Desert Rose FL, L.L.C. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Desert Rose Fl, L.L.C.
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv80596
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #20 Amended Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Jacobson, Jeannine)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, due to Plaintiff's amendment of the Complaint #20 . Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/13/2019. (sk01)
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company, filed by Desert Rose Fl, L.L.C..(Zacharewski, Nicholas) Modified Text to Reflect against Defendant not Plaintiff on 6/13/2019 (ls).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #9 . Plaintiff's Response was due on June 7, 2019. On June 11, 2019, this Court issued an Order to Show Cause explaining that a Response had not been filed and ordering Plaintiff to show cause, in writing, why it had failed to respond and why the Motion to Dismiss should not be granted 16 . Plaintiff has responded to the Order to Show Cause with the Motion for an Extension of Time #17 , which states only that "Plaintiff is in need of additional time to respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss." Plaintiff's Motion is an inadequate response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. In addition, Plaintiff's Motion does not specify how much time it seeks to respond to the Motion to Dismiss, and includes a pre-filing conferral date of December 5, 2016. In the interest of judicial economy, the Court nevertheless grants Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file a Response to the Motion to Dismiss, or an Amended Complaint, by no later than June 14, 2019. Plaintiff's failure to do so may result in the Court granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by default, pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/12/2019. (sk01)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 Clerks Notice to Filer re #17 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer . Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Desert Rose Fl, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zacharewski, Nicholas) Modified Link on 6/11/2019 (ls).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [DE 9] was due on June 7, 2019. Plaintiff has not filed a Response to date. Accordingly, by no later than June 13, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, why it has failed to respond and why the Motion to Dismiss should not be granted. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order to Show Cause by June 13, 2019, may result in the Court granting the Motion to Dismiss by default, pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c). Show Cause Response due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/11/2019. (sk01)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 11/19/2019 02:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Discovery due by 12/20/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 1/24/2020.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by United Healthcare Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OFREQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 4/22/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 3/25/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Unitedhealth Group Incorporated for United Healthcare Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United Healthcare Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by United Healthcare Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or a responsive motion by May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/9/2019. (sk01)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Latanae)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Latanae L Parker on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company (Parker, Latanae)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Simon E. Pineres, mailing date May 3, 2019, (pt)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11613182, filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Jacobson, Jeannine) No Answer / Motion to Dismiss filed. Text Modified on 5/3/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desert Rose FL, L.L.C. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Latanae L Parker
Represented By: Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Rose Fl, L.L.C.
Represented By: Simon E. Pineres
Represented By: Nicholas Albert Zacharewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?