Taylor et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lonnie O. Taylor, III and Sandra Taylor
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2018cv81088
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach (Office: West Palm Beach)
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in District of Maryland as case 1:18-cv-02656, filed 08/30/2018. (jua)
August 30, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 9:18-cv-81088 electronically transferred out to Maryland. (mc)
August 30, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per DE #5 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-45) transferring case to the District of Maryland re: MDL 2775 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Catherine C. Blake. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Lonnie O. Taylor, III, Sandra Taylor. Smith & Nephew, Inc. served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (cbr)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against Smith & Nephew, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10907919, filed by Lonnie O. Taylor, Sandra Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Ostrow, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie O. Taylor, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Miles Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Taylor
Represented By: Jeffrey Miles Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?