Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Larissa Fredmonski, Scuttina Signature Real Estate Group, LLC and Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80623
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Pike, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Larissa Fredmonski. (Pike, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Lomnitzer, Lorri)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Scuttina Signature Real Estate Group, LLC served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Lomnitzer, Lorri)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Larissa Fredmonski served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Lomnitzer, Lorri)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Scuttina Signature Real Estate Group, LLC. Attorney Brian Howard Koch added to party Scuttina Signature Real Estate Group, LLC(pty:dft). (Koch, Brian)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Larissa Fredmonski. Answer due 6/26/2019. Re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/7/2019. (vty)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Larissa Fredmonski. (Torsiello, Dominique)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dominique Julia Torsiello on behalf of Larissa Fredmonski, Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc.. Attorney Dominique Julia Torsiello added to party Larissa Fredmonski(pty:dft), Attorney Dominique Julia Torsiello added to party Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc.(pty:dft). (Torsiello, Dominique)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Lustig on behalf of Larissa Fredmonski, Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc.. Attorney Daniel Lustig added to party Larissa Fredmonski(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Lustig added to party Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc.(pty:dft). (Lustig, Daniel)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Pike on behalf of Larissa Fredmonski, Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc.. Attorney Michael James Pike added to party Larissa Fredmonski(pty:dft), Attorney Michael James Pike added to party Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc.(pty:dft). (Pike, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring counsel to meet, file Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Larissa Fredmonski, Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc., Scuttina Signature Real Estate Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(ebz)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE. (Copy of complaint, exhibits, and AO 121 form mailed out) (ebz)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larissa Fredmonski, Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc., Scuttina Signature Real Estate Group, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11631862, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Summon(s), #19 Summon(s), #20 Summon(s), #21 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lomnitzer, Lorri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa Fredmonski
Represented By: Dominique Julia Torsiello
Represented By: Daniel Lustig
Represented By: Michael James Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scuttina Signature Real Estate Group, LLC
Represented By: Brian Howard Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scuttina Real Estate Group, Inc.
Represented By: Dominique Julia Torsiello
Represented By: Daniel Lustig
Represented By: Michael James Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Lorri Lomnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?