Grante v. Westera Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Steele Grante
Defendant: Visa, Inc., The Unkown Insurance Company for Visa and Visa, Inc., Westera Credit Union, The National Credit Union Share Insurance Fund, Visa, The Unknown Insurance Company for Westera Credit Union, Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, The Unknown Insurance Company for PNC and the PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. and Securities Investor Protection Corporation
Case Number: 9:2018cv81736
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, ANDTRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2019., Expert Discovery due by 7/12/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 7/26/2019., Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 10/23/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 9/25/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for discovery matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Steele Grante re #1 Complaint, (ls)
January 28, 2019 Filing 15 DESIGNATION of Email by Steele Grante (ls)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief #12 . The motion is denied without prejudice because Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requires, prior to the issuance of an injunction, that an adverse party receive notice. Defendants have not yet appeared in this case. Plaintiff may renew his motion after proof of service has been filed with the Court or after a Defendant has appeared in this case. Because the Court possesses discretion over how motions for a preliminary injunction will be briefed, the Court will not take up a motion for a preliminary injunction until after a Defendant has an opportunity to appear and be heard. In the event that a Defendant does not enter a timely appearance in this case, Plaintiff may move for an entry of default. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/24/2019. (sk01)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, The National Credit Union Share Insurance Fund, The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The Unknown Insurance Company for PNC and the PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The Unknown Insurance Company for Westera Credit Union, The Unkown Insurance Company for Visa and Visa, Inc., Visa, Visa, Inc., Westera Credit Union. (ls)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Injunction and Relief by Steele Grante. (ls)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The National Credit Union Share Insurance Fund, The Unknown Insurance Company for Westera Credit Union, The Unkown Insurance Company for Visa and Visa, Inc., Visa, Visa, Inc., Westera Credit Union, The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The Unknown Insurance Company for PNC and the PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, filed by Steele Grante.(ls)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 1/23/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006145 (ls)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #5 . The Motion is denied without prejudice for Plaintiff to provide additional information on the following under penalty of perjury: (1) to the extent Plaintiff receives gifts from his family to pay for his expenses, Plaintiff must list the amount of those gifts, (2) Plaintiff must inform the Court of the amount of monthly debt service he pays, together with information on the source of the income he uses to pay such debt service, and (3) Plaintiff must list all of his expenses, even if those expenses are paid by another party, such as automobile payments, insurance payments, food expenses, clothing expenses, and all other expenses that AO Form 240 requires. Plaintiff must file his amended motion by January 24, 2019; Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in the Court's closure of this case without notice. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/14/2019. (bkd)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Steele Grante to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: sg@omnimail.biz (ls)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Letter to Honorable Rosenberg by Steele Grante re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ls)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steele Grante. (ls)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP") [DE 3]. Plaintiff averred in his IFP Affidavit, which he signed under penalty of perjury, that he has no income, yet he alleged in the Complaint that he recently traveled abroad, that he had funds in several bank accounts, and that he is making credit card payments. In addition, Plaintiff failed to complete the second page of the IFP Affidavit. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to file a complete and accurate IFP Affidavit by January 16, 2019. If Plaintiff has no income, Plaintiff must include an explanation as to how he supports himself. Plaintiff's failure to file a renewed IFP Affidavit or pay the full filing fee by January 16, 2019, will result in the Court's closure of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/2/2019. (sk01)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steele Grante. (drz)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against The National Credit Union Share Insurance Fund, The Unknown Insurance Company for Westera Credit Union, The Unkown Insurance Company for Visa and Visa, Inc., Visa, Visa, Inc., Westera Credit Union. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Steele Grante. (Attachments: #1 Propsed Summonses)(drz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grante v. Westera Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unkown Insurance Company for Visa and Visa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westera Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Credit Union Share Insurance Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Insurance Company for Westera Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Insurance Company for PNC and the PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securities Investor Protection Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steele Grante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?