WGST, Inc. v. United States of America
Plaintiff: WGST, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 9:2019cv80415
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
2 Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
3 Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; All pending motions not otherwise ruled upon are DENIED AS MOOT, Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 07/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WGST, Inc. (Howes, John)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING the United States' Motion for Enlargement of Time #20 . The United States shall file a reply to the Petitioner's response to the United States' Motion to Dismiss Petition to Quash Summons no later than July 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/26/2019. (lbn)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donlan, Maureen)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Report and Recommendation #1 Petition to Quash Third Party Summons. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (mno)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/3/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/21/2019. (lbn)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman added. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time Extension through July 2 re #13 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency by WGST, Inc.. Responses due by 7/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Howes, John) Modified Relief on 6/18/2019 (ls).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency by United States of America. Attorney Maureen Donlan added to party United States of America(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Revenue Officer Nakeha A. Baxter)(Donlan, Maureen)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to John Howes in the amount of $47.00 on 04/22/2019 re 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (mua)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re: DE#8 Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (lh)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney (lh)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to the Department of Justice by WGST, Inc. (Howes, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Summons to First Citizens Bank by WGST, Inc. (Howes, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fees $400.00, receipt number 113C-11508455 re 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (Howes, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by WGST, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Howes, John)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Insufficient filing fee paid. Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Amount $47.00, receipt #113C-11502660, case filed date: 03/25/2019. (jao)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jao)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (Complaint) Quash Summons RE: Government Agency . Filing fee $ 47.00 receipt number 113C-11502660, filed by John Robert WGST, Inc..(Howes, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WGST, Inc. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WGST, Inc.
Represented By: John Robert Howes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Maureen Donlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?