Udo-Akang v. Trump
Plaintiff: Dr. Daniel Udo-Akang
Defendant: President Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 9:2018cv81255
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #13 Motion to Submit Futher Exhibits in a Flash Drive. The submission of evidence at this time is premature. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 19, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Submit Futher Exhibits in a Flash Drive by Dr. Daniel Udo-Akang. (drz)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 EXHIBIT LIST 1-10 by Dr. Daniel Udo-Akang. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Dr. Daniel Udo-Akang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(pes) Modified text on 10/17/2018 (pes).
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to President Donald Trump #3 Summons Issued filed by Dr. Daniel Udo-Akang. (drz)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,,. US Mail returned for: Daniel Udo-Akang. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 Address Notification by Dr. Daniel Udo-Akang (Address Updated in CM/ECF). (drz)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to 6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Dr. Daniel Udo-Akang. (mee)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #3 Summons Issued. (drz)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #5 Motion to Seal Case. The Plaintiff has failed to provide a sufficient basis for the sealing of this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to seal court case by Daniel Udo-Akang. (dj)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 9/17/2018 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS 9-5915 (jmd)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Donald J. Trump. (mee)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against President Donald J. Trump. Filing fees $ 400.00 Receipt#: FLS900005915, filed by Daniel Udo-Akang. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Udo-Akang v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Daniel Udo-Akang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?