O'Boyle et al v. Town of Gulf Stream et al

Plaintiff: Martin E. O'Boyle, William Ring, Jonathan O'Boyle, Commerce GP, Inc. and Commerce Group, Inc.
Defendant: Wantman Group, Inc. and Town of Gulf Stream
Case Number: 9:2019cv80196
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Town of Gulf Stream, Wantman Group, Inc., filed by Martin E. O'Boyle, William Ring, Jonathan O'Boyle, Commerce Group, Inc., Commerce GP, Inc..(Ovelmen, Richard)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Town of Gulf Stream, Wantman Group, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11382149, filed by Martin E. O'Boyle, William Ring, Jonathan O'Boyle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ovelmen, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Boyle et al v. Town of Gulf Stream et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin E. O'Boyle
Represented By: Richard J. Ovelmen
Represented By: Justin Samuel Wales
Represented By: Jason Patrick Kairalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ring
Represented By: Richard J. Ovelmen
Represented By: Justin Samuel Wales
Represented By: Jason Patrick Kairalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan O'Boyle
Represented By: Richard J. Ovelmen
Represented By: Justin Samuel Wales
Represented By: Jason Patrick Kairalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commerce GP, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Ovelmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commerce Group, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Ovelmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wantman Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Gulf Stream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?