United States of America v. Dadurain
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Daniela Dadurain and Daniela Dadurian
Case Number: 9:2018cv81276
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:5313
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines Per DE#14. Responses due by 12/7/2018 (cqs)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or a responsive motion by December 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/16/2018. (sk01)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Daniela Dadurian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vollrath, Derick)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before David H. Lichter, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 6/6/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added United States of America. Mediation Hearing set for 06/06/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nasta, John)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Adam Neiman on behalf of Daniela Dadurian. Attorney Jeffrey Adam Neiman added to party Daniela Dadurian (pty:dft). (Neiman, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derick Roberson Vollrath on behalf of Daniela Dadurian. Attorney Derick Roberson Vollrath added to party Daniela Dadurian (pty:dft). (Vollrath, Derick)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America of Service (Nasta, John) Modified Text on 10/12/2018 (ls).
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Daniela Dadurian waiver sent on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Nasta, John)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER for Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference, ( Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 3/19/2019 03:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: (Fact Discovery due by 4/19/2019., Expert Discovery due by 5/6/2019., Jury Trial set for 8/19/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/14/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 6/19/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Requirements, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Daniela Dadurian. (ls)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ls)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniela Dadurian. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Nasta, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dadurain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniela Dadurain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniela Dadurian
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Neiman
Represented By: Derick Roberson Vollrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John P. Nasta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?