Elderlife Financial Services, LLC v. Dallvechia

Appellee: Virginia Lee Dallvechia
Appellant: Elderlife Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80014
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elderlife Financial Services, LLC re #7 Order Dismissing Case (Softness, David)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Closing Case. Motions terminated: #5 Agreed MOTION to Stay Appeal filed by Elderlife Financial Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal without Prejudice by Elderlife Financial Services, LLC (Softness, David)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION to Stay Appeal by Elderlife Financial Services, LLC. (Softness, David)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Elderlife Financial Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 17-10323-BKC-MAM, filed by Elderlife Financial Services, LLC.(mon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elderlife Financial Services, LLC v. Dallvechia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Virginia Lee Dallvechia
Represented By: Stuart Alan Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elderlife Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: David Rand Softness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?