Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Home Solutions FLA LLC

Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Home Solutions FLA LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80379
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. re #13 Renewed MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Home Solutions FLA LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason S. Weiss in Support) (Weiss, Jason)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 Renewed MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Home Solutions FLA LLC by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Weiss, Jason)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Stuart Weiss on behalf of Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Attorney Jason Stuart Weiss added to party Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.(pty:pla). (Weiss, Jason)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Home Solutions FLA LLC. No certificate of service. Motions Terminated: #7 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 5/8/2019. (lbc)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Alexander Charles Cohen withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Terminate CM/ECF Notices by Alexander C. Cohen for / by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Responses due by 5/15/2019 (Cohen, Alexander)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019., Discovery due by 11/4/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2019., In Limine Motions due by 11/18/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2019., Motions due by 11/18/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/23/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Home Solutions FLA LLC by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Cohen)(Cohen, Alexander)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/15/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon For Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Text Modified on 4/23/2019 (cds).
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Home Solutions FLA LLC served on 3/23/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits) (jao)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Home Solutions FLA LLC. (jao)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Home Solutions FLA LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11484144, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Home Solutions FLA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Solutions FLA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Alexander Charles Cohen
Represented By: Ana Paula Moretto
Represented By: Jason Stuart Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?