Securities and Exchange Commission v. Natural Diamonds Investment Co., et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Eagle Financial Diamond Group Inc.,, Natural Diamonds Investment Co.,, Jose Angel Aman, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida, Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.,, Diamante Atelier, Harold Seigel, Jonathan H. Seigel, Frederick D. Shipman, H.S. Management Group LLC., and Argyle Coin, LLC.,
Case Number: 9:2019cv80633
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0077
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING RECEIVERS AMENDED, AND UNOPPOSED, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND EXPAND RECEIVERSHIP OVER DEFENDANTS NATURAL DIAMONDS INVESTMENT CO. AND EAGLE FINANCIAL DIAMOND GROUP, INC. A/K/A DIAMANTE ATELIER re DE#97 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PAPERLESS ORDER expediting briefing on the #101 Motion to Appoint Legal Counsel. Responses on the Motion are due by no later than July 19, 2019. Replies in support of the Motion, if any, are due by no later than July 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/11/2019. (kbs)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE.Discovery Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 3/24/2020 02:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 10, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION Employ Legal Counsel re #20 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver by Argyle Coin, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schneider, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #99 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is granted an extension to file a motion to strike affirmative defenses against Relief Defendant Gold 7 until July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/10/2019. (kbs)
July 10, 2019 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berlin, Amie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 98 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Status Conference held on 7/1/2019. Total time in court: 19 minutes. (Digital 15:00:29) (kry)
July 9, 2019 Filing 97 Amended MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Expand Receivership Over Defendants Natural Diamonds Investment Co. and Eagle Financial Diamond Group, Inc. a/k/a Diamante Atelier; Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Argyle Coin, LLC.,. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schneider, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Dispositive Motions (Summary Judgment Motions) due by 5/29/2020. See Order DE#96 . (ebz)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Discovery due by 4/30/2020., Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2020., Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 6/30/2020.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all Pro Hac Vice Motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION BY RELIEF DEFENDANT BISHOP FREDERICK D. SHIPMAN FOR MODIFICATION OF ASSET FREEZE TO ALLOW SALE OF REAL ESTATE TO FUND PORTION OF PROSPECTIVE SETTLEMENT WITH THE SEC re #91 Motion to Amend/Correct. The June 11, 2019 asset freeze [DE 59] otherwise REMAINS IN EFFECT until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #90 Motion for Confirmation of Sale, Motion to Consolidate Cases, and Expand Receivership. Although the Motion indicates it is unopposed, email communications between the parties subsequent to the filing of the Motion indicate that the Motion as filed may not be unopposed, or may be opposed in some respects. Any amended motion must clarify precisely what relief each party has consented to. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/3/2019. (kbs)
July 2, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE by Frederick D. Shipman re #91 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #59 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, Unopposed Motion by Relief Defendant Bishop Frederick D. Shipman for Modification of Asset Freeze to Allow Sale of Real Estate to Fund Portion of Prospective Settleme Notice of Filing Corrected Proposed Order (Exhibit B) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Corrected Proposed Order) (Schoeppl, Carl)
July 2, 2019 Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #59 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, Unopposed Motion by Relief Defendant Bishop Frederick D. Shipman for Modification of Asset Freeze to Allow Sale of Real Estate to Fund Portion of Prospective Settlement with the SEC and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Frederick D. Shipman. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Schoeppl, Carl)
July 2, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Expand Receivership Over Defendants; Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Argyle Coin, LLC.,. Attorney Jeffrey Clark Schneider added to party Argyle Coin, LLC., (pty:dft). Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schneider, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/3/2019 to remove additional relief (kpe).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO LIFT ASSET FREEZE AGAINST DEFENDANT HAOLD SEIGEL FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF RETURNING LOAN FUNDS TO AMERICAN EXPRESS FROM BANK OF AMERICA Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to the Complaint as to H.S. Management Group LLC., Harold Seigel, and Jonathan H. Seigel. Answer due 7/31/2019. The Clerk's #69 Default is hereby lifted as to these Defendants and the named Relief Defendant. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/2/2019. (kbs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION Lift Freeze for Limited Purpose [D.E.40] re #40 Order on Preliminary Injunction by Harold Seigel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed order)(Kaplan, Ellen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by H.S. Management Group LLC.,, Harold Seigel, Jonathan H. Seigel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed order)(Kaplan, Ellen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 85 Proposed SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Securities and Exchange Commission (Berlin, Amie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 84 Jose Aman's ANSWER to Complaint by Jose Angel Aman. Attorney Kevin E O'Reilly added to party Jose Angel Aman(pty:dft). (O'Reilly, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ellen Michele Kaplan on behalf of Jonathan H. Seigel. Attorney Ellen Michele Kaplan added to party Jonathan H. Seigel(pty:dft). (Kaplan, Ellen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ellen Michele Kaplan on behalf of Harold Seigel. Attorney Ellen Michele Kaplan added to party Harold Seigel(pty:dft). (Kaplan, Ellen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ellen Michele Kaplan on behalf of H.S. Management Group LLC.,. Attorney Ellen Michele Kaplan added to party H.S. Management Group LLC., (pty:dft). (Kaplan, Ellen)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PAPERLESS ORDER setting Status Conference Re: Scheduling/Deadlines/Procedural Matters for 7/1/2019 at 3:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel may appear by phone at the 7/1 hearing using the following call-in instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/25/2019. (kry)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #78 Motion to Continue. The Court will reset the hearing by separate Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/20/2019. (kry)
June 20, 2019 Filing 78 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference re 75 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berlin, Amie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 77 RELIEF DEFENDANT, GOLD 7 OF MIAMI, LLC'S ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.,. (Resnick, Aaron)
June 18, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Avoidances of Relief Defendants Winners Church International, Inc. of West Palm Beach, Florida, Bishop Frederick D. Shipman, and Pastor Whitney Shipman by Frederick D. Shipman, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida. (Schoeppl, Carl)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PAPERLESS ORDER setting Status Conference Re: Scheduling/Deadlines/Procedural Matters for 6/20/2019 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel may appear by phone at the 6/20 hearing using the following call-in instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/17/2019. (kry)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for a Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/14/2019. (kbs)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AGREED ORDER CONCERNING THE TRANSFER OF JEWELRY TO COURT-APPOINTED RECEIVER. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Consistent with the Court's Order at DE 62 extending the deadline to respond for Gold 7, Winners Church, F. Shipman, and W. Shipman's answer is due 6/19/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/12/2019. (kbs)
June 12, 2019 Filing 71 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 64 Clerks Entry of Default as to Jose Angel Aman, Management Group LLC, Harold Seigel, Jonathan H. Seigel, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc. of West Palm Beach. Corrected name of Management Group LLC to H.S. Management Group LLC; 65 Clerks Entry Entry of Default as to to Gold 7 of Miami, LLC. Corrected Entry of Default to Non-Entry of Default. (jas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 70 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.,. Reason: Responsive pleading (i.e. Motion for Extention of Time to File Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss Complaint, etc) has been filed Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/12/2019. (jas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 69 Corrected Clerks Entry of Default as to Jose Angel Aman, H.S. Management Group LLC, Harold Seigel, Jonathan H. Seigel, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc. of West Palm Beach, Florida Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/12/2019. (jas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 68 Clerks Notice to Filer re #66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Response to the Plaintiff's Complaint by Relief Defendants Winners Church International, Inc. of West Palm Beach, Florida, Bishop Frederick D. Shipman, and P. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
June 11, 2019 Filing 67 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Frederick D. Shipman. Reason: Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed OR Waiver of Service Executed - has NOT been entered on docket Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/11/2019. (jas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 66 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Frederick D. Shipman, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida. Responses due by 6/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schoeppl, Carl) Modified Relief on 6/12/2019 (ls).
June 11, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE by Jeffrey C. Schneider Receiver's Notice of Filing Proposed Agreed Order Concerning the Transfer of Jewelry. Attorney Jeffrey Clark Schneider added to party Jeffrey C. Schneider(pty:rc). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Order) (Schneider, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.'s answer due 6/19/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/11/2019. (kbs)
June 11, 2019 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.,. (Resnick, Aaron)
June 11, 2019 Filing 60 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Jose Angel Aman, Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.,, H.S. Management Group LLC.,, Harold Seigel, Jonathan H. Seigel, Frederick D. Shipman, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. F. Shipman Email)(Berlin, Amie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 59 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING ASSET FREEZE AGAINST WINNERS CHURCH, FREDERICK SHIPMAN, and WHITNEY SHIPMAN. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (mr1).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Standing Discovery Order for Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 5, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission Regarding Relief Defendants' June 3, 2019 Supplemental Production Related to the Parties Proposed Findings [DE 48 & 49] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. RFP to W Shipman, #2 Exhibit B. RFP to F Shipman, #3 Exhibit C. RFP to Winners Church) (Berlin, Amie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Striking DE 53 In Accordance with Clerk of Court Notification by Securities and Exchange Commission (Berlin, Amie)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER IMPOSING ASSET FREEZE AND OTHER RELIEF AS TO RELIEF DEFENDANTS GOLD 7 OF MIAMI, LLC. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 54 Clerks Notice to Filer re #53 Notice (Other),. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (jas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Request for Production to W. Shipman, #2 Exhibit B. Request for Production to F. Shipman, #3 Exhibit C. Request for Production to Winners Church) (Berlin, Amie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE by Gold 7 of Miami, LLC., re #42 Order IMPOSING ASSET FREEZE AND OTHER RELIEF AS TO DEFENDANT GOLD 7 OF MIAMI, LLC AND CONSENT TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER AS TO GOLD 7 OF MIAMI, LLC (Resnick, Aaron)
June 3, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Relief Defendant Gold 7's Consent to Preliminary Injunction, Including Asset Freeze and Document Retention Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Berlin, Amie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission re #49 Notice (Other), of Filing Exhibit 4 to Proposed Findings: Declaration of Status of The Court-Ordered Asset Freeze (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A (BOA Answer), #2 Exhibit Exh. B (BB&T Answer), #3 Exhibit Exh. C (SunTrust Answer)) (Berlin, Amie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Filing Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Transcript of Hearing, #2 Exhibit 2 Strandell Dec, #3 Exhibit 3 W. Shipman Dec) (Berlin, Amie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE by Frederick D. Shipman, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida Notice of Filing Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Submitted by Relief Defendants Winners Church International, Inc. of West Palm Beach, Florida, Bishop Frederick D. Shipman, and Pastor Whitney Shipman Pursuant to Court Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Schoeppl, Carl)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time. Gold 7's Memorandum of Law is due by June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/31/2019. (kbs)
May 31, 2019 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO COMPLY WITH THE ORDER ENTERED ON MAY 28, 2019 re #42 Order by Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.,. Responses due by 6/14/2019 (Resnick, Aaron)
May 31, 2019 Filing 45 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 43 Clerk's Exhibit/Notices,,,, Exhibits E filed. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. (rrs)
May 29, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 43 [notice] restricted/sealed until further notice. (rrs)
May 29, 2019 Filing 44 RELEASE OF EXHIBITS Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-5 released to Victoria A. Jacqmein (ebz)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AS TO RELIEF DEFENDANT GOLD 7. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (kbs)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AS TO RELIEF DEFENDANTS WINNERS CHURCH, F. SHIPMAN, and W. SHIPMAN. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (kbs)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS AND RELIEF DEFENDANT HS MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (kbs)
May 28, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Berlin, Amie)
May 24, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by Frederick D. Shipman, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION Asset Freeze, and Other Relief Notice of Filing Corrected Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Schoeppl, Carl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 37 CLERK'S Notice of Receipt of Exhibit(s) received from CRD Re D.E. #36 Exhibit and Witness List. Exhibit Numbers: Plaintiff's Exhibits 1 - 5 For retrieval information, please contact the Clerks Office - Records Section of the Paul G. Rogers Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 701 Clematis Street, Room 202, West Palm Beach, FL 33401, (561) 803-3400. (pcs)
May 23, 2019 Filing 36 Exhibit and Witness List. (jas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 35 Plaintiff's CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): 1-4 by Amie Riggle Berlin on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Berlin, Amie)
May 23, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Filing Exhibits Admitted During the May 23, 2019 Show Cause Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Composite of Accounting, #2 Exhibit 2. Composite of Checks, #3 Exhibit 3. Bishop Shipman Accounting, #4 Exhibit 4. Pastor Shipman Accounting) (Berlin, Amie)
May 23, 2019 Filing 33 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/23/2019. Total time in court: 2 hour(s). Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mg)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER MEMORIALIZING RULINGS MADE AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (kbs)
May 23, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM of Law re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION Asset Freeze, and Other Relief Relief Defendants Winners Church International, Inc. of West Palm Beach, Florida, Bishop Frederick D. Shipman's and Pastor Whitney Shipman's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Frederick D. Shipman, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schoeppl, Carl)
May 22, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Rene Resnick on behalf of Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.,. Attorney Aaron Rene Resnick added to party Gold 7 of Miami, LLC., (pty:dft). (Resnick, Aaron)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Linda Salup-Schmidt on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney Linda Salup-Schmidt added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla). (Salup-Schmidt, Linda)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Email) (Berlin, Amie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Jeffry Schneider, Esq re #20 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver Notice by Corporate Monitor and Receiver. Attorney Jeffrey Clark Schneider added to party Jeffry Schneider, Esq(pty:rc). (Schneider, Jeffrey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Relief Defendant, Winners Church regarding Supplement to Accounting and Identification of Accounts. re #12 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida (Schoeppl, Carl)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Relief Defendant, Pastor Whitney Shipman regarding Accounting and Identification of Accounts. re #12 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Whitney Shipman (Schoeppl, Carl)
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Relief Defendant, Bishop Frederick D. Shipman regarding Accounting and Identification of Accounts. re #12 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Frederick D. Shipman (Schoeppl, Carl)
May 20, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Relief Defendant, Winners Church regarding Accounting and Identification of Accounts. re #12 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida (Schoeppl, Carl)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #21 Order on Motion to Unseal Case (dj)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Unsealing Casegranting #15 Motion to Unseal Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (dj)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Jeffry Schneider, Esq appointed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (dj)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Expedited Discovery re #15 MOTION to Renewing the request for expedited discovery filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION Asset Freeze, and Other Relief filed by Securities and Exchange Commission Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (dj)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Amie Riggle Berlin on 5/16/2019 by Natural Diamonds Investment Co.,. (nc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Amie Riggle Berlin on 5/16/2019 by Eagle Financial Diamond Group Inc.,. (nc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Securities and Exchange Commission. All Defendants. (nc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Unseal The Case and for Entry of The Proposed Receivership Order and Expedited Discovery by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 5/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(nc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg: Status Conference held on 5/15/2019. Total time in court: 1 hour(s). Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mg)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 Set Hearings ( Show Cause Hearing set for 5/23/2019 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (dj)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Emergency Relief #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; granting #4 Motion Granting Temporary Restraining Order Asset Freeze and Other Emergency Relief. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (dj)
May 14, 2019 Set Status Conference re: #8 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion Status Conference Re: Motions set for 5/15/2019 01:00 PM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (dj)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion to file case under seal; granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (dj)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (nc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case, Round v. Natural Diamonds Investment Co., 18-cv-81151 by Securities and Exchange Commission (nc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 EMERGENCY EX PARTE Motion and Memorandum of Law for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief, In Excess of The 20 Page Limit by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and Memorandum of Law by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(nc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE Pursuant to Rule 65(b) of The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Securities and Exchange Commission (nc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBITS In Support of #4 Emergency Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum of Law for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22) (nc).
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION and MEMORANDUM of Law for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief ( Responses due by 5/28/2019), by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to File Under Seal Its Complaint, Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Other Relief, Motion for Appointment of Receiver, and Other Documents by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (nc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER RELIEF against Jose Angel Aman, Argyle Coin, LLC.,, Eagle Financial Diamond Group Inc.,, Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.,, H.S. Management Group LLC.,, Natural Diamonds Investment Co.,, Harold Seigel, Jonathan H. Seigel, Frederick D. Shipman, Whitney Shipman, Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Natural Diamonds Investment Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Financial Diamond Group Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Diamonds Investment Co.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Angel Aman
Represented By: Kevin E O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Shipman
Represented By: Carl Francis Schoeppl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winners Church International Inc., of West Palm Beach, Florida
Represented By: Carl Francis Schoeppl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold 7 of Miami, LLC.,
Represented By: Aaron Rene Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamante Atelier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Seigel
Represented By: Ellen Michele Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan H. Seigel
Represented By: Ellen Michele Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick D. Shipman
Represented By: Carl Francis Schoeppl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.S. Management Group LLC.,
Represented By: Ellen Michele Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argyle Coin, LLC.,
Represented By: Jeffrey Clark Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Linda Salup-Schmidt
Represented By: Amie Riggle Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?