DESERT ROSE FL, L.L.C. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Desert Rose FL, L.L.C. and Crystal Minnich
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv80594
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2019., Discovery due by 11/25/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 7/22/2019., In Limine Motions due by 12/16/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2019., Motions due by 12/16/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/21/2020., Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 2/12/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/19/2019. Attorney Appearances: Nicholas Zacharewski, Esq. for Plaintiff | Latanae Parker, Esq. for Defendant. Court discusses scheduling and other pretrial matters. Scheduling Order to follow. (Time in Court: 1 min. | Digital: 14:12:54) (jrz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Desert Rose FL, L.L.C., filed by Desert Rose FL, L.L.C..(Zacharewski, Nicholas)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for June 19, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot.
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 2/12/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 06/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Unitedhealth Group Incorporated for United Healthcare Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United Healthcare Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant moves for a two-week extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on the basis that additional time is necessary to explore a potential settlement of this matter. In the absence of specific details as to counsel's inability to meet the current deadline, I do not find find good cause exists to grant the relief requested. I will, however, grant the motion in part. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DE #1 -2) is extended to May 17, 2019. No other deadlines are modified or extended as a result of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/7/2019. (mbt)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Latanae)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Latanae L Parker on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company (Parker, Latanae)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Simon E. Pineres, mailing date May 3, 2019, (pt)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11611388, payment transferred from : 9:19-cv-80593-XXXX DESERT ROSE FL, L.L.C., d/b/a DESERT ROSE (a/a/o Crystal Minnich) v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4)(Jacobson, Jeannine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DESERT ROSE FL, L.L.C. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Rose FL, L.L.C.
Represented By: Simon E. Pineres
Represented By: Nicholas Albert Zacharewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Minnich
Represented By: Simon E. Pineres
Represented By: Nicholas Albert Zacharewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Latanae L Parker
Represented By: Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?