United States of America v. Schwarzbaum
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Isac Schwarzbaum
Case Number: 9:2018cv81147
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:5316
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Mary)
October 17, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Isac Schwarzbaum identifying Corporate Parent Department of Treasury, Corporate Parent Internal Revenue Service for Isac Schwarzbaum (Casal, Jose)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America (Nasta, John)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nicole M. Elliott. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Andrea Darling De Cortes. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicole M. Elliott. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11063258 by Isac Schwarzbaum. Responses due by 10/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casal, Jose)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrea Darling De Cortes. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11063225 by Isac Schwarzbaum. Responses due by 10/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casal, Jose)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Isac Schwarzbaum. (Casal, Jose)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES -Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/24/2018 Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (ra)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Isac Schwarzbaum by 10/10/2018. Re: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Isac Schwarzbaum. Attorney Jose Angel Casal added to party Isac Schwarzbaum(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Casal, Jose)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by United States of America. Isac Schwarzbaum served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Nasta, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Isac Schwarzbaum. (cbr)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Isac Schwarzbaum. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Smith, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Schwarzbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isac Schwarzbaum
Represented By: Andrea Darling de Cortes
Represented By: Nicole M. Elliott
Represented By: Jose Angel Casal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: John P. Nasta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?