Long et al v. Bitconnect International, PLC et al

Plaintiff: Paul Long and Kiandra Love
Defendant: BitConnect International PLC, Ryan Maasen, BitConnect Ltd. and BitConnect Trading Ltd.
Case Number: 9:2018cv80319
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
1 Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per Chambers. Closing Case. (kpe)
June 19, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER Approving Stipulation/Consolidating Cases for Appointing Lead Plaintiff, Approving Co-Lead Counsel and Creation of Executive Committee. The Securities class actions, 9:18-cv-80086-DMM; 9:18-cv-80319DMM; 98:18-cv-21118-DMMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM pending in this Judicial District are hereby consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42 (a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Case numbers 9:18-cv-80319DMM; 98:18-cv-21118-DMMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM are closed. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/19/2018. Associated Cases: 9:18-cv-80086-DMM, 1:18-cv-21118-DMM, 9:18-cv-80319-DMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM (kpe)
June 19, 2018 Cases associated. (kpe)
June 11, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on June 7, 2018. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/8/2018. (gp)
March 14, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/14/18. (rms1)
March 13, 2018 19 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jasper D. Ward, mailing date March 13, 2018, (pt)
March 13, 2018 18 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
March 13, 2018 17 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 6:18-cv-00154. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
March 9, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER transferring case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida, West Palm Beach Division. The Court's March 1, 2018 Show Cause Order (Doc. #14 ) is DISCHARGED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/9/2018. (ctp)(JLC)
March 7, 2018 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 Order pdf filed by Paul Long, Kiandra Love. (Teppler, Steven)
March 1, 2018 Set deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 3/8/2018. (ALL)
March 1, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER on or before Thursday, March 8, 2018, Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to show cause why this action should be allowed to proceed in this forum. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/1/2018. (ZRR)
February 28, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Jasper D. Ward, appearing on behalf of Paul Long, Kiandra Love (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL-71377.) Related document: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Jasper D. Ward to appear pro hac vice. (LMM)
February 26, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #12 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/26/2018. (RN)
February 23, 2018 12 Unopposed MOTION for Jasper D. Ward to appear pro hac vice by Paul Long, Kiandra Love. (Yanchunis, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 13, 2018 11 NOTICE to counsel Abigale Rhodes Green of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk) (cpt). (DMA)
February 13, 2018 10 NOTICE to counsel Alex C. Davis of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk) (cpt). (DMA)
February 13, 2018 9 NOTICE to counsel Jasper D. Ward IV of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk) (ctp). (DMA)
February 13, 2018 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Paul Long, Kiandra Love.(Teppler, Steven)
February 6, 2018 Set/reset deadline: Amended complaint due by 2/13/2018 (JET)
February 6, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before Tuesday, February 13, 2018, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that remedies the deficiencies identified in this Order. Failure to file may result in closure of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/6/2018. (ctp)(JLC)
February 5, 2018 6 Case reassigned` to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. New case number: 6:18-cv-154-Orl-37DCI. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
February 2, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER reassigning this case to another District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 2/2/2018. (SC)
January 31, 2018 4 Featured Case INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 1/31/2018. (counsel emailed)(AKJ)
January 31, 2018 3 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 1/31/2018. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKJ)
January 30, 2018 2 SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect International, PLC, Bitconnect LTD, Bitconnect Trading LTD, Ryan Maasen. (TMC)
January 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Bitconnect International, PLC, Bitconnect LTD, Bitconnect Trading LTD, Ryan Maasen with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX026608) filed by Kiandra Love, Paul Long. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long et al v. Bitconnect International, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Long
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward
Represented By: Steven William Teppler
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiandra Love
Represented By: Steven William Teppler
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BitConnect International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Maasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BitConnect Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BitConnect Trading Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?