United States of America v. $33,701.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Two 18 karat yellow gold pendants with 3 tourmaline gemstones and 14 karat yellow gold curb link chain, Lot of 50 Franklin mint Great Ocean Liners sterling silver ingots (each weighs 1000 grains), One Johnson and Matthey 100 oz. (.999 pure silver) silver bar, Lot of 50 Franklin mint US Bank marked sterling silver ingots (each weighs 1000 grains), Lot of 36 Liberty Lobby Andrew Jackson Courage (1980, 83, 85, 94) .999 pure silver coins, 240 grains each, Lot of 20 Liberty Lobby One Silver Eagle (1985) .999 purse silver coins, one oz. each, One gentlemans Omega Seamaster Planet Ocean Skyfall 007 stainless steel wristwatch with box and manual, bearing serial number: 4059-5007, One diamond and 18 karat yellow and white gold cast tennis bracelet with 9 diamonds (1.00 carats), One ladies Tag Heuer Professional stainless steel wristwatch, bearing serial number: KH9192, Two diamond and 18 karat white gold cast hoop earrings with 32 diamonds (16 each earring), One diamond and 18 karat yellow gold cast tennis bracelet with 56 diamonds (2.75 carats), One ladies Rolex Datejust stainless steel wristwatch bearing serial number: M469738, One gentlemans Omega Seamaster James Bond Spectre stainless steel wristwatch, bearing serial number: 1358-7007, $33,701.00 in U.S. Currency, $3,788.00 in U.S. Currency, One diamond and 14 karat white gold cast tennis bracelet with 50 diamonds (2.00 carats), One ladies Tag Heuer Professional stainless steel wristwatch with gold tone bezel and crown, bearing serial number: MC9381, One diamond and 10 karat white and yellow gold cast diamond tennis bracelet with 51 diamonds (3.00 carats), One gemstone and 14 karat yellow gold cast tennis bracelet with 11 semi-precious gemstones (4.00 carats), One diamond and 18 karat white gold cast tennis bracelet with 64 diamonds (3.80 carats) and One gentlemans Tag Heuer Link stainless steel wristwatch with black dial with diamond set markers, bearing serial number: XG0532
Claimant: Kimberly Thwing
Case Number: 9:2019cv80054
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon the Government's Motion to Strike Claimant Kimberly Thwing's Motion to Dismiss Complaint [DE 15], filed herein on April 1, 2019. The Court has carefully considered the Motion [DE 15] and is otherwise fully advised in the premises. As of the date of this Order, no response to the Motion [DE 15] has been filed and the time for such filing has passed. See S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(c)(1). Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants shall show cause no later than April 22, 2019, why the instant Motion [DE 15] should not be granted. A failure to timely respond shall result in the Court granting the Motion [DE 15] by default and striking Kimberly Thwing's Motion to Dismiss Complaint [DE 14]. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/16/2019. (mkz)
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike #16 Answer to Complaint by United States of America. Responses due by 4/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Grosnoff, Nicole)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to Thirty-Three Thousand, Seven Hundred One($33,701) in U.S. Currency. (drz)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to Three Thousand, Seven Hundred Eighty-Eight ($3788.00) in U.S. Currency. (drz)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 Claimant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Kimberly Thwing. (Barone, Jo Ann)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike #14 Response/Reply (Other) by United States of America. Responses due by 4/15/2019 (Grosnoff, Nicole)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 First RESPONSE to #1 Complaint by Kimberly Thwing. (Barone, Jo Ann)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to Thirty-Three Thousand,Seven Hundred One($33,701)in U.S. Currency. (drz)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to Three Thousand, Seven Hundred Eight Eight($3,788.00)in U.S. Currency. (drz)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 2 Judge Assignment. Incorrect District Judge Selected - Judge William P. Dimitrouleas added ; Corrected by the Clerk. All paper hereafter filed shall bear the assigned case number followed by the surname of the assigned Judicial Officers as follows: 19-80054-CV-DIMITROULEAS/MATTHEWMAN. (jc)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action - (18 USC 983 Civil Asset Forfeiture Reform Act of 2000 (CAFRA) when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jc)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America re #6 Order on Motion to Stay (Grosnoff, Nicole)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 CORRECTED Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Wrong Case Type (MC) selected. CASE HAS BEEN CORRECTED, case number is 19-80054-CV-DIMITROULEAS/MATTHEWMAN. (jc) Modified text on 1/30/2019 (jc).
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Warrant In Rem Issued as to All Defendants. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/16/2019) (jc).
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by United States of America. Responses due by 1/30/2019 (Grosnoff, Nicole)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 CORRECTED Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to case. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Unassigned and Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. (drz)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Warrant)(Grosnoff, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $33,701.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two 18 karat yellow gold pendants with 3 tourmaline gemstones and 14 karat yellow gold curb link chain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lot of 50 Franklin mint Great Ocean Liners sterling silver ingots (each weighs 1000 grains)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Johnson and Matthey 100 oz. (.999 pure silver) silver bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lot of 50 Franklin mint US Bank marked sterling silver ingots (each weighs 1000 grains)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lot of 36 Liberty Lobby Andrew Jackson Courage (1980, 83, 85, 94) .999 pure silver coins, 240 grains each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lot of 20 Liberty Lobby One Silver Eagle (1985) .999 purse silver coins, one oz. each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One gentlemans Omega Seamaster Planet Ocean Skyfall 007 stainless steel wristwatch with box and manual, bearing serial number: 4059-5007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One diamond and 18 karat yellow and white gold cast tennis bracelet with 9 diamonds (1.00 carats)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One ladies Tag Heuer Professional stainless steel wristwatch, bearing serial number: KH9192
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two diamond and 18 karat white gold cast hoop earrings with 32 diamonds (16 each earring)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One diamond and 18 karat yellow gold cast tennis bracelet with 56 diamonds (2.75 carats)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One ladies Rolex Datejust stainless steel wristwatch bearing serial number: M469738
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One gentlemans Omega Seamaster James Bond Spectre stainless steel wristwatch, bearing serial number: 1358-7007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,701.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,788.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One diamond and 14 karat white gold cast tennis bracelet with 50 diamonds (2.00 carats)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One ladies Tag Heuer Professional stainless steel wristwatch with gold tone bezel and crown, bearing serial number: MC9381
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One diamond and 10 karat white and yellow gold cast diamond tennis bracelet with 51 diamonds (3.00 carats)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One gemstone and 14 karat yellow gold cast tennis bracelet with 11 semi-precious gemstones (4.00 carats)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One diamond and 18 karat white gold cast tennis bracelet with 64 diamonds (3.80 carats)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One gentlemans Tag Heuer Link stainless steel wristwatch with black dial with diamond set markers, bearing serial number: XG0532
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kimberly Thwing
Represented By: Jo Ann Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole Grosnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?