleny Urrego, Maria Ninfa Restrepo de Cardenas, Marleny de Jesus Alvarez, Martha Cecilia Palacio Palacio, Nelsyn Catalina Mesa, Orlinde Palacio Lopez, Rosa Marina Amariles Palacio, Rosalba Ortega Restrepo, Rosalba Ruiz Restrepo and Rosmira Pino Higuita added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Alica de Jesus Alvarez, Cruz Elena Toro Garcia, Cruz Elena Toro Garcia, Elvia Julia del Carmen Correa de Diosa, Ferley de Jesus Martinez Rios, Flor Angela Zapata Bedoya, Gloria Elena Balzan Benjumea, Gloria Elena Piedrahita, Gloria Emilsen Zapata Ardila, Jose Genaro Florez Diosa, Lorena Alcira Velez Acevedo, Lucia Margarita Ardila de Bedoya, Luz Amanda Montoya Garcia, Luz Marina Restrepo, Luz Miriam Gutierrez Obando, Luz Nelly Blandon Hoyos, Luz Ofelia Jaramillo Parra, Maria Catalina Jimenez and Maria Consuelo Morales Castano added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Luz Marina Tuberquia Osorio, Maria Omaira Franco Vasquez, Amparo de Jesus Morales Olivares, Enadis Martinez Bravo, Juana de Dios Bedoya, Maria Elena Gonzalez Moreno, Orlando de Jesus Garcia Betancur, Teresa Tabares, Ursula del Carmen Cabadia Marquez, Xiomara Piedrahita Valencia, Yaneth Amin Bello, Aleida Irene Ruiz de Arredondo, Alicia De Jesus Alvarez, Alida Del Socorro Santana Amariles, Ana Marina Garcia Serna, Angel Emiro Arboleda Ortiz, Bertalina Mesa de Agudelo, Blanca Asenth Restrepo and Cristobal de Jesus Restrepo Berrio added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Luz Marina Cordona Perez, Magnolia Trujillo, Maria del Carmen Gonzalez Cordoba, Maria Juliana Poveda de Murillo, Maria de Jesus Monsalve de Avendano, Maria Leonor Chaverra de Rendon, Martha Alicia Murillo Mosquera, Martha Isabel Alvarez Grisales, Nelsa Rosa Ortiz Padilla, Nur Ernedis Gomez Guerrero, Graciela Leon de la Hoz, Rafael Angel Manco Guisao, Sandra Bibiana Moreno Fernandez, Amanda Ospina de Ruiz, Gabriel de Jesus Cano, Luz Margarita Arango Restrepo, Aida Mosquera Canizalez, Asterio Mendoza Mosquero and Dora Nelly Escobar Metaute added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 11, 2017 Party Beatriz Helena Arcila Rincon, Gloria Elena Botero Ocampo, Maria Rosmira Velez de Henao, Martha Elena Valencia Correa, Monica Bedoya Gaviria Gaviria, Ada Luz Teheran Herrera, Alba Rocio Soto Acevedo, Ana Emilcen Diaz Escobar, Ana Waitoto Gamboa, Diana Maria Vargas Hernandez, Emilia Blandon, Fanny de Jesus Graciano Torres, Flor Elena Lopez Guerra, Gustavo Miguel Villadiego Martinez, Jhon Jairo Torres Varelas, Luz Elena Parra Morales, Jose Saturnino Murillo Moreno, Luz Everly Moreno Obregon and Linda Disney Morano Perea added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 10, 2017 Party Aura Maria Ocampo Ocampo added. (Parry, Ronald)
March 10, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5874958), filed by Angela Maria Henao Montes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Parry, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montes v. Chiquita Brands International Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus Freidheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A Tsacalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven G Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DINA LUZ PEREZ POLO
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvia Lucia Bolivar Garcia
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosiris del Carmen Morales
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ SORAYA ARANGO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalba Durango
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Villada Llano
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edelmira Padilla Moreno
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Ofelia Jaramill Parra
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA PATRICIA CORREA MARIN
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA MARGARITA RUIZ MORALES
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando de Jesus Garcia Betancur
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leocadia Marmolejo Palacios
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA NELLY GEORGE GANAN
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA TRILLO NAVARRO
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR MANUEL GUTIERRE CARDENAS
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNARDINO TAPIAS CORDOBA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEOVANIS SANTANA DIAZ
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregoria Tapia Marimon
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Dolores Ospina de Mesa
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSANGELA VIDALES PALACIO
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fanny de Jesus Maldon de Bolivar
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRISTINA PARDO TRIANA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Marina Tuberqui Osorio
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Romelia Rios
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Glabed Londono Aguirre
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ MARY GOMEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Maria Garcia Garcia
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlis Palma Mosquera
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Esneda Guisao Higuita
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Javier Madrigal Goez
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA CECILIA BANQUET SANCHEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA ELVIRA SANCHEZ DE MENDOZA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIRNIA CARTAGENA CORDOBA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBIA ATENCIO PAJARO
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA ISABEL MARULAND VILLA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PABLO ANTONIO VARELAS
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Luz Ayazo Gomez
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rosa Figueroa Pena
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AYDA CASTRO BELTRAN
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARISTARCO PALACIOS HINESTROZA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ AIDA RUIZ
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurina Agueda Narvaez Ramos
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATIA MERCEDES VALLE MENDEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Bergelia Mosque Chaverra
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernan de Jesus Serna
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VENANCIO VIERA CORRALES
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerita Sofia Gonzalez Gonzalez
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Elsy Lopez Munera
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Esther Mena Mosquera
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA ISABEL LOPEZ PENA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEODORA MARIA CORDERO VILLALBA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENADIS JUDITH ALTAMIRA BENITEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Eugenia Ubaldo Cuesta
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIXTA SOLAR DE JULIO
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILADYS GUERRERO HERRERA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Eugenia Munoz
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FALCONERY GOMEZ PUERTA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esperanza del Socorro Lujan
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA SANTOYA HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula del Carmen Caba Marquez
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA FELICIA DELGADO
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Estella Montoya
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN TULIA MESTRA DORIA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORA ANGELA DAVID BEDOYA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alfonso Botero Botero
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Rodas Gallego
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia de Jesus Rojas Cardona
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Julia Chica de Suaza
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA MARLENEY CANAVE LAVERDE
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Eduardo Morales
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCELLY CARVAJAL NISPERUZA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH CALDERON GALVIS
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Miguel Villadie Martinez
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlyn Arcos de Arcos
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA ISABEL GOMEZ LENIS
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Fanery Ochoa Salgado
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Carmona de Cardona
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NINFA TORRES VERA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMEL MACHADO PEREZ
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA CONSUELO ZUELTA LAVERDE
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIOCELINA VERGARA JARAMILLO
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NURY PARRA LOBON
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSCAR LUIS CHARRASQUI GARCIA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicidad Lemos Avila
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria del Socorro Arroyave
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA TERESA CORDOBA CORRREA
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORIS DEL CARMEN HOYO DE CAPACHERO
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSIRIS BORJA GRACIANO
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor Elena Echavarri Osorio
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Evangelina Cana de Morales
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ines Marin Velasquez
Represented By: Jonathan Davenport
Represented By: Douglass A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ronald Richard Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?