Aspen Licensing International, Inc. v. Skechers U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Aspen Licensing International, Inc.
Defendant: Skechers U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80189
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
1 Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Aspen Licensing International, Inc.. (DuBosar, Harrison)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff Aspen Licensing International, Inc. shall file any response to Defendant's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims (DE #13 ) on or by April 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/2/2019. (sfr)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Aspen Licensing International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DuBosar, Harrison)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Aspen Licensing International, Inc. (DuBosar, Harrison)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Harry R. Schafer, Esq.. (DuBosar, Harrison)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 11/25/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 11/20/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.),Granted In Part: #12 Corrected MOTION to Continue Unopposed Motion to Modify Trial Date filed by Skechers U.S.A., Inc., #11 Defendant's MOTION to Continue UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY TRIAL DATE filed by Skechers U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Aspen Licensing International, Inc. by Skechers U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Shapiro, Jay)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 Corrected MOTION to Continue Unopposed Motion to Modify Trial Date by Skechers U.S.A., Inc.. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration))(Shapiro, Jay)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Continue UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY TRIAL DATE by Skechers U.S.A., Inc.. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Shapiro, Jay)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Robert L. Lee. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/4/2019. (sfr)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert L. Lee. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11436854 by Skechers U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Ryan Thomas Thornton added to party Skechers U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Thornton, Ryan)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Sketchers USA, Inc. shall file any response or answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (DE #1 ) on or by March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/28/2019. (sfr)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Skechers U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Jay Brian Shapiro added to party Skechers U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Shapiro, Jay)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2019., Discovery due by 9/16/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2019., In Limine Motions due by 10/7/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 10/7/2019., Motions due by 10/7/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/12/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 12/4/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon For Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Skechers U.S.A., Inc.. (cds)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (cds) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/8/2019) (cds).
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Skechers U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-113C-11378362, payment transferred from : 19cv80188 Aspen Licensing International, Inc. v. Skechers U.S.A., Inc., filed by Aspen Licensing International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(DuBosar, Harrison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspen Licensing International, Inc. v. Skechers U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skechers U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jay Brian Shapiro
Represented By: Robert L. Lee
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Licensing International, Inc.
Represented By: Howard D. DuBosar
Represented By: Harrison Ross DuBosar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?