Oczeus et al v. MG Media Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Roselande Oczeus and Jamie Dozier
Defendant: Michael G. Naderi and MG Media Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80193
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA (Berger, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement by Jamie Dozier, Roselande Oczeus (Solomon, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi for dates of July 1, 2019 through July 5, 2019 (Berger, William)
March 29, 2019 Filing 23 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law by MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi. Responses due by 4/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Berger, William)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING TRIAL BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/19/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Calendar Call set for 9/11/2019 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 7/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2019. In Limine Motions due by 7/8/2019. Pretrial Dispositive Motions due by 7/8/2019. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/26/2019. James Solomon, Esq. appeared for Plaintiffs. William J. Berger, Esq. appeared for Defendants, and Defendant Michael G. Naderi appeared. Court to issue amended pretrial scheduling order keyed off of one-day jury trial set for September 19, 2019. (Digital/Time in Court: 14:34:00/5 mins.) (js03)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 3/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF CLAIM by MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B)(Berger, William)
March 19, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT REGARDING Joint Discovery Plan by Jamie Dozier, Roselande Oczeus (Solomon, James)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA (Berger, William)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of: Of Claim by Jamie Dozier, Roselande Oczeus re #12 Order of Requirements (Solomon, James)
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: This cause has been referred to the undersigned upon the consent of the parties to U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. To facilitate matters, a telephonic status conference is set for March 26, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Counsel should confer and be prepared to briefly discuss: (1) an estimate of the time required for trial, (2) proposed dates certain for trial, (3) any proposed changes to the existing pretrial schedule, and (4) the available option of having a settlement conference before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 3/12/2019. (js03)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for Trial. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi (Berger, William)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING FLSA SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 3/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 3/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Joseph Berger on behalf of MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi. Attorney William Joseph Berger added to party MG Media Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William Joseph Berger added to party Michael G. Naderi(pty:dft). (Berger, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/6/2019. James Solomon, Esq. for Plaintiffs. William J. Berger, Esq. for Defendants. Pretrial scheduling matters discussed. Scheduling Order to follow. (Digital/Time in Court: 11:03:39/10 mins.) (js03)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roselande Oczeus, Jamie Dozier. MG Media Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Solomon, James)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roselande Oczeus, Jamie Dozier. Michael G. Naderi waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Solomon, James)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi, filed by Roselande Oczeus, Jamie Dozier.(Solomon, James)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 11:00 A.M. in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/26/2019. (spe)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to conduct a Scheduling Conference, pursuant to Local Rule 16. 1.B, for the purpose of setting pre-trial deadline dates, for determining possible consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge for trial, and for the purpose of setting any settlement conferences in lieu of or in addition to mediation if the parties so request., SCHEDULING ORDER: (Jury Trial set for 9/3/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 8/28/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MG Media Solutions, Inc., Michael G. Naderi. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11380458, filed by Roselande Oczeus, Jamie Dozier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) MG Media, #3 Summon(s) Naderi)(Solomon, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oczeus et al v. MG Media Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roselande Oczeus
Represented By: James Clark Solomon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Dozier
Represented By: James Clark Solomon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Naderi
Represented By: William Joseph Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG Media Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: William Joseph Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?