Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc. et al v. Florida Restaurants & Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Sweet City Records, Inc., Perren-Vibes Music, Inc. and Rodsongs
Defendant: Joseph L Mandia and Florida Restaurants & Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80263
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING CASE AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement Tentative by Perren-Vibes Music, Inc., Rodsongs, Sweet City Records, Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc. (Beard Renstrom, Laura)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Beard Renstrom on behalf of Perren-Vibes Music, Inc., Rodsongs, Sweet City Records, Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.. Attorney Laura Beard Renstrom added to party Perren-Vibes Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Beard Renstrom added to party Rodsongs(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Beard Renstrom added to party Sweet City Records, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Beard Renstrom added to party Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.(pty:pla). (Beard Renstrom, Laura)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Answer due 4/10/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/26/2019. (kbs)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Florida Restaurants & Entertainment, Inc., Joseph L Mandia. Attorney Jessica Neer McDonald added to party Florida Restaurants & Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Neer McDonald added to party Joseph L Mandia(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, Jessica)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OFREQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 2/26/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 1/29/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 7 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Sweet City Records, Inc., Rodsongs, Perren-Vibes Music, Inc.. Florida Restaurants & Entertainment, Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (See DE#5 for image). (jas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Sweet City Records, Inc., Rodsongs, Perren-Vibes Music, Inc.. Joseph L Mandia served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Page, Frederick)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Sweet City Records, Inc., Rodsongs, Perren-Vibes Music, Inc.. Florida Restaurants & Entertainment, Inc. served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Page, Frederick)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE. ( Copy of the complaint, exhibits, along with AO 121 mailed out. ) (ebz)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Florida Restaurants & Entertainment, Inc., Joseph L Mandia. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11419377, filed by Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Sweet City Records, Inc., Rodsongs, Perren-Vibes Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summonses, #3 Exhibit Schedule A)(Page, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc. et al v. Florida Restaurants & Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweet City Records, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perren-Vibes Music, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodsongs
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L Mandia
Represented By: Jessica Neer McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Restaurants & Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Neer McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?