Patricia Robalino Designs, LLC v. Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Robalino Designs, LLC
Defendant: Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp. and Rafael Bild
Case Number: 9:2019cv80182
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants Rafael Bild and Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DE #1 ) is extended to April 16, 2019. No other deadlines are modified or extended as a result of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/27/2019. (mbt)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Michelle Bowers on behalf of Rafael Bild, Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp.. Attorney Amy Michelle Bowers added to party Rafael Bild(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Michelle Bowers added to party Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp.(pty:dft). (Bowers, Amy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Rafael Bild, Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp.. Attorney John C. Carey added to party Rafael Bild(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Carey added to party Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carey, John)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Patricia Robalino Designs, LLC. Rafael Bild served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Goldman, Adam)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Patricia Robalino Designs, LLC. Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Goldman, Adam)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2019., Discovery due by 9/16/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2019., In Limine Motions due by 10/7/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 10/7/2019., Motions due by 10/7/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/12/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ( Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 12/4/2019 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE. (kpe)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rafael Bild, Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp.. (kpe)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rafael Bild, Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11375545, filed by Patricia Robalino Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit "A" (Copyright Certificate No. GYE-008498), #4 Exhibit "B" (Copyright Certificate No. GYE-010078), #5 Exhibit "C" (Copyright Assignments))(Goldman, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia Robalino Designs, LLC v. Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp.
Represented By: Amy Michelle Bowers
Represented By: John C. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Bild
Represented By: Amy Michelle Bowers
Represented By: John C. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Robalino Designs, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Daniel Brown
Represented By: Adam Scott Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?