KATZ v. CAPPS et al
Plaintiff: GREGORY KATZ
Defendant: Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc., Does 1-25, Newmark Southern Region, LLC, Monty Harris, Capps Timothy and Kacie Van Hine
Cross Claimant: TIMOTHY CAPPS
Case Number: 9:2018mc81337
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by GREGORY KATZ re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash Subpoenas (Oakes, Courtney)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition on Plaintiff Gregory Katz's Motion to Quash Subpoenas DE #1 . Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Suzy Girard Ruttenberg and Girard & Associates by Capps Timothy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Freedman, Kimberly)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Jordan Freedman on behalf of Capps Timothy, Kacie Van Hine. Attorney Kimberly Jordan Freedman added to party Capps Timothy(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Jordan Freedman added to party Kacie Van Hine(pty:dft). (Freedman, Kimberly)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (lbc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 Plaintiff's Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Quash from Another District to Suzy Girard-Ruttenberg and Girard & Associates. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-11046541, filed by GREGORY KATZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Oakes, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KATZ v. CAPPS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmark Southern Region, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capps Timothy
Represented By: Kimberly Jordan Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kacie Van Hine
Represented By: Kimberly Jordan Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY KATZ
Represented By: Courtney Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: TIMOTHY CAPPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?