IN RE BITCONNECT SECURITIES LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Akiva Katz, Francisco Doria, Aric Harold, James Gurry, Justin Perry, BitConnect Investor Group, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Maryann Marryshow, Mija Yoo, Nelson Arias and Cory Struzan
Defendant: BitConnect Trading Ltd., Ryan Hildreth, Trevon Brown, BitConnect International PLC, John Doe No. 1, Craig Grant, Glenn Arcaro, John Doe Nos. 2-10, BitConnect Ltd., Ryan Maasen, Joshua Jeppesen, Nicholas Trovato, YouTube, LLC, Jeson Talingting Bana-ay, Mahendra Chaudhari, Piyush Savaliya, Ranjeet Saxena, Yuris Praseteya, Nay Minh, Smit Sandiphbhai Naik, Satish Kumbhani, Thomas Allan Atherton, Dhaval Mavani, Jean-Simon Labreche, Ramdayal Purohit, Divyesh Darji, Gautam Lathiya, Raj Sandipobhai Naik, Sandip Balvantrai Naik, Suresh Gorasiya, Bitcoin AMR Limited f/k/a BitConnect Public Limited, Le Thi Thannh Huy, Nalin Kotadiya, Santoso Wardah, Calen Powell, Trevon James, CRYPTONICK and Tanner Fox
Consolidated Plaintiff: Baltazar Avalos, Charles Mabra, Paul Long, Lena Huna, Andrew Kline, Dusty Showers, Kiandra Love, Brian Paige and Patricia Mengesha
Consolidated Defendant: Bitconnect and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 9:2018cv80086
Filed: January 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach (Office: West Palm Beach)
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying #145 Renewed Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service on Unserved Foreign Defendants. Dismissing all remaining Defendants EXCEPT Defendants Trevor Brown, Ryan Hildreth, and Tanner Fox. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 6, 2020 Filing 145 Renewed MOTION for Leave to Effect Alternative Service on Unserved Foreign Defendants by Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Mija Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
January 2, 2020 Filing 144 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #134 Order Striking,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Terminate Parties,. US Mail returned for: Ryan Massen. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp)
December 30, 2019 Filing 143 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #142 Order to Show Cause by Mija Yoo, Nelson Arias, Cory Struzan, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Maryann Marryshow. (Silver, David)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Show Cause Response due by 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS; Calen Powell, Thomas Allan Atherton and Jean-Simon Labreche terminated. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying #138 Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service on Unserved Foreign Defendants. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
December 16, 2019 Filing 139 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #133 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,. US Mail returned for: Ryan Maasen. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp)
December 5, 2019 Filing 138 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Effect Alternative Service on Unserved Foreign Defendants by Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Mija Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
December 5, 2019 Filing 137 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT /Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Jeson Talingting Bana-ay, BitConnect International PLC, BitConnect Ltd., BitConnect Trading Ltd., Bitcoin AMR Limited f/k/a BitConnect Public Limited, Trevon Brown, Mahendra Chaudhari, Divyesh Darji, John Doe No. 1, John Doe Nos. 2-10, Tanner Fox, Suresh Gorasiya, Ryan Hildreth, Le Thi Thannh Huy, Nalin Kotadiya, Satish Kumbhani, Gautam Lathiya, Dhaval Mavani, Nay Minh, Raj Sandipobhai Naik, Sandip Balvantrai Naik, Smit Sandiphbhai Naik, Yuris Praseteya, Ramdayal Purohit, Piyush Savaliya, Ranjeet Saxena, Santoso Wardah filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Mija Yoo, Nelson Arias, Cory Struzan, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Maryann Marryshow.(Silver, David)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying #135 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 2, 2019 Filing 135 Plaintiff's MOTION for Certificate of Appealability /Certification for Interlocutory Appeal by Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Mija Yoo. Responses due by 12/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER STRIKING #118 Second Amended Complaint,,, filed by Albert Parks, Cory Struzan, Maryann Marryshow, Mija Yoo, Faramarz Shemirani, Nelson Arias, ( Third Amended Complaint due by 12/5/2019.), Dismissing Defendants Jeppesen, Grant, and "CryptoNick". Craig Grant and Joshua Jeppesen terminated. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #122 Motion to Dismiss #118 Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; granting #130 Motion to Dismiss #118 Second Amended Complaint; Dismissing with prejudice Defendants Ryan Maasen and Glenn Arcaro. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 6, 2019 Filing 132 STATUS REPORT regarding Duplicative Motions to Dismiss by Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Mija Yoo (Silver, David)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT ON PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. On October 29, 2019, Defendant Maasen filed a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (DE #130 ). Upon review of the motion, it appears that Defendant Maasen has essentially restated (almost verbatim) the arguments made in Defendant Arcaro's pending Motion to Dismiss (DE #122 ), which is fully briefed (DE #128 ; DE #129 ). In light of the duplicative nature of the arguments made in these pending motions to dismiss, Plaintiffs are directed to file a status report by November 6, 2019, indicating whether it plans to offer any additional argument in response to Defendant Maasen's motion. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/4/2019. (kal)
October 29, 2019 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss #118 Second Amended Complaint,,, by Ryan Maasen. Responses due by 11/12/2019 (ls)
