Sandoval Wholesales, Inc. v. Farm Fresh Packers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.
Defendant: MICHAEL JOHN FABRY, MIRANDA MARCELLE PFAFF-FABRY, FFP SECURE HOLDINGS LLC, JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF and Farm Fresh Packers, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80394
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.. MICHAEL JOHN FABRY served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Esquivel, Katy)
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.. MIRANDA MARCELLE PFAFF-FABRY served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Esquivel, Katy)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.. Farm Fresh Packers, LLC served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Esquivel, Katy)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.. FFP SECURE HOLDINGS LLC served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Esquivel, Katy)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time insofar as the entity Defendants are permitted until May 16, 2019 to obtain counsel. The Court construes the filing at docket entry 9 as a general denial. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/26/2019. (bkd)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Hire and Attorney by MICHAEL JOHN FABRY, FFP SECURE HOLDINGS LLC, Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF, MIRANDA MARCELLE PFAFF-FABRY. Responses due by 5/1/2019 (drz)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 Response to Complaint by MICHAEL JOHN FABRY, FFP SECURE HOLDINGS LLC, Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF, MIRANDA MARCELLE PFAFF-FABRY. (drz) Modified on 4/18/2019 (drz).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OFREQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 3/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 2/12/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc. for property located at 427 North 17th Avenue, Jacksonville Beach, Florida ; Grantees: JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF (Esquivel, Katy)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc. for property located at 301 SW 15th Street, Boca Raton, Florida ; Grantees: JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF TRUSTEE OF THE PFAFF FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 10, 2016 (Esquivel, Katy)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc. (Esquivel, Katy)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL JOHN FABRY, FFP SECURE HOLDINGS LLC, Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF, MIRANDA MARCELLE PFAFF-FABRY. (cds)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF. (cds) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/29/2019) (cds).
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL JOHN FABRY, FFP SECURE HOLDINGS LLC, Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF, MIRANDA MARCELLE PFAFF-FABRY, jeffrey gordon pfaff. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11495696, filed by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Statement & Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) FARM FRESH PACKERS, LLC, #4 Summon(s) FFP SECURE HOLDINGS LLC, #5 Summon(s) JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF, TRUSTEE, #6 Summon(s) JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF, #7 Summon(s) MIRANDA MARCELLE PFAFF-FABRY, #8 Summon(s) MICHAEL JOHN FABRY)(Esquivel, Katy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval Wholesales, Inc. v. Farm Fresh Packers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL JOHN FABRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIRANDA MARCELLE PFAFF-FABRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FFP SECURE HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY GORDON PFAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Fresh Packers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?