Woliner v. Summers et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Woliner
Defendant: Kristen Summers, Louise Wilhite-St. Laurent, Lucy Gee and Martha Sofronsky
Case Number: 9:2018cv80305
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach (Office: West Palm Beach)
Presiding Judge: William P. Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S. Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE/MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH'S PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, FOR CIVIL COMTEMPT AND FOR SANCTIONS [DE 129]. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DETERMINING AMOUNT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES TO BE PAID BY PLAINTIFF, KENNETH WOLINER, TO DEFENDANTS KRISTEN SUMMERS, LOUISE ST. LAURENT, AND LUCY GEE PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SA NCTIONS DATED NOVEMBER 13, 2018 [DE 108]. Plaintiff, Kenneth Woliner shall reimburse Defendants, Kristen Summers, Louise St. Laurent, and Lucy Gee, for their attorneys fees in the amount of $1,922.50, and costs in the amount of $676.20, for a total of $2,598.70. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to pay the sum of $2,598.70 to Defendants on or before February 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 121 Defendant Summers, St. Laurent, and Gee's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Frederic B. Jennings Jr. and for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to Plaintiff's Non-party Subpoena to the Department of Health Filed on November 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 12/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (kza)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting in part 77 defendants Summers, St. Laurent, and Gee's Motion for Sanctions and 89 Motion to Compel the Completion of Plaintiff's Deposition and for Sanctions; denying 100 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion to Terminate or Limit scope of deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 11/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (kza)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 87 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order From Non-Party Subpoena Issued to the Department of Health and denying as moot 86 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Certificate of Non-Objection as Untimely. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 11/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (kza)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 82 Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Production of Non-Parties Served September 30, 2018 or in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (kza)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 30 Plaintiff's Verified Motion to Compel Defendants to Submit Philip Wiseberg to Appear for Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (kza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woliner v. Summers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Woliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Summers
Represented By: Broderick Levert Taylor
Represented By: James Orrin Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Wilhite-St. Laurent
Represented By: Broderick Levert Taylor
Represented By: James Orrin Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Gee
Represented By: Broderick Levert Taylor
Represented By: James Orrin Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Sofronsky
Represented By: Broderick Levert Taylor
Represented By: James Orrin Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?