Avnet v. Office Depot, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tracey Avnet
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80192
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference: Status Conference Re: Final Discovery Matters set for 9/5/2019 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 10/4/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 12/5/2019.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Office Depot, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBlasio, Patrick)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Office Depot, Inc.. Attorney Patrick Gerald DeBlasio, III added to party Office Depot, Inc. (pty:dft). (DeBlasio, Patrick)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OFREQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 1/29/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Office Depot, Inc.. (kpe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office Depot, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11379899, filed by Tracey Avnet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Storch, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avnet v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Avnet
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Gerald DeBlasio, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?