CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al

Plaintiff: CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH
Defendant: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Federal Highway Administration and United States Army Corps of Engineers
Case Number: 9:2018cv80885
Filed: July 3, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30:0181
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2018 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Collins on behalf of Federal Highway Administration, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Attorney Brian Collins added to party Federal Highway Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Collins added to party U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Collins added to party United States Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Collins added to party United States Department of Interior(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Collins added to party United States Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft). (Collins, Brian)
July 3, 2018 19 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
July 3, 2018 18 Case transferred in from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:17-cv-01871. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
June 28, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and For Expedited Consideration Thereof. This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a).Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/28/2018. (lctsc2).
June 28, 2018 16 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding #7 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and For Expedited Consideration Thereof. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/28/2018. (lctsc2).
June 26, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting #14 Motion to Expedite. The court anticipates entering an order on the Motion to Transfer #7 by Thursday June 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/26/18. (DJS)
June 26, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Diffenderfer on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Diffenderfer, Robert)
June 25, 2018 14 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Pending Motion to Transfer Venue, or in the alternative, to Convene Status Conference by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion in the Alternative, for Status Conference)(Marvin, Barbara). Added MOTION for Hearing on 6/28/2018 (ztd).
June 11, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara M.R. Marvin on behalf of FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Marvin, Barbara)
June 8, 2018 12 MOTION to Intervene AND FILE A MOTION OR PLEADING RESPONSIVE TO COMPLAINT AT THE SAME TIME AS THE DEFENDANTS AND CONSISTENT WITH THIS COURT'S NOVEMBER 12 ORDER AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Aschauer, Frederick). Added MOTION for Leave to File on 6/11/2018 (ztd).
June 8, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Aschauer on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Aschauer, Frederick)
December 1, 2017 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Expedite Consideration Thereof filed by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Brown, Mark)
November 24, 2017 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Expedite Consideration Thereof filed by CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CWA Section 404(q) Dispute Resolution Process, #2 Exhibit June 21, 2013 Congressional Letter)(Petersen, Rafe)
November 14, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tsuki Hoshijima on behalf of All Defendants (Hoshijima, Tsuki)
November 12, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint within 15 days after the Court rules on the Defendants' Motion #7 to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/2/17. (DJS)
November 9, 2017 7 MOTION to Transfer Case , MOTION to Expedite Consideration Thereof by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Mark)
November 9, 2017 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Mark)
September 14, 2017 5 SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sth)
September 14, 2017 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE US Attorney for DC filed by CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH.(Petersen, Rafe)
September 14, 2017 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE US Attorney General filed by CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH.(Petersen, Rafe)
September 14, 2017 2 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(sth)
September 12, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sth)
September 12, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5112958) filed by CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Petersen, Rafe) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/14/2017) (zsth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Barbara M.R. Marvin
Represented By: Tsuki Hoshijima
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Represented By: Brian Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Barbara M.R. Marvin
Represented By: Tsuki Hoshijima
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Represented By: Brian Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Barbara M.R. Marvin
Represented By: Tsuki Hoshijima
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Represented By: Brian Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Represented By: Barbara M.R. Marvin
Represented By: Tsuki Hoshijima
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Represented By: Brian Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Barbara M.R. Marvin
Represented By: Tsuki Hoshijima
Represented By: Mark A. Brown
Represented By: Brian Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH
Represented By: Claudio Riedi
Represented By: Dexter Wayne Lehtinen
Represented By: Rafe Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?