Castro v. Warden, Federal Correctional Institution

Plaintiff: Armando Antonio Castro
Defendant: Warden, Federal Correctional Institution
Case Number: 9:2019cv80477
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY/Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Memorandum of Fact and Law in Response to Order to Show Cause why Petitioner's Motion Should not be Granted to #5 Response to Order to Show Cause by Armando Antonio Castro. (mee)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order to Show Cause, by Warden, Federal Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BOP Policy Statement 5050.50))(Villafana, Ann Marie)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this motion should not be granted and shall file therewith all documents and transcripts necessary for the resolution of this petition. Show Cause Response due by 5/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (br)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (br)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (No Paid/No IFP) Filing fee $ 5.00, filed by Armando Antonio Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for transfer to home confinement, #2 Exhibit Compassionate Release/Reduction in Sentence: Procedures for Implementation of 18 U.S.C. 3582 and 4205(g)(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Warden, Federal Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Antonio Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Federal Correctional Institution
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Ann Marie C. Villafana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?