Woods v. Progressive American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lauren Woods
Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv80517
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Progressive American Insurance Company of Medical Examination (Richards, John)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Initial Disclosure(s) by Progressive American Insurance Company (Richards, John)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Patrick Massa, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Lauren Woods re #16 Order Striking,, Set/Reset Deadlines, Rescheduling Mediation (Hanson, Mark)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STRIKING #15 Notice Scheduling Mediation filed by Lauren Woods. The parties shall jointly file a proposed order scheduling mediation in compliance with this Courts Amended Scheduling Order ECF No. #12 by no later than June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Mediation by Lauren Woods re #12 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Setting Mediation (Hanson, Mark) -Modified/Stricken per ECF No. #16 Order on 6/3/2019 (gp).-
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Patrick Massa. (Hanson, Mark)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Progressive American Insurance Company (Richards, John)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Calendar Call set for 2/11/2020 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2019., Discovery due by 10/21/2019., Expert Discovery due by 10/21/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2019., Mediation Deadline 10/28/2019., In Limine Motions due by 12/3/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/5/2019., Motions due by 11/5/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/3/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 10/28/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 9/18/2019 03:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings, Judge Robin L. Rosenberg no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 10/18/2019., Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2019., Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 2/12/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 1/15/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Mediation Deadline 12/18/2019., In Limine Motions due by 11/15/2019., Motions due by 11/15/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/17/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 12/18/2019.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATUS REPORT - Removal Status Report by Progressive American Insurance Company (Richards, John)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Progressive American Insurance Company of Filing documents from state court proceedings (Richards, John)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Court Practice In Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Progressive American Insurance Company Civil Cover Sheet (Richards, John)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (mee)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11559811, filed by Progressive American Insurance Company.(Richards, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Progressive American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company
Represented By: John Hudson Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Woods
Represented By: Mark Richard Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?