Barnes v. StubHub, Inc.

Plaintiff: Karen Barnes
Defendant: StubHub, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80475
Filed: April 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ruth A. French-Hodson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11801291 by StubHub, Inc.. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Forman, Rachel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rebecca J. Schwartz. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11801244 by StubHub, Inc.. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Forman, Rachel)
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support re #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by StubHub, Inc.. (Forman, Rachel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings or Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Karen Barnes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Authority) (Wright, William)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Karen Barnes. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CA Wang Order, #2 Exhibit Long Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2018 User Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2008 User Agreement, #5 Exhibit 2017 User Agreement)(Wright, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Karen Barnes (Wright, William)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings or to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to Defendant's Motion by June 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/14/2019. (kry)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings or Dismiss by Karen Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, William)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING for appropriate disposition #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by StubHub, Inc. Motion referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/11/2019. (bkd)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 4/22/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 3/25/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 06/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Modified on 6/6/2019 (jao).
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by StubHub, Inc.. Responses due by 6/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Forman, Rachel)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. StubHub, Inc. shall file a responsive pleading or motion by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/14/2019. (bkd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by StubHub, Inc.. Attorney Rachel Lyons Forman added to party StubHub, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Forman, Rachel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Karen Barnes. Karen Barnes served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Wright, William)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Patrick Faherty on behalf of Karen Barnes (Faherty, Daniel)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to StubHub, Inc. (pes)
April 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
April 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11537146, filed by Karen Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(Wright, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. StubHub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Barnes
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Faherty
Represented By: William Charles Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StubHub, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Lyons Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?