Myeress v. Blue Coast Real Estate & Development Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: Barry Kaufman and Blue Coast Real Estate & Development Group, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80628
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joe Myeress (Moretto, Ana)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (vmz)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Joe Myeress (Moretto, Ana)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Joe Myeress (Rothman, Joel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 FORM AO 121 was mailed TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (vmz) Modified text on 5/10/2019 (mr1).
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Barry Kaufman. (vmz)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blue Coast Real Estate & Development Group, LLC. (vmz)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Blue Coast Real Estate & Development Group, LLC, Barry Kaufman. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11633293, filed by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Blue Coast Real Estate & Development Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Coast Real Estate & Development Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Ana Paula Moretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?