October 25, 2019 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re #122 MOTION TO DISMISS #118 Amended Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Glenn Arcaro. (Brotman, Kenn)
October 18, 2019 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #122 MOTION TO DISMISS #118 Amended Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Mija Yoo. Replies due by 10/25/2019. (Silver, David)
October 15, 2019 Reset Answer Due Deadline: Ryan Maasen response due 10/31/2019. (ls)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #125 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ryan K. Stumphauzer withdrawn from case. Deadline to obtain new counsel 10/31/2019. Status Report due by 10/31/2019. Defendant Maasen's Response to Second Amended Complaint due 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #124 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Glenn Arcaro's Motion to Dismiss (DE #122 ). Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is currently October 11, 2019. In the present Motion, Plaintiffs request a one-week extension to respond to the Motion because of the complex nature of this lawsuit, and because Plaintiffs' counsel has observed multiple religious holidays since the Motion was filed, which has hindered his ability to prepare the Response. (DE #124 at 1-2). I find good cause to grant the requested extension; therefore, Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the Motion is extended to October 18, 2019. This extended deadline does not excuse the Parties from compliance with all of the other pretrial deadlines previously set by the Court. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/10/2019. (kal)
October 9, 2019 Filing 125 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ryan K. Stumphauzer, Esq. for / by Ryan Maasen. Responses due by 10/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stumphauzer, Ryan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 124 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #122 MOTION TO DISMISS #118 Amended Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Mija Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
October 4, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Ryan Maasen response due 10/18/2019. per DE 123 (cbr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part Defendant Ryan Maasen's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. In the present Motion, Defendant Maasen requests a thirty (30) day extension to respond to the Second Amended Complaint due to the complexity of this case. I find good cause to grant the requested extension, in part, and will require Defendant Maasen to respond to the Second Amended Complaint by October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/4/2019. (kal)
September 27, 2019 Filing 122 MOTION TO DISMISS #118 Amended Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Glenn Arcaro. Responses due by 10/11/2019 (Brotman, Kenn)
September 27, 2019 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint re #118 Amended Complaint,,, by Ryan Maasen. Responses due by 10/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stumphauzer, Ryan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 120 Summons Issued as to Tanner Fox. (ls)
September 26, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Effectuate Service of Process upon Defendant Tanner Fox by Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Mija Yoo re #118 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Albert Parks, Cory Struzan, Maryann Marryshow, Mija Yoo, Faramarz Shemirani, Nelson Arias (Silver, David)
September 13, 2019 Filing 118 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action against Glenn Arcaro, Jeson Talingting Bana-ay, BitConnect International PLC, BitConnect Ltd., BitConnect Trading Ltd., Bitcoin AMR Limited f/k/a BitConnect Public Limited, Trevon Brown, Mahendra Chaudhari, Divyesh Darji, John Doe No. 1, John Doe Nos. 2-10, Suresh Gorasiya, Craig Grant, Ryan Hildreth, Le Thi Thannh Huy, Joshua Jeppesen, Nalin Kotadiya, Satish Kumbhani, Jean-Simon Labreche, Gautam Lathiya, Ryan Maasen, Dhaval Mavani, Nay Minh, Raj Sandipobhai Naik, Sandip Balvantrai Naik, Smit Sandiphbhai Naik, Calen Powell, Yuris Praseteya, Ramdayal Purohit, Piyush Savaliya, Ranjeet Saxena, Nicholas Trovato, Santoso Wardah, Tanner Fox filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Maryann Marryshow, Mija Yoo, Nelson Arias.(Silver, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 117 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani (Silver, David)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PAPERLESS ORDER. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), a plaintiff has 90 days from the filing of a complaint to serve a defendant. A review of the record indicates that Plaintiffs have not filed proof of service on all defendants. Accordingly, on or before September 6, 2019, Plaintiffs shall respond to this Order by filing a report with the Court stating the status of service on all defendants. For those defendants for whom no return of service currently appears in the record, Plaintiff shall (1) file proof of service indicating those Defendants were timely served, or (2) show good cause supported by specific facts to excuse the failure to comply with Rule 4(m), and any justification which may exist for an extension of time to serve process on any particular defendant. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/28/2019. (kal)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS granting #94 MOTION TO DISMISS #78 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Glenn Arcaro, granting #105 MOTION For Judicial Notice re #94 MOTION TO DISMISS #78 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Glenn Arcaro, granting #88 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint filed by YouTube, LLC, granting #86 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint filed by Ryan Maasen, YouTube, LLC, Glenn Arcaro (an individual) and Ryan Maasen terminated. (Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint due by 9/13/2019.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #113 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kiran Narayan Bhat withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
