Gargiulo, Inc. v. Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Gargiulo, Inc.
Defendant: Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Miranda Pfaff, FFP Secure Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company and Jeffrey Pfaff
Case Number: 9:2019cv80511
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
2 Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per DE#20. Motion for Final Default Judgment due by 7/19/2019. (cqs)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Final Default Judgment by July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/2/2019. (btr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Default Judgment re #18 Notice (Other), #13 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines by Gargiulo, Inc.. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(De Falco, Steven)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Gargiulo, Inc. re #13 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines -Notice of Joint Liability (De Falco, Steven)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Paperless Order granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file either a Motion for Default Final Judgment or Notice of Joint Liability by June 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/17/2019. (btr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Default Judgment Pleading re #13 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines by Gargiulo, Inc.. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(De Falco, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #14 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Jeffrey Pfaff. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Jeffrey Pfaff by Gargiulo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Application for Default, #2 Proposed Clerk's Default)(De Falco, Steven)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. (Motion for Default Final Judgment due by 6/17/2019.) Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #11 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to MIRANDA PFAFF, FARM FRESH PACKERS, LLC, FFP SECURE HOLDINGS, LLC. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to FFP Secure Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Miranda Pfaff by Gargiulo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Clerk's Default)(De Falco, Steven)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Gargiulo, Inc.. Jeffrey Pfaff served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (De Falco, Steven)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Gargiulo, Inc.. Miranda Pfaff served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (De Falco, Steven)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Gargiulo, Inc.. Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, a Florida limited liability company served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (De Falco, Steven)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Gargiulo, Inc.. FFP Secure Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (De Falco, Steven)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings. Judge Beth Bloom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gargiulo, Inc. (De Falco, Steven)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FFP Secure Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Jeffrey Pfaff, Miranda Pfaff. (amb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11556781, filed by Gargiulo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, #3 Summon(s) Miranda Pfaff, #4 Summon(s) Jeffrey Pfaff, #5 Summon(s) FFP Secure Holdings, LLC)(De Falco, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gargiulo, Inc. v. Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Fresh Packers, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FFP Secure Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gargiulo, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. De Falco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?