King v. Adopt a Family of the Palm Beaches et al

Plaintiff: Nikie King
Defendant: Senator Philip D. Lewis Center, Adopt a Family of the Palm Beaches, Gail Jenkins and Lewis Center
Case Number: 9:2018cv81749
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Warrant Seizure by Nikie King (mee)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Discovery by Nikie King (mee)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Reopen/Seizure Warrant by Nikie King. (mee)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STRIKING #6 Amended Complaint filed by Nikie King Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of filing AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adopt a Family of the Palm Beaches, Lewis Center, Senator Philip D. Lewis Center, filed by Nikie King.(mee) Modified on 1/14/2019 (mr1).
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 (STRICKEN PER DE 8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adopt a Family of the Palm Beaches, Senator Philip D. Lewis Center, Lewis Center, filed by Nikie King.(mee) Text Modified on 1/16/2019 (cds).
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR FAILING TO STATE A CLAIM. Granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nikie King. Closing Case. Deny As Moot #4 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program filed by Nikie King. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Nikie King. (drz)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nikie King. (drz)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adopt a Family of the Palm Beaches, Gail Jenkins, Senator Philip D. Lewis Center. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Nikie King. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summonses)(drz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Adopt a Family of the Palm Beaches et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senator Philip D. Lewis Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adopt a Family of the Palm Beaches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?