Grosky et al v. Getronics U.S. Operations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Oxendine, James Linden, William Duss, Stephen Grosky and Ed Trapp
Defendant: Committee for Bunker Ramo Corp. Supplemental Executive Retirement Program and 1991 ISC-Bunker Ramo Corporation Supplemental Executive Retirement Program, Joan Gilpatrick, Getronics U.S. Operations, Inc. and Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80082
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2019. Attorney Appearances: Claire Danzl, Esq. and Paul Sullivan Jr., Esq. present for Plaintiffs | Sherril Colombo, Esq. present for Defendants. Pretrial and scheduling matters discussed. Scheduling Order to follow. (Total Time in Court: 8 mins. | Digital: 14:29:42) (jrz)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sherril May Colombo on behalf of Getronics U.S. Operations, Inc.. Attorney Sherril May Colombo added to party Getronics U.S. Operations, Inc. (pty:dft). (Colombo, Sherril)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Joan Gilpatrick. (lh)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Joan Gilpatrick by William Duss, Stephen Grosky, James Linden, Thomas Oxendine, Ed Trapp re #1 Complaint filed by Ed Trapp, Stephen Grosky, Thomas Oxendine, William Duss, James Linden (Sullivan, Paul)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 2:30 P.M. in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/26/2019. (spe)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ( Jury Trial set for 11/25/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 11/20/2019 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by William Duss, Stephen Grosky, James Linden, Thomas Oxendine, Ed Trapp re #1 Complaint NOTICE OF LAWSUIT FOR KONINKLIJKE KPN NV (Sullivan, Paul)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by William Duss, Stephen Grosky, James Linden, Thomas Oxendine, Ed Trapp re #1 Complaint NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST TO WAIVE SERVICE OF A SUMMONS FOR COMMITTEE FOR BUNKER RAMO AND 1991 ISC BUNKER RAMO (Sullivan, Paul)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Claire W. Bushorn Danzl. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Claire W. Bushorn Danzl at cbushorn@thebushornfirm.com. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/24/2019. (kal)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by William Duss, Stephen Grosky, James Linden, Thomas Oxendine, Ed Trapp re #1 Complaint NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST TO WAIVE SERVICE OF A SUMMONS FOR JOAN GILPATRICK (Sullivan, Paul)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by William Duss, Stephen Grosky, James Linden, Thomas Oxendine, Ed Trapp re #1 Complaint NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST TO WAIVE SERVICE OF A SUMMONS FOR GETRONICS US OPERATIONS INC. (Sullivan, Paul)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Claire Bushorn Danzl. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11329178 by William Duss, Stephen Grosky, James Linden, Thomas Oxendine, Ed Trapp. Responses due by 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Paul)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11327966, filed by Ed Trapp, James Linden, William Duss, Stephen Grosky, Thomas Oxendine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grosky et al v. Getronics U.S. Operations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Oxendine
Represented By: Claire W. Bushorn Danzl
Represented By: Paul Martin Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Linden
Represented By: Paul Martin Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Duss
Represented By: Claire W. Bushorn Danzl
Represented By: Paul Martin Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Grosky
Represented By: Claire W. Bushorn Danzl
Represented By: Paul Martin Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Trapp
Represented By: Claire W. Bushorn Danzl
Represented By: Paul Martin Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Committee for Bunker Ramo Corp. Supplemental Executive Retirement Program and 1991 ISC-Bunker Ramo Corporation Supplemental Executive Retirement Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Gilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getronics U.S. Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Sherril May Colombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?