Manopla v. Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.

Plaintiff: Mandy Manopla
Defendant: Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80232
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTINGDISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 9/17/2019 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Discovery due by 10/21/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2019.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Mandy Manopla (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Daniel)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.. (Thomas, Charles)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Answer due 3/26/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/18/2019. (kbs)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.. (Thomas, Charles)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Dominic Thomas on behalf of Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.. Attorney Charles Dominic Thomas added to party Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.(pty:dft). (Thomas, Charles)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Mandy Manopla. Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Levine, Daniel)
March 5, 2019 Reset Status Conference set for 2/18/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. per order DE #5 ;To reflect year 2020 (mr1)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 2/12/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 2/18/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erica Alyse Gonsalves on behalf of Mandy Manopla (Gonsalves, Erica)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.. (kpe)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11400301, filed by Mandy Manopla. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Levine, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manopla v. Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyzar Air Conditioning Inc.
Represented By: Charles Dominic Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Manopla
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Represented By: Erica Alyse Gonsalves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?