Doe v. Bradshaw et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Richard L. Swearingen and Ric L. Bradshaw
Case Number: 9:2018cv81345
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand to: 15th Judicial Circut Court for Palm Beach County. State Court Case Number: 502018CA011158 (pes)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Remanding Case to State Court. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (pes)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Richard L. Swearingen. (Bowden, Albert)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Dismissing Party Ric L. Bradshaw re #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (pes)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by John Doe. (D'Agostino, Cindy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief against Richard L. Swearingen, filed by John Doe.(D'Agostino, Cindy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant RIC BRADSHAW Only by John Doe (D'Agostino, Cindy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant RIC BRADSHAW Only by John Doe (D'Agostino, Cindy)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by November 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/17/2018. (kal)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Ric L. Bradshaw, Richard L. Swearingen. Attorney Albert J. Bowden, III added to party Ric L. Bradshaw(pty:dft). (Bowden, Albert)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ric L. Bradshaw. Responses due by 10/26/2018 (Williams, James)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11054207, filed by Ric L. Bradshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Bradshaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Swearingen
Represented By: Albert J. Bowden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ric L. Bradshaw
Represented By: James Orrin Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Rose Butler
Represented By: Albert J. Bowden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Cindy Ellen D'Agostino
Represented By: Barbara Jean Scheffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?