Radtka et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jane Hatten, Tina Powell, Sherry Hue, Francine Radtka, Cynthia Simmons, Korby Miller, Linda Medlin, Catherine Hern, Yolanda Borras, Kimberly Sparks, Anne Mantello, Ann Mowrey, Vanessa McKever, Catherine Busalacchi, Kathleen Gravedoni, Melissa Koferl, Tonya Colson, Pamela Williams, Tanisha Williams, Lisa Youman, Teresa Evans Cluff, Diane Johnson, Kimberly P. Roberts, Valerie Blackshear, Lisa Rohdy, Rhonda Waters, Laura Parsons, Jenny Hicks, Gretchen Adams, Teresa Rainey, Catherine Jacobson, Jamie Estevez, Maggie Gibbs and Betty Moore
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80153
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
2 Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge:, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all discovery matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tanisha Williams, Pamela Williams, Korby Miller, Tonya Colson, Teresa Rainey, Melissa Koferl, Gretchen Adams, Francine Radtka, Anne Mantello, Kimberly Sparks, Diane Johnson, Kimberly P. Roberts, Tina Powell, Lisa Rohdy, Linda Medlin, Sherry Hue, Laura Parsons, Kathleen Gravedoni, Rhonda Waters, Jane Hatten, Betty Moore, Jenny Hicks, Ann Mowrey, Cynthia Simmons, Teresa Evans Cluff, Valerie Blackshear, Maggie Gibbs, Catherine Hern, Catherine Jacobson, Jamie Estevez, Yolanda Borras, Lisa Youman, Vanessa McKever, Catherine Busalacchi. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Scott, Cathleen)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lindsey Brooke Wagner on behalf of Gretchen Adams, Valerie Blackshear, Yolanda Borras, Catherine Busalacchi, Teresa Evans Cluff, Tonya Colson, Jamie Estevez, Maggie Gibbs, Kathleen Gravedoni, Jane Hatten, Catherine Hern, Jenny Hicks, Sherry Hue, Catherine Jacobson, Diane Johnson, Melissa Koferl, Anne Mantello, Vanessa McKever, Linda Medlin, Korby Miller, Betty Moore, Ann Mowrey, Laura Parsons, Tina Powell, Francine Radtka, Teresa Rainey, Kimberly P. Roberts, Lisa Rohdy, Cynthia Simmons, Kimberly Sparks, Rhonda Waters, Pamela Williams, Tanisha Williams, Lisa Youman. Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Gretchen Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Valerie Blackshear(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Yolanda Borras(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Catherine Busalacchi(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Teresa Evans Cluff(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Tonya Colson(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Jamie Estevez(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Maggie Gibbs(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Kathleen Gravedoni(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Jane Hatten(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Catherine Hern(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Jenny Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Sherry Hue(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Catherine Jacobson(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Diane Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Melissa Koferl(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Anne Mantello(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Vanessa McKever(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Linda Medlin(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Korby Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Betty Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Ann Mowrey(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Laura Parsons(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Tina Powell(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Francine Radtka(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Teresa Rainey(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Kimberly P. Roberts(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Lisa Rohdy(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Cynthia Simmons(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Kimberly Sparks(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Rhonda Waters(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Pamela Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Tanisha Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsey Brooke Wagner added to party Lisa Youman(pty:pla). (Wagner, Lindsey)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 2/11/2019. Judge Beth Bloom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Attorney Bridget Ann Berry added to party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft). (Berry, Bridget)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (ebz)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11360512, filed by Korby Miller, Tonya Colson, Teresa Rainey, Melissa Koferl, Gretchen Adams, Francine Radtka, Anne Mantello, Kimberly Sparks, Diane Johnson, Kimberly P. Roberts, Tina Powell, Lisa Rohdy, Linda Medlin, Sherry Hue, Laura Parsons, Kathleen Gravedoni, Jane Hatten, Betty Moore, Jenny Hicks, Ann Mowrey, Cynthia Simmons, Teresa Evans Cluff, Valerie Blackshear, Maggie Gibbs, Catherine Hern, Catherine Jacobson, Jamie Estevez, Yolanda Borras, Vanessa McKever, Catherine Busalacchi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summon(s))(Scott, Cathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radtka et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Hatten
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Powell
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Hue
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Radtka
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Simmons
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korby Miller
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Medlin
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Hern
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Borras
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Sparks
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Mantello
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Mowrey
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa McKever
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Busalacchi
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Gravedoni
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Koferl
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Colson
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Williams
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanisha Williams
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Youman
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Evans Cluff
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Johnson
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly P. Roberts
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Blackshear
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rohdy
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Waters
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Parsons
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Hicks
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Adams
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Rainey
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Jacobson
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Estevez
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Gibbs
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Moore
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Bridget Ann Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?