Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Aaron Group Realty, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Aaron Group Realty, LLC and Wayne Searson
Case Number: 9:2019cv80489
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2019., Discovery due by 4/7/2020., Expert Discovery due by 4/7/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/27/2019., Mediation Deadline 4/21/2020., In Limine Motions due by 4/29/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2020., Motions due by 4/29/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/20/2020., Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 7/28/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart For Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krebsbach, Spensyr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (Krebsbach, Spensyr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Striking #13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Aaron Group Realty, LLC by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (Krebsbach, Spensyr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN PER DE #14 .. Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aaron Group Realty, LLC (Krebsbach, Spensyr) Modified on 6/28/2019 (lbc).
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Aaron Group Realty, LLC, Wayne Searson. Attorney John Robert Whittles added to party Wayne Searson(pty:dft). (Whittles, John)
June 6, 2019 Reset Deadlines Aaron Group Realty, LLC answer due 6/20/2019 Per DE#11. (cqs)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Defendants by June 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint by Aaron Group Realty, LLC. Responses due by 6/20/2019 (Whittles, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Robert Whittles on behalf of Aaron Group Realty, LLC. Attorney John Robert Whittles added to party Aaron Group Realty, LLC(pty:dft). (Whittles, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Wayne Searson served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Lomnitzer, Lorri)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Aaron Group Realty, LLC served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Lomnitzer, Lorri)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (cds)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aaron Group Realty, LLC, Wayne Searson. (cds)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aaron Group Realty, LLC, Wayne Searson. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11545227, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summon(s), #15 Summon(s))(Lomnitzer, Lorri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Aaron Group Realty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Group Realty, LLC
Represented By: John Robert Whittles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Searson
Represented By: John Robert Whittles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Lorri Lomnitzer
Represented By: Spensyr Ann Krebsbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?