May 20, 2019 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kiran N. Bhat for / by Ryan Maasen. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bhat, Kiran)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PAPERLESS ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. Pursuant to this Court's Order Granting Motion to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines (DE #77 ), the Calendar Call scheduled for April 10, 2019 and the trial set for April 15, 2019 are vacated. They shall be rescheduled by separate Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/10/2019. (mbt)
April 8, 2019 Filing 111 Clerks Notice to Filer re #109 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#110]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
April 5, 2019 Filing 110 RESPONSE to #108 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Glenn Arcaro. (ls)(See Image at DE #109)
April 5, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE by Glenn Arcaro re #108 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Brotman, Kenn)
April 2, 2019 Filing 108 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #97 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Silver, David)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 9:18-cv-80086-DMM, 9:18-cv-81329-DMM (pcs)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 9:18-cv-80086-DMM, 9:18-cv-81549-DMM (pcs)
February 22, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION For Judicial Notice re #94 MOTION TO DISMISS #78 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Glenn Arcaro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brotman, Kenn)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PAPERLESS ORDER. In light of filing of the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (DE #78 ), the following motions are denied as moot: Defendant Glenn Arcaro's Motion to Dismiss (DE #65 ); Defendant Glenn Arcaro's Motion for Judicial Notice in Support of his Motion to Dismiss (DE #66 ); Defendant Ryan Maasen's Motion to Dismiss (DE #67 ); Defendant Youtube, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (DE #68 ). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/20/2019. (kal)
December 4, 2018 Filing 103 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint filed by YouTube, LLC. (Berman, Nathan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #94 MOTION TO DISMISS #78 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Glenn Arcaro. (Brotman, Kenn)
December 4, 2018 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint filed by Ryan Maasen. (Bhat, Kiran)
November 29, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenn Brotman on behalf of Glenn Arcaro. Attorney Kenn Brotman added to party Glenn Arcaro(pty:dft). (Brotman, Kenn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated address and/or email information for PHV attorney Carl E. Volz re #98 Notice of Change of Address. (pt)
November 21, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Shawn Hogue (Hogue, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION TO DISMISS #78 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #88 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint , #86 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. Replies due by 11/27/2018. (Silver, David)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #95 unopposed motion to extend. Defendants Ryan Maasen, Glen Arcaro, and YouTube, LLC each filed a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. (DE #86 ; DE #88 ; DE #94 ). Plaintiffs' consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions is due on November 20, 2018. (DE 93 ). In light of the upcoming Thanksgiving holiday, the deadline for Defendants Ryan Maasen, Glen Arcaro, and Youtube, LLC to reply to Plaintiffs' forthcoming Response is proactively extended to December 4, 2018. No other deadlines are modified or extended as a result of this order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/15/2018. (mbt)
November 14, 2018 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Briefs in Further Support of Motions to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Nathan)
November 8, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION TO DISMISS #78 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Glenn Arcaro. Responses due by 11/23/2018 (Lumpkin, Carol)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #91 Motion for Extension of Time and to Exceed Page Limitation. The deadline for Plaintiffs Albert Parks and Faramarz Shemirani to respond to the Defendant Ryan Maasen's Motion to Dismiss (DE #86 ) and Defendant Youtube, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (DE #88 ) is extended to November 20, 2018. No other deadlines are extended or modified as a result of this Order. Additionally, if Plaintiffs Parks and Shemirani file a single consolidated response to these Motions to Dismiss, the page limit for such response is increased to forty-five (45) pages. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/7/2018. (kal)
November 6, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE of Compliance /Supplemental Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani re #91 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #88 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint , #86 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint , and DefendaPlaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani (Silver, David)
November 5, 2018 Filing 91 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #88 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint , #86 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint , and Defendant Glenn Arcaro's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Silver, David)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #89 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Defendant Glenn Arcaro's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint may exceed the page limit by five (5) pages. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/2/2018. (kal)
November 1, 2018 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR HIS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Glenn Arcaro. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol)
October 25, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint by YouTube, LLC. Responses due by 11/8/2018 (Berman, Nathan)
October 25, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Ryan Maasen re #79 MOTION to Strike #78 Amended Complaint filed by Ryan Maasen (Bhat, Kiran)
October 25, 2018 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #78 Amended Complaint by Ryan Maasen. Responses due by 11/8/2018 (Bhat, Kiran)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #83 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant Glenn Arcaro to respond to the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (DE #78 ) is extended to November 8, 2018. No other deadlines are extended or modified as a result of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/24/2018. (kal)
October 24, 2018 Filing 84 Clerks Notice to Filer re #83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Consolidated Amended Complaint re #78 Amended Complaint. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
October 23, 2018 Filing 83 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #78 Amended Complaint by Glenn Arcaro. Responses due by 11/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol) Modified Relief on 10/24/2018 (ls).
October 23, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan Hildreth (ls)[System Updated]
October 19, 2018 Filing 81 Summons Issued as to Thomas Allan Atherton, Jeson Talingting Bana-ay, Bitcoin AMR Limited f/k/a BitConnect Public Limited, Mahendra Chaudhari, Divyesh Darji, Suresh Gorasiya, Le Thi Thannh Huy, Nalin Kotadiya, Satish Kumbhani, Jean-Simon Labreche, Gautam Lathiya, Dhaval Mavani, Nay Minh, Raj Sandipobhai Naik, Sandip Balvantrai Naik, Smit Sandiphbhai Naik, Calen Powell, Yuris Praseteya, Ramdayal Purohit, Piyush Savaliya, Ranjeet Saxena, Santoso Wardah. (ls)
October 18, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Bitcoin AMR Limited f/k/a BitConnect Public Limited, #2 Summon(s) Nalin Kotadiya, #3 Summon(s) Suresh Gorasiya, #4 Summon(s) Mahendra Chaudhari, #5 Summon(s) Gautam Lathiya, #6 Summon(s) Dhaval Mavani, #7 Summon(s) Piyush Savaliya, #8 Summon(s) Ramadayal Purohit, #9 Summon(s) Ranjeet Saxena, #10 Summon(s) Sandip Balvantrai Naik, #11 Summon(s) Smit Sandiphbhai Naik, #12 Summon(s) Raj Sandiphbhai Naik, #13 Summon(s) Satish Kumbhani, #14 Summon(s) Yuris Prasetya, #15 Summon(s) Nay Minh a/k/a Mr. Roberts, #16 Summon(s) Le Thi Thannh Huy a/k/a Ms. Helen, #17 Summon(s) Jeson Talingting Bana-Ay a/k/a Satao Nakamoto, #18 Summon(s) Santoso Wardah a/k/a Mr. Santoso, #19 Summon(s) Calen Powell a/k/a Crypto Clover, #20 Summon(s) Divyesh Darji, #21 Summon(s) Thomas Allan Atherton, #22 Summon(s) Jean-Simon Labreche) (Silver, David)
October 16, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION to Strike #78 Amended Complaint by Ryan Maasen. Responses due by 10/30/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bhat, Kiran)
October 11, 2018 Filing 78 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action against All Defendants, filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani.(Silver, David)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 4, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani of Intent to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Silver, David)
October 2, 2018 Filing 75 Consent MOTION to Stay re #64 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. Responses due by 10/16/2018 (Silver, David)
August 29, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Jeffrey Grubman. (Silver, David)
August 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #70 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (DEs #65 , #67 , #68 ) is extended to October 5, 2018. No other deadlines are modified or extended as a result of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/26/2018. (kal)
August 24, 2018 Filing 72 Clerks Entry of Default as to Trevon Brown - Motions Terminated: #71 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/24/2018. (ls)
August 23, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Trevon Brown by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, David)
August 23, 2018 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #67 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #48 Amended Complaint , #68 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #48 Amended Complaint , #65 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #48 Amended Complaint Third Amended Complaint by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Silver, David)
August 20, 2018 Filing 69 Clerks Notice to Filer re #66 Notice (Other),. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
August 17, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #48 Amended Complaint by YouTube, LLC. Responses due by 8/31/2018 (Berman, Nathan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #48 Amended Complaint by Ryan Maasen. Responses due by 8/31/2018 (Bhat, Kiran)
August 17, 2018 Filing 66 Motion for Judicial Notice by Glenn Arcaro re #65 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #48 Amended Complaint Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A_UK Court Order, #2 Exhibit EX B_UK Court Order) (Lumpkin, Carol) Modified to convert document to a motion on 8/20/2018 (ls).
August 17, 2018 Filing 65 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #48 Amended Complaint Third Amended Complaint by Glenn Arcaro. Responses due by 8/31/2018 (Lumpkin, Carol) Modified Text on 8/20/2018 (ls).
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 4/15/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/10/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2018., All Discovery due by 1/11/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 10/11/2018., In Limine Motions due by 1/25/2019., Motions due by 1/25/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/12/2019.), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #62 Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit. Defendant Glenn Arcaro's Motion to Dismiss may exceed the page limit by five (5) pages. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/14/2018. (tfa)
August 13, 2018 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File - Glenn Arcaro's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit For His Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Glenn Arcaro. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nicole C. Mueller. Nicole C. Mueller may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendant Glenn Arcaro. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Nicole C. Mueller at nicole.mueller@klgates.com. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/9/2018. (tfa)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Desiree F. Moore. Desiree F. Moore may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendant Glenn Arcaro. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Desiree F. Moore at desiree.moore@klgates.com. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/9/2018. (tfa)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Carl E. Volz. Carl E. Volz may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendant Glenn Arcaro. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Carl E. Volz at carl.volz@klgates.com. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/9/2018. (tfa)
August 8, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicole C. Mueller. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10891624 by Glenn Arcaro. Responses due by 8/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol)
August 8, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Desiree F. Moore. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10891623 by Glenn Arcaro. Responses due by 8/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol)
August 8, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Carl E. Volz. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10891606 by Glenn Arcaro. Responses due by 8/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Brian M. Willen. Brian M. Willen may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendant YouTube, LLC. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Brian M. Willen at bwillen@wsgr.com Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/3/2018. (tfa)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Eli B. Richlin. Eli B. Richlin may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendant YouTube, LLC. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Eli B. Richlin at erichlin@wsgr.com Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/3/2018. (tfa)
July 31, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian M. Willen. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10866605 by YouTube, LLC. Responses due by 8/14/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Nathan)
July 31, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eli B. Richlin. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10866529 by YouTube, LLC. Responses due by 8/14/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Nathan)
July 23, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Michael Berman on behalf of YouTube, LLC. Attorney Nathan Michael Berman added to party YouTube, LLC(pty:dft). (Berman, Nathan)
July 9, 2018 Filing 50 Summons Issued as to YouTube, LLC. (ls)
July 6, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to be served upon YouTube, LLC by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Silver, David)
July 3, 2018 Filing 48 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani.(Silver, David)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document; granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Re: #5 Amended Complaint, #19 Amended Complaint filed by Ronald Nelson, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Francisco Doria, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. Plaintiffs Operative Complaint due 7/3/2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/21/2018. (ls)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Approving Stipulation/Consolidating Cases for Appointing Lead Plaintiff, Approving Co-Lead Counsel and Creation of Executive Committee. The Securities class actions, 9:18-cv-80086-DMM; 9:18-cv-80319DMM; 98:18-cv-21118-DMMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM pending in this Judicial District are hereby consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42 (a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Case numbers 9:18-cv-80319DMM; 98:18-cv-21118-DMMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM are closed. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/19/2018. Associated Cases: 9:18-cv-80086-DMM, 1:18-cv-21118-DMM, 9:18-cv-80319-DMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM (kpe)
June 12, 2018 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint, by Glenn Arcaro. Attorney Carol Celeiro Lumpkin added to party Glenn Arcaro(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol)
June 7, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kiran Narayan Bhat on behalf of Ryan Maasen. Attorney Kiran Narayan Bhat added to party Ryan Maasen(pty:dft). (Bhat, Kiran)
May 2, 2018 Filing 43 ANSWER to Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Ryan Hildreth. (fjn) (Defendant's Address Updated)
May 1, 2018 Filing 42 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #19 Amended Complaint with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. Trevon Brown served on 4/12/2018, answer due 4/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Process upon Trevon Brown a/k/a Trevon James)(Silver, David)
April 30, 2018 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. (Silver, David)
April 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Striking #37 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Ronald Nelson, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Francisco Doria, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Silver, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff the BitConnect Investor Group (Albert Parks and Faramarz Shemirani) MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP and Silver Miller filed by Ryan Maasen. Replies due by 5/4/2018. (Stumphauzer, Ryan)
April 26, 2018 Filing 38 Clerks Notice to Filer re #35 Notice of Striking. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
April 26, 2018 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. Glenn Arcaro waiver sent on 4/13/2018, answer due 6/12/2018. (Silver, David)
April 25, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #19 Amended Complaint with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Process upon Ryan Hildreth)(Silver, David)
April 25, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Striking #33 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Silver, David) Modified Link on 4/26/2018 (ls).
April 25, 2018 Filing 34 Clerks Notice to Filer re #33 Summons Returned Executed,. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ls)
April 24, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #19 Amended Complaint with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. Ryan Hildreth served on 4/13/2018, answer due 4/27/2018. (Silver, David)
April 13, 2018 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT signed by : David C. Silver. re #31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff the BitConnect Investor Group (Albert Parks and Faramarz Shemirani) MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP and Silver Miller by Faramarz Shemirani, Charles Wildes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Silver, David)
April 13, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ( Responses due by 4/27/2018), MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff the BitConnect Investor Group (Albert Parks and Faramarz Shemirani) ( Responses due by 4/27/2018), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP and Silver Miller by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. Attorney David Chad Silver added to party Albert Parks(pty:mov), Attorney David Chad Silver added to party Faramarz Shemirani(pty:mov). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
April 11, 2018 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT filed jointly by Plaintiffs and by Ryan Maasen (Stumphauzer, Ryan)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report, ( Status Report due by 4/13/2018.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/4/2018. (ls)
March 27, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #19 Second Amended Complaint filed by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. Replies due by 4/3/2018. (Silver, David)
March 19, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #19 Second Amended Complaint . Responses due by 3/27/2018 (ls) (per DE #26)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #21 MOTION for Leave to Serve Process Electronically, denying #23 Motion for Leave to Serve Process by International Mail or FedEx and by Electronic Means on the BitConnect Corporate Defendants. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/16/2018. (ls)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER. Defendants move for an extension of time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint and represent that Plaintiffs oppose the Motion (DE #24 ). Accordingly, Plaintiffs must file a response to the Motion by March 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/19/2018. (kal)
March 13, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Ryan Maasen (Stumphauzer, Ryan)
March 13, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Ryan Maasen. Attorney Ryan K. Stumphauzer added to party Ryan Maasen(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Paige Lawsuit Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Long Lawsuit Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Kline Lawsuit Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Avalos Lawsuit Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Argiro Lawsuit Complaint)(Stumphauzer, Ryan)
March 12, 2018 Filing 23 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Serve Process by International Mail or FedEx and by Electronic Means on the BitConnect Corporate Defendants by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. (Silver, David)
March 8, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint, with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. Ryan Maasen served on 2/4/2018, answer due 2/20/2018. (Silver, David)
March 7, 2018 Filing 21 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Serve Process Electronically by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Silver, David)
February 28, 2018 Filing 20 Alias Summons Issued as to John Doe No. 1. (ls)
February 27, 2018 Filing 19 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry.(Silver, David)
February 27, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Silver, David)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint must be separately filed by March 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/23/2018. (kal)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Continuing Trial, ( Calendar Call reset for 2/13/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial reset for 2/19/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/22/2018. (ls)
February 22, 2018 Filing 15 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks: Scheduling Conference held on 2/22/2018. Attorney Appearance(s): David Chad Silver, Esq. and Jason Stuart Miller, Esq. Order to follow. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5294 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gm1)
February 21, 2018 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed - Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Silver, David)
February 21, 2018 Filing 13 Plaintiff's SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Silver, David)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/8/2018. (ls)
February 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. Responses due by 2/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
February 5, 2018 Filing 10 Alias Summons Issued as to John Doe No. 1. (ls)
February 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Silver, David)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Trial Date and Scheduling Conference, ( Calendar Call set for 9/12/2018 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 9/17/2018 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2018 01:45 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/1/2018. (ls)
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ryan Maasen. (ls)
January 31, 2018 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Defendant's Address is Not Listed on Summons. (ls)
January 30, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants, filed by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Akiva Katz, James Gurry, Justin Perry. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Jeppesen, #2 Summon(s) Maasen, #3 Certification Akiva Katz)(Silver, David)
January 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Aric Harold (Silver, David)
January 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Glenn Arcaro, BitConnect International PLC, BitConnect Ltd., BitConnect Trading Ltd., Trevon Brown, John Doe No. 1, Craig Grant, Ryan Hildreth. (lrz1)
January 24, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lrz1)
January 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10354620, filed by Ronald Nelson, Aric Harold, Francisco Doria, Akiva Katz, Charles Wildes, James Gurry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) BitConnect International PLC, #3 Summon(s) BitConnect Ltd., #4 Summon(s) BitConnect Trading Ltd., #5 Summon(s) Glenn Arcaro, #6 Summon(s) Trevon Brown a/k/a Trevon James, #7 Summon(s) Ryan Hildreth, #8 Summon(s) Craig Grant, #9 Summon(s) John Doe No. 1 a/k/a CryptoNick, #10 Certification Charles Wildes, #11 Certification Francisco Doria, #12 Certification Aric Harold, #13 Certification James Gurry, #14 Certification Ronald Nelson)(Silver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE BITCONNECT SECURITIES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wildes
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Nelson
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akiva Katz
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Doria
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aric Harold
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gurry
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Perry
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BitConnect Investor Group
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Parks
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faramarz Shemirani
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Marryshow
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mija Yoo
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Arias
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Struzan
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BitConnect Trading Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hildreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BitConnect International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Arcaro
Represented By: Carol Celeiro Lumpkin
Represented By: Carl E. Volz
Represented By: Desiree Moore
Represented By: Nicole Claire Mueller
Represented By: Kenn Brotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nos. 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BitConnect Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Maasen
Represented By: Ryan K. Stumphauzer
Represented By: Kiran Narayan Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Jeppesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Trovato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Michael Berman
Represented By: Eli B. Richlin
Represented By: Brian M. Willen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeson Talingting Bana-ay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahendra Chaudhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piyush Savaliya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranjeet Saxena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuris Praseteya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nay Minh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smit Sandiphbhai Naik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satish Kumbhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Allan Atherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhaval Mavani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Simon Labreche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramdayal Purohit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divyesh Darji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gautam Lathiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raj Sandipobhai Naik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandip Balvantrai Naik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suresh Gorasiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitcoin AMR Limited f/k/a BitConnect Public Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Thi Thannh Huy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nalin Kotadiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santoso Wardah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calen Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevon James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRYPTONICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanner Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Baltazar Avalos
Represented By: Ross Adam Appel
Represented By: Emily Cornelia Komlossy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Charles Mabra
Represented By: Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Paul Long
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.
Represented By: Steven William Teppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lena Huna
Represented By: Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Andrew Kline
Represented By: Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Represented By: Michael James Pascucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dusty Showers
Represented By: Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kiandra Love
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.
Represented By: Steven William Teppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brian Paige
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Alex C. Davis
Represented By: Abigale R. Green
Represented By: Jacob E. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patricia Mengesha
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Genevieve M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bitconnect
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?