Mucciolo v. Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mario Mucciolo
Defendant: Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc., Jane Does, John Does and Bocacare
Case Number: 9:2019cv80185
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint filed by Mario Mucciolo Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 02/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 02/07/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-00044. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/7/2019. (llg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Venue to Southern District of Florida by Mario Mucciolo. (ac)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc, Jane Does, John Does filed by Mario Mucciolo.(ac)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Mario Mucciolo. Plf is DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of this date, a First Amended Complaint which provides all of the missing jurisdictional information (as fully set out in this order). Plf is also DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of this date, a short notice to the court explaining any reason why this action should not be either dismissed or transferred, given the apparent lack of venue in this district. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/23/2019. (llg)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/17/19. (mc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Mucciolo. (ac)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc, Bocacare, Jane Does, John Does filed by Mario Mucciolo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mucciolo v. Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bocacare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Mucciolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?