Gorgol v. Red Carpet Valet, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Aracely Gorgol
Defendant: Red Carpet Valet, Inc. and Lee M. Phillips
Case Number: 9:2019cv80035
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Aracely Gorgol of Default (Scott, Cathleen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Aracely Gorgol (Scott, Cathleen)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER. This matter is before the court sua sponte. A review of the record reflects that returns of service were entered on the docket on January 22, 2019 and Janary 23, 2019. (DE #4 , DE #5 ). The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint was February 5, 2019. Id. To date, no counsel have entered appearances for either Defendant. Moreover, no Defendant attended the telephonic scheduling conference held on January 29, 2019 before the Magistrate Judge. (See DE 8 ). Accordingly, on or before February 18, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a status report with the court, advising how it intends to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/11/2019. (kal)
January 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings to CORRECT Venue locations per order on DE #9 Calendar Call set for 7/17/2019 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Jury Trial set for 7/22/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. (jao)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING FLSA SCHEDULE Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 01/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/11/2019., Discovery due by 4/22/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 2/11/2019., In Limine Motions due by 5/20/2019., Motions due by 5/20/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/24/2019., Jury Trial set for 7/22/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 7/17/2019 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Modified on 1/30/2019 to CORRECT venue locations for upcoming hearings(jao).
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/29/2019. Cathleen Ann Scott, Esq. appeared for Plaintiff. No appearance on behalf of Defendants. Pretrial scheduling matters discussed. Scheduling Order to follow. (Digital/Time in Court: 14:22:23/1 min.) (js03)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets multiple cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/23/2019. (spe)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/22/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 7/17/2019 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Aracely Gorgol. Lee M. Phillips served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Scott, Cathleen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Aracely Gorgol. Red Carpet Valet, Inc. served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Scott, Cathleen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lee M. Phillips, Red Carpet Valet, Inc.. (jao)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee M. Phillips, Red Carpet Valet, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11298833, filed by Aracely Gorgol. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Scott, Cathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorgol v. Red Carpet Valet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aracely Gorgol
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Carpet Valet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee M. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?