Dener v. Whirlpool Corporation

Plaintiff: Ronald Dener
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 9:2019cv80440
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
2 Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
3 Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman added. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court accepts counsel's letter of apology #18 regarding his non-appearance at the telephonic scheduling conference. In light of this submission, no sanctions will be imposed and Plaintiff's counsel is excused from attending the show cause hearing set for 10:30 A.M. tomorrow, May 22, 2019. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/21/2019. (jrz)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 15 Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, by Ronald Dener. (Cooper, Kenneth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. ERROR. Parties/Mediator Not Added; Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the mediator. (lbc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Whirlpool Corporation. (Fender, Loren)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING: Plaintiff's counsel of record did not appear for the telephonic scheduling conference held on May 3, 2019. Nor did he timely respond to the Court's subsequent Order to Show Cause 12 . Accordingly, a show cause hearing is set for 10:30 A.M. on Wednesday, May 22, 2019, at the Paul G. Rogers Federal Courthouse, 4th Floor, Courtroom 3. Plaintiff's counsel shall appear in person and be prepared to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to appear at a Court hearing and respond to a later Court Order requiring an explanation for the first failure. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/17/2019. (jrz)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Whirlpool Corporation (Fender, Loren)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019., Discovery due by 11/4/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2019., In Limine Motions due by 12/2/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2019., All Pretrial Motions due by 12/2/2019., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/6/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff's counsel of record, Kenneth Cooper, Esq., did not appear for the telephonic scheduling conference held on May 3, 2019, despite having been duly notified. Accordingly, Mr. Cooper shall have until Tuesday, May 7, 2019, to show cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed for his failure to appear for a scheduled Court hearing. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/3/2019. (jrz)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/3/2019. Attorney Appearances: No appearance for Plaintiff | Kyle LeClere, Esq. for Defendant. Pretrial and scheduling matters discussed. Scheduling Order to follow. (Total Time in Court: 2 mins. | Digital: 14:15:55) (jrz)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for May 3, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/26/2019. (spe)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon and Setting Trial date: ( Calendar Call set for 1/29/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (lk).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kyle W. LeClere. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/11/2019. (kal)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kyle W. LeClere. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11547534 by Whirlpool Corporation. Responses due by 4/24/2019 (Fender, Loren)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 Whirlpool Corporation's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Whirlpool Corporation. (Fender, Loren)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whirlpool Corporation (Fender, Loren)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Whirlpool Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Civil Cover Sheet (Fender, Loren)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ar2)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11512950, filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel to Whirlpool, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Fender, Loren) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dener v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Loren William Fender
Represented By: Kyle W. LeClere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Dener
Represented By: Kenneth Donald Